EP2155981 - SUPPORT FRAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.03.2017 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG | published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Moisio, Marko Näsiäkuja 5 05460 Hyvinkää / FI | [2014/48] |
Former [2010/08] | For all designated states Rautaruukki OYJ Suolakivenkatu 1 00810 Helsinki / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MOISIO, Marko Näsiäkuja 5 FI-05460 Hyvinkää / FI | [2010/08] | Representative(s) | Boco IP Oy Ab Kansakoulukatu 3 00100 Helsinki / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2014/08] | Boco IP Oy Ab Itämerenkatu 5 00180 Helsinki / FI | ||
Former [2011/01] | Westerholm, Carl Christian BORENIUS & Co Oy AB Tallberginkatu 2 A 00180 Helsinki / FI | ||
Former [2010/08] | Valkeiskangas, Tapio Lassi Paavali Kolster Oy Ab Iso Roobertinkatu 23 P.O. Box 148 00121 Helsinki / FI | Application number, filing date | 08761718.9 | 02.06.2008 | [2010/08] | WO2008FI50322 | Priority number, date | FI20070005421 | 06.06.2007 Original published format: FI 20075421 | [2010/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008148935 | Date: | 11.12.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2155981 | Date: | 24.02.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.12.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2155981 | Date: | 27.04.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | FI | 11.12.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.11.2013 | Classification | IPC: | E04B2/60, E04C3/32 | [2010/08] | CPC: |
E04C3/32 (EP,FI);
E04B2/60 (FI);
E04B2/789 (EP);
E04C2003/0473 (EP);
E04C2003/0486 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/17] |
Former [2010/08] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | STÜTZRAHMEN | [2010/08] | English: | SUPPORT FRAME | [2010/08] | French: | CADRE SUPPORT | [2010/08] | Entry into regional phase | 09.12.2009 | National basic fee paid | 09.12.2009 | Search fee paid | 09.12.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.12.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.04.2009 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: FI | 09.12.2009 | Examination requested [2010/08] | 28.05.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.03.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.05.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.01.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.03.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 11.03.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 11.03.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.03.2015 | Opposition(s) | 30.01.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2014 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   22.12.2014 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 02.06.2008 | AT | 27.04.2016 | BE | 27.04.2016 | BG | 27.04.2016 | CY | 27.04.2016 | CZ | 27.04.2016 | FI | 27.04.2016 | HR | 27.04.2016 | IS | 27.04.2016 | MC | 27.04.2016 | RO | 27.04.2016 | SI | 27.04.2016 | SK | 27.04.2016 | TR | 27.04.2016 | LU | 02.06.2016 | CH | 30.06.2016 | LI | 30.06.2016 | MT | 30.06.2016 | GR | 28.07.2016 | PT | 29.08.2016 | [2018/38] |
Former [2018/32] | HU | 02.06.2008 | |
AT | 27.04.2016 | ||
BE | 27.04.2016 | ||
CY | 27.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2016 | ||
FI | 27.04.2016 | ||
HR | 27.04.2016 | ||
IS | 27.04.2016 | ||
MC | 27.04.2016 | ||
RO | 27.04.2016 | ||
SI | 27.04.2016 | ||
SK | 27.04.2016 | ||
TR | 27.04.2016 | ||
LU | 02.06.2016 | ||
CH | 30.06.2016 | ||
LI | 30.06.2016 | ||
MT | 30.06.2016 | ||
GR | 28.07.2016 | ||
PT | 29.08.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 02.06.2008 | |
AT | 27.04.2016 | ||
BE | 27.04.2016 | ||
CY | 27.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2016 | ||
FI | 27.04.2016 | ||
HR | 27.04.2016 | ||
MC | 27.04.2016 | ||
RO | 27.04.2016 | ||
SI | 27.04.2016 | ||
SK | 27.04.2016 | ||
TR | 27.04.2016 | ||
LU | 02.06.2016 | ||
CH | 30.06.2016 | ||
LI | 30.06.2016 | ||
GR | 28.07.2016 | ||
PT | 29.08.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 02.06.2008 | |
AT | 27.04.2016 | ||
BE | 27.04.2016 | ||
CY | 27.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2016 | ||
FI | 27.04.2016 | ||
HR | 27.04.2016 | ||
MC | 27.04.2016 | ||
RO | 27.04.2016 | ||
SI | 27.04.2016 | ||
SK | 27.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.06.2016 | ||
LI | 30.06.2016 | ||
GR | 28.07.2016 | ||
PT | 29.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/24] | AT | 27.04.2016 | |
BE | 27.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2016 | ||
FI | 27.04.2016 | ||
HR | 27.04.2016 | ||
MC | 27.04.2016 | ||
RO | 27.04.2016 | ||
SI | 27.04.2016 | ||
SK | 27.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.06.2016 | ||
LI | 30.06.2016 | ||
GR | 28.07.2016 | ||
PT | 29.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | AT | 27.04.2016 | |
BE | 27.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2016 | ||
FI | 27.04.2016 | ||
HR | 27.04.2016 | ||
MC | 27.04.2016 | ||
RO | 27.04.2016 | ||
SK | 27.04.2016 | ||
GR | 28.07.2016 | ||
PT | 29.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | AT | 27.04.2016 | |
BE | 27.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2016 | ||
FI | 27.04.2016 | ||
HR | 27.04.2016 | ||
MC | 27.04.2016 | ||
RO | 27.04.2016 | ||
GR | 28.07.2016 | ||
PT | 29.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 27.04.2016 | |
BE | 27.04.2016 | ||
FI | 27.04.2016 | ||
HR | 27.04.2016 | ||
MC | 27.04.2016 | ||
GR | 28.07.2016 | ||
PT | 29.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 27.04.2016 | |
BE | 27.04.2016 | ||
FI | 27.04.2016 | ||
HR | 27.04.2016 | ||
GR | 28.07.2016 | ||
PT | 29.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | AT | 27.04.2016 | |
FI | 27.04.2016 | ||
HR | 27.04.2016 | ||
GR | 28.07.2016 | ||
PT | 29.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | AT | 27.04.2016 | |
FI | 27.04.2016 | ||
HR | 27.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | FI | 27.04.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US1311820 (JONES) [X] 1-18 * page 2, lines 2-41; figures 1-4a * | International search | [X]US6457293 (TSAI CHING TSUNG [TW]); | [X]US5661881 (MENCHETTI ROBERT J [US]); | [X]GB115466 (FORD LOUIS CHARLES [GB]); | [Y]FR2360415 (YOSUKE IGUCHI [JP]); | [A]US5605024 (SUCATO EDWARD [US], et al) |