EP2134991 - PINLESS CRANKTRAIN FOR INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINES AND COMPRESSORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.12.2013 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ThyssenKrupp Metalúrgica Campo Limpo Ltda. Av. Alfried Krupp, 1050 13231-900 Campo Limpo Paulista-SP / BR | [2013/08] |
Former [2009/52] | For all designated states Thyssenkrupp Metalurgica Campo Limpo Ltda. Av Alfred Krupp 1050 13231-0900 Campo Limpo Paulista-SP / BR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FONSECA GALLI, Luis Antonio Rua Siqueira Campos 199 CEP-13106-006 Campinas-SP / BR | [2009/52] | Representative(s) | Albrecht, Rainer Harald Andrejewski - Honke Patent- und Rechtsanwälte An der Reichsbank 8 45127 Essen / DE | [2013/08] |
Former [2009/52] | Albrecht, Rainer Harald Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Andrejewski Honke Theaterplatz 3 45127 Essen / DE | Application number, filing date | 08762687.5 | 17.04.2008 | [2009/52] | WO2008IB00938 | Priority number, date | DE20071018435 | 19.04.2007 Original published format: DE102007018435 | EP20070014184 | 19.07.2007 Original published format: EP 07014184 | [2009/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008129391 | Date: | 30.10.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2134991 | Date: | 23.12.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.10.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2134991 | Date: | 20.02.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.10.2008 | Classification | IPC: | F16C7/02, F16J1/22, F16J1/20, F16J7/00 | [2012/35] | CPC: |
F16J1/20 (EP);
F16C7/023 (EP);
F16J7/00 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2009/52] | F16J1/22, F16C7/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/52] | Title | German: | STIFTLOSER KURBELANTRIEB FÜR VERBRENNUNGSMOTOREN UND KOMPRESSOREN | [2009/52] | English: | PINLESS CRANKTRAIN FOR INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINES AND COMPRESSORS | [2009/52] | French: | TRAIN DE VILEBREQUIN INTÉGRÉ DESTINÉ À DES MOTEURS À COMBUSTION INTERNE ET DES COMPRESSEURS | [2009/52] | Entry into regional phase | 05.10.2009 | National basic fee paid | 05.10.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.10.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.10.2009 | Examination requested [2009/52] | 16.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.08.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.09.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.12.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 14.12.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.02.2010 | Opposition(s) | 21.11.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 20.02.2013 | CY | 20.02.2013 | DK | 20.02.2013 | EE | 20.02.2013 | FI | 20.02.2013 | HR | 20.02.2013 | LT | 20.02.2013 | LV | 20.02.2013 | MC | 20.02.2013 | MT | 20.02.2013 | RO | 20.02.2013 | SI | 20.02.2013 | SK | 20.02.2013 | TR | 20.02.2013 | IE | 17.04.2013 | LU | 17.04.2013 | CH | 30.04.2013 | LI | 30.04.2013 | BG | 20.05.2013 | NO | 20.05.2013 | GR | 21.05.2013 | IS | 20.06.2013 | PT | 20.06.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | BE | 20.02.2013 | |
CY | 20.02.2013 | ||
DK | 20.02.2013 | ||
EE | 20.02.2013 | ||
FI | 20.02.2013 | ||
HR | 20.02.2013 | ||
LT | 20.02.2013 | ||
LV | 20.02.2013 | ||
MC | 20.02.2013 | ||
MT | 20.02.2013 | ||
RO | 20.02.2013 | ||
SI | 20.02.2013 | ||
SK | 20.02.2013 | ||
TR | 20.02.2013 | ||
IE | 17.04.2013 | ||
CH | 30.04.2013 | ||
LI | 30.04.2013 | ||
BG | 20.05.2013 | ||
NO | 20.05.2013 | ||
GR | 21.05.2013 | ||
IS | 20.06.2013 | ||
PT | 20.06.2013 | ||
Former [2015/13] | BE | 20.02.2013 | |
CY | 20.02.2013 | ||
DK | 20.02.2013 | ||
EE | 20.02.2013 | ||
FI | 20.02.2013 | ||
HR | 20.02.2013 | ||
LT | 20.02.2013 | ||
LV | 20.02.2013 | ||
MC | 20.02.2013 | ||
MT | 20.02.2013 | ||
RO | 20.02.2013 | ||
SI | 20.02.2013 | ||
SK | 20.02.2013 | ||
IE | 17.04.2013 | ||
CH | 30.04.2013 | ||
LI | 30.04.2013 | ||
BG | 20.05.2013 | ||
NO | 20.05.2013 | ||
GR | 21.05.2013 | ||
IS | 20.06.2013 | ||
PT | 20.06.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | BE | 20.02.2013 | |
CY | 20.02.2013 | ||
DK | 20.02.2013 | ||
EE | 20.02.2013 | ||
FI | 20.02.2013 | ||
HR | 20.02.2013 | ||
LT | 20.02.2013 | ||
LV | 20.02.2013 | ||
MC | 20.02.2013 | ||
RO | 20.02.2013 | ||
SI | 20.02.2013 | ||
SK | 20.02.2013 | ||
IE | 17.04.2013 | ||
CH | 30.04.2013 | ||
LI | 30.04.2013 | ||
BG | 20.05.2013 | ||
NO | 20.05.2013 | ||
GR | 21.05.2013 | ||
IS | 20.06.2013 | ||
PT | 20.06.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | BE | 20.02.2013 | |
CY | 20.02.2013 | ||
DK | 20.02.2013 | ||
EE | 20.02.2013 | ||
FI | 20.02.2013 | ||
HR | 20.02.2013 | ||
LT | 20.02.2013 | ||
LV | 20.02.2013 | ||
MC | 20.02.2013 | ||
RO | 20.02.2013 | ||
SI | 20.02.2013 | ||
SK | 20.02.2013 | ||
CH | 30.04.2013 | ||
LI | 30.04.2013 | ||
BG | 20.05.2013 | ||
NO | 20.05.2013 | ||
GR | 21.05.2013 | ||
IS | 20.06.2013 | ||
PT | 20.06.2013 | ||
Former [2014/01] | BE | 20.02.2013 | |
CY | 20.02.2013 | ||
DK | 20.02.2013 | ||
EE | 20.02.2013 | ||
FI | 20.02.2013 | ||
HR | 20.02.2013 | ||
LT | 20.02.2013 | ||
LV | 20.02.2013 | ||
MC | 20.02.2013 | ||
RO | 20.02.2013 | ||
SI | 20.02.2013 | ||
SK | 20.02.2013 | ||
BG | 20.05.2013 | ||
NO | 20.05.2013 | ||
GR | 21.05.2013 | ||
IS | 20.06.2013 | ||
PT | 20.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | BE | 20.02.2013 | |
CY | 20.02.2013 | ||
DK | 20.02.2013 | ||
EE | 20.02.2013 | ||
FI | 20.02.2013 | ||
HR | 20.02.2013 | ||
LT | 20.02.2013 | ||
LV | 20.02.2013 | ||
RO | 20.02.2013 | ||
SI | 20.02.2013 | ||
SK | 20.02.2013 | ||
BG | 20.05.2013 | ||
NO | 20.05.2013 | ||
GR | 21.05.2013 | ||
IS | 20.06.2013 | ||
PT | 20.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | BE | 20.02.2013 | |
DK | 20.02.2013 | ||
EE | 20.02.2013 | ||
FI | 20.02.2013 | ||
HR | 20.02.2013 | ||
LT | 20.02.2013 | ||
LV | 20.02.2013 | ||
RO | 20.02.2013 | ||
SI | 20.02.2013 | ||
SK | 20.02.2013 | ||
BG | 20.05.2013 | ||
NO | 20.05.2013 | ||
GR | 21.05.2013 | ||
IS | 20.06.2013 | ||
PT | 20.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | BE | 20.02.2013 | |
DK | 20.02.2013 | ||
EE | 20.02.2013 | ||
FI | 20.02.2013 | ||
HR | 20.02.2013 | ||
LT | 20.02.2013 | ||
LV | 20.02.2013 | ||
SI | 20.02.2013 | ||
BG | 20.05.2013 | ||
NO | 20.05.2013 | ||
GR | 21.05.2013 | ||
IS | 20.06.2013 | ||
PT | 20.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/41] | BE | 20.02.2013 | |
FI | 20.02.2013 | ||
HR | 20.02.2013 | ||
LT | 20.02.2013 | ||
LV | 20.02.2013 | ||
SI | 20.02.2013 | ||
BG | 20.05.2013 | ||
NO | 20.05.2013 | ||
GR | 21.05.2013 | ||
IS | 20.06.2013 | ||
PT | 20.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/40] | BE | 20.02.2013 | |
FI | 20.02.2013 | ||
LT | 20.02.2013 | ||
LV | 20.02.2013 | ||
SI | 20.02.2013 | ||
BG | 20.05.2013 | ||
NO | 20.05.2013 | ||
GR | 21.05.2013 | ||
IS | 20.06.2013 | ||
PT | 20.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/38] | BE | 20.02.2013 | |
FI | 20.02.2013 | ||
LT | 20.02.2013 | ||
LV | 20.02.2013 | ||
SI | 20.02.2013 | ||
BG | 20.05.2013 | ||
NO | 20.05.2013 | ||
GR | 21.05.2013 | ||
IS | 20.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | FI | 20.02.2013 | |
LT | 20.02.2013 | ||
SI | 20.02.2013 | ||
BG | 20.05.2013 | ||
NO | 20.05.2013 | ||
GR | 21.05.2013 | ||
IS | 20.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | LT | 20.02.2013 | |
BG | 20.05.2013 | ||
NO | 20.05.2013 | ||
IS | 20.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/33] | LT | 20.02.2013 | |
NO | 20.05.2013 | Cited in | International search | [XA]EP1538373 (MAN B & W DIESEL AG [DE]) [X] 1,2,4,6,8 * abstract * * paragraph [0011] * * claim 1 * * figure 2 * [A] 3,5,7,9; | [XA]WO9819067 (ZANUSSI ELETTROMECC [IT], et al) [X] 1 * abstract * * page 3, line 8 - line 24 * * figures 1a-1c * [A] 2-9; | [X]FR1497274 (DANFOSS AS) [X] 1 * figure 1 *; | [X]DE3504410 (SCHWAIGER ODILO) [X] 1 * figure 1 *; | [X]JPS6365180 (MATSUSHITA REFRIGERATION) [X] 1 * abstract * | by applicant | EP1507088 | EP1538373 |