EP2132522 - OPTICAL METROLOGY SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.01.2014 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.01.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.02.2014 [2014/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Laboratoire National de Metrologie et d'Essais 1 Rue Gaston Boissier 75015 Paris / FR | For all designated states Conservatoire National des Arts et Métiers 292, rue Saint-Martin 75141 Paris Cedex 03 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/51] | For all designated states Laboratoire National de Metrologie et d'Essais 1 Rue Gaston Boissier 75015 Paris / FR | ||
For all designated states Conservatoire National Des Arts Et Metiers 292 Rue Saint-Martin 75141 Paris Cedex 03 / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JUNCAR, Patrick 12, rue du Clos Héron F-91450 Etiolles / FR | 02 /
HADDAD, Darine 923 Beacon Square Court, Apt 358 Gaithersburg, Maryland 20878 / US | 03 /
GENEVES, Gérard 8, rue des Comtesses F-28000 Chartres / FR | [2009/51] | Representative(s) | Dossmann, Gérard Casalonga & Partners Bayerstrasse 71-73 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/51] | Dossmann, Gérard Bureau D.A. Casalonga & Josse Bayerstrasse 71/73 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08762037.3 | 05.02.2008 | [2009/51] | WO2008FR50178 | Priority number, date | FR20070053748 | 09.03.2007 Original published format: FR 0753748 | [2009/51] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008110721 | Date: | 18.09.2008 | Language: | FR | [2008/38] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2132522 | Date: | 16.12.2009 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.09.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.11.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G01B11/02, G01D5/34 | [2009/51] | CPC: |
G01B11/02 (EP,KR,US);
G01D5/34 (KR);
G01D5/342 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/51] | Title | German: | OPTISCHES METROLOGIESYSTEM | [2009/51] | English: | OPTICAL METROLOGY SYSTEM | [2009/51] | French: | SYSTEME DE METROLOGIE OPTIQUE | [2009/51] | Entry into regional phase | 13.08.2009 | National basic fee paid | 13.08.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.08.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.08.2009 | Examination requested [2009/51] | 12.07.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.09.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/06] | 27.09.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2014/06] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.07.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2013 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US6496273 (STIMPSON VICTOR G [GB], et al) [A] 1-9 * column 1, line 6 - line 10 * * column 4, line 34 - column 5, line 60; figures 1-4 *; | [A]EP0990870 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [A] 1-9 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0029]; figures 1,2a-d *; | [A]GB2357334 (WEBSTER PETER BRYAN [GB]) [A] 1-9 * page 1, paragraph 1 * * page 2, paragraph 4 - page 3, paragraph LAST; figures 1,3-6 *; | [A]US3795449 (MC KAY R) [A] 1-9 * column 1, line 4 - line 7 * * column 2, line 19 - column 3, line 25; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US5657125 (KATO SHIGEKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-9 * column 1, line 13 - line 18 * * column 3, line 51 - column 4, line 34; figures 2,3 * |