EP2170552 - MOVABLE POLE EXTENSION FOR A MAGNETIC CLAMPING APPARATUS AND MAGNETIC CLAMPING APPARATUS HAVING SUCH MOVABLE POLE EXTENSION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.01.2013 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tecnomagnete S.p.A. Piazzale Luigi Cadorna, 10 20123 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2012/14] | For all designated states Tecnomagnete S.p.A. Piazzale Luigi Cadorna, 10 Milano / IT | ||
Former [2010/14] | For all designated states Tecnomagnete S.p.A. Via Nerviano, 31 20020 Lainate / IT | ||
For all designated states Politecnico di Milano Piazza Leonardo da Vinci 32 20133 Milano / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CARDONE, Michele Via Mantenga 29 I-20090 Trezzano S/N (MI) / IT | 02 /
COSMAI, Giovanni Via A. Volta 10 I-20027 Rescaldina (MI) / IT | 03 /
FARANDA, Roberto Via Francesco Cilea 98 I-20151 Milano (MI) / IT | 04 /
GIGLIO, Antonino Via Oratoio 42 I-20016 Pero (MI) / IT | [2010/14] | Representative(s) | Ciceri, Fabio, et al Perani & Partners Piazza San Babila, 5 20122 Milano / IT | [2012/12] |
Former [2010/52] | Ciceri, Fabio, et al Perani Mezzanotte & Partners Piazza San Babila, 5 20122 Milano / IT | ||
Former [2010/14] | Bonvicini, Davide, et al Perani Mezzanotte & Partners Piazza San Babila, 5 20122 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 08762813.7 | 29.05.2008 | [2010/14] | WO2008IB01477 | Priority number, date | IT2007MI01353 | 06.07.2007 Original published format: IT MI20071353 | [2010/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009007807 | Date: | 15.01.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2170552 | Date: | 07.04.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.01.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2170552 | Date: | 21.03.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/12] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP2170552 | Date: | 25.04.2012 | [2012/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.01.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B23Q3/154, B25B11/00, B66C1/04 | [2010/14] | CPC: |
B23Q3/1543 (EP,US);
B23Q3/1546 (EP,US);
B66C1/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/14] | Title | German: | BEWEGLICHE POLVERLÄNGERUNG FÜR EINE MAGNETISCHE KLEMMVORRICHTUNG UND MAGNETISCHE KLEMMVORRICHTUNG MIT SOLCH EINER BEWEGLICHEN POLVERLÄNGERUNG | [2010/14] | English: | MOVABLE POLE EXTENSION FOR A MAGNETIC CLAMPING APPARATUS AND MAGNETIC CLAMPING APPARATUS HAVING SUCH MOVABLE POLE EXTENSION | [2010/14] | French: | RALLONGE POLAIRE MOBILE POUR UN APPAREIL DE SERRAGE MAGNÉTIQUE ET APPAREIL DE SERRAGE MAGNÉTIQUE AYANT UNE TELLE RALLONGE POLAIRE MOBILE | [2010/14] | Entry into regional phase | 18.12.2009 | National basic fee paid | 18.12.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.12.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.12.2009 | Examination requested [2010/14] | 16.04.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.09.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.11.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.01.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.09.2011 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 26.09.2011 | 26.09.2011 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 04.10.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.02.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 10.02.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.04.2010 | Opposition(s) | 02.01.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.05.2008 | AT | 21.03.2012 | BE | 21.03.2012 | CY | 21.03.2012 | CZ | 21.03.2012 | DK | 21.03.2012 | EE | 21.03.2012 | FI | 21.03.2012 | HR | 21.03.2012 | LT | 21.03.2012 | LV | 21.03.2012 | MT | 21.03.2012 | PL | 21.03.2012 | RO | 21.03.2012 | SI | 21.03.2012 | SK | 21.03.2012 | TR | 21.03.2012 | IE | 29.05.2012 | LU | 29.05.2012 | CH | 31.05.2012 | LI | 31.05.2012 | MC | 31.05.2012 | BG | 21.06.2012 | NO | 21.06.2012 | GR | 22.06.2012 | IS | 21.07.2012 | PT | 23.07.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 21.03.2012 | |
BE | 21.03.2012 | ||
CY | 21.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2012 | ||
DK | 21.03.2012 | ||
EE | 21.03.2012 | ||
FI | 21.03.2012 | ||
HR | 21.03.2012 | ||
LT | 21.03.2012 | ||
LV | 21.03.2012 | ||
MT | 21.03.2012 | ||
PL | 21.03.2012 | ||
RO | 21.03.2012 | ||
SI | 21.03.2012 | ||
SK | 21.03.2012 | ||
TR | 21.03.2012 | ||
IE | 29.05.2012 | ||
LU | 29.05.2012 | ||
CH | 31.05.2012 | ||
LI | 31.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
BG | 21.06.2012 | ||
NO | 21.06.2012 | ||
GR | 22.06.2012 | ||
IS | 21.07.2012 | ||
PT | 23.07.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 21.03.2012 | |
BE | 21.03.2012 | ||
CY | 21.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2012 | ||
DK | 21.03.2012 | ||
EE | 21.03.2012 | ||
FI | 21.03.2012 | ||
HR | 21.03.2012 | ||
LT | 21.03.2012 | ||
LV | 21.03.2012 | ||
MT | 21.03.2012 | ||
PL | 21.03.2012 | ||
RO | 21.03.2012 | ||
SI | 21.03.2012 | ||
SK | 21.03.2012 | ||
TR | 21.03.2012 | ||
IE | 29.05.2012 | ||
CH | 31.05.2012 | ||
LI | 31.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
BG | 21.06.2012 | ||
NO | 21.06.2012 | ||
GR | 22.06.2012 | ||
IS | 21.07.2012 | ||
PT | 23.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/35] | AT | 21.03.2012 | |
BE | 21.03.2012 | ||
CY | 21.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2012 | ||
DK | 21.03.2012 | ||
EE | 21.03.2012 | ||
FI | 21.03.2012 | ||
HR | 21.03.2012 | ||
LT | 21.03.2012 | ||
LV | 21.03.2012 | ||
MT | 21.03.2012 | ||
PL | 21.03.2012 | ||
RO | 21.03.2012 | ||
SI | 21.03.2012 | ||
SK | 21.03.2012 | ||
IE | 29.05.2012 | ||
CH | 31.05.2012 | ||
LI | 31.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
BG | 21.06.2012 | ||
NO | 21.06.2012 | ||
GR | 22.06.2012 | ||
IS | 21.07.2012 | ||
PT | 23.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 21.03.2012 | |
BE | 21.03.2012 | ||
CY | 21.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2012 | ||
DK | 21.03.2012 | ||
EE | 21.03.2012 | ||
FI | 21.03.2012 | ||
HR | 21.03.2012 | ||
LT | 21.03.2012 | ||
LV | 21.03.2012 | ||
PL | 21.03.2012 | ||
RO | 21.03.2012 | ||
SI | 21.03.2012 | ||
SK | 21.03.2012 | ||
IE | 29.05.2012 | ||
CH | 31.05.2012 | ||
LI | 31.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
BG | 21.06.2012 | ||
NO | 21.06.2012 | ||
GR | 22.06.2012 | ||
IS | 21.07.2012 | ||
PT | 23.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/20] | AT | 21.03.2012 | |
BE | 21.03.2012 | ||
CY | 21.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2012 | ||
DK | 21.03.2012 | ||
EE | 21.03.2012 | ||
FI | 21.03.2012 | ||
HR | 21.03.2012 | ||
LT | 21.03.2012 | ||
LV | 21.03.2012 | ||
PL | 21.03.2012 | ||
RO | 21.03.2012 | ||
SI | 21.03.2012 | ||
SK | 21.03.2012 | ||
IE | 29.05.2012 | ||
CH | 31.05.2012 | ||
LI | 31.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
NO | 21.06.2012 | ||
GR | 22.06.2012 | ||
IS | 21.07.2012 | ||
PT | 23.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 21.03.2012 | |
BE | 21.03.2012 | ||
CY | 21.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2012 | ||
DK | 21.03.2012 | ||
EE | 21.03.2012 | ||
FI | 21.03.2012 | ||
HR | 21.03.2012 | ||
LT | 21.03.2012 | ||
LV | 21.03.2012 | ||
PL | 21.03.2012 | ||
RO | 21.03.2012 | ||
SI | 21.03.2012 | ||
SK | 21.03.2012 | ||
CH | 31.05.2012 | ||
LI | 31.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
NO | 21.06.2012 | ||
GR | 22.06.2012 | ||
IS | 21.07.2012 | ||
PT | 23.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 21.03.2012 | |
BE | 21.03.2012 | ||
CY | 21.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2012 | ||
EE | 21.03.2012 | ||
FI | 21.03.2012 | ||
HR | 21.03.2012 | ||
LT | 21.03.2012 | ||
LV | 21.03.2012 | ||
PL | 21.03.2012 | ||
RO | 21.03.2012 | ||
SI | 21.03.2012 | ||
SK | 21.03.2012 | ||
CH | 31.05.2012 | ||
LI | 31.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
NO | 21.06.2012 | ||
GR | 22.06.2012 | ||
IS | 21.07.2012 | ||
PT | 23.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/03] | BE | 21.03.2012 | |
CY | 21.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2012 | ||
EE | 21.03.2012 | ||
FI | 21.03.2012 | ||
HR | 21.03.2012 | ||
LT | 21.03.2012 | ||
LV | 21.03.2012 | ||
PL | 21.03.2012 | ||
RO | 21.03.2012 | ||
SI | 21.03.2012 | ||
SK | 21.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
NO | 21.06.2012 | ||
GR | 22.06.2012 | ||
IS | 21.07.2012 | ||
PT | 23.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/01] | BE | 21.03.2012 | |
CY | 21.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2012 | ||
EE | 21.03.2012 | ||
FI | 21.03.2012 | ||
HR | 21.03.2012 | ||
LT | 21.03.2012 | ||
LV | 21.03.2012 | ||
PL | 21.03.2012 | ||
RO | 21.03.2012 | ||
SI | 21.03.2012 | ||
SK | 21.03.2012 | ||
NO | 21.06.2012 | ||
GR | 22.06.2012 | ||
IS | 21.07.2012 | ||
PT | 23.07.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | BE | 21.03.2012 | |
CY | 21.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2012 | ||
EE | 21.03.2012 | ||
FI | 21.03.2012 | ||
HR | 21.03.2012 | ||
LT | 21.03.2012 | ||
LV | 21.03.2012 | ||
PL | 21.03.2012 | ||
RO | 21.03.2012 | ||
SI | 21.03.2012 | ||
SK | 21.03.2012 | ||
NO | 21.06.2012 | ||
GR | 22.06.2012 | ||
IS | 21.07.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | BE | 21.03.2012 | |
CY | 21.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2012 | ||
EE | 21.03.2012 | ||
FI | 21.03.2012 | ||
HR | 21.03.2012 | ||
LT | 21.03.2012 | ||
LV | 21.03.2012 | ||
PL | 21.03.2012 | ||
RO | 21.03.2012 | ||
SI | 21.03.2012 | ||
NO | 21.06.2012 | ||
GR | 22.06.2012 | ||
IS | 21.07.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | BE | 21.03.2012 | |
CY | 21.03.2012 | ||
EE | 21.03.2012 | ||
FI | 21.03.2012 | ||
HR | 21.03.2012 | ||
LT | 21.03.2012 | ||
LV | 21.03.2012 | ||
NO | 21.06.2012 | ||
GR | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/46] | BE | 21.03.2012 | |
CY | 21.03.2012 | ||
FI | 21.03.2012 | ||
HR | 21.03.2012 | ||
LT | 21.03.2012 | ||
LV | 21.03.2012 | ||
NO | 21.06.2012 | ||
GR | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/41] | CY | 21.03.2012 | |
FI | 21.03.2012 | ||
HR | 21.03.2012 | ||
LT | 21.03.2012 | ||
LV | 21.03.2012 | ||
NO | 21.06.2012 | ||
GR | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/39] | FI | 21.03.2012 | |
HR | 21.03.2012 | ||
LT | 21.03.2012 | ||
LV | 21.03.2012 | ||
NO | 21.06.2012 | ||
GR | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | FI | 21.03.2012 | |
HR | 21.03.2012 | ||
LT | 21.03.2012 | ||
NO | 21.06.2012 | ||
GR | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | HR | 21.03.2012 | |
LT | 21.03.2012 | ||
NO | 21.06.2012 | ||
GR | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | LT | 21.03.2012 | |
NO | 21.06.2012 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE1032441 (DEUTSCHE EDELSTAHLWERKE AG) [A] 1-20 * figure 1 *; | [A]DE1096795 (WILHELM DONAUBAUER) [A] 6* figures 1,2 *; | [AD]EP0311865 (TECNOMAGNETE SPA [IT]) [AD] 1-20 * figure 1 *; | [X]EP0559483 (WALKER MAGNETICS GROUP INC [US]) [X] 1,2,10-20 * figures 1,5 * |