Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
15.06.2012 | Withdrawal of application | published on 18.07.2012 [2012/29] |
05.07.2011 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
20.08.2010 | Change - extension states | published on 22.09.2010 [2010/38] |
03.07.2010 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
17.02.2010 | Amendment by applicant | |
22.01.2010 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
22.01.2010 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 24.02.2010 [2010/08] |
22.01.2010 | Request for examination filed | published on 24.02.2010 [2010/08] |
15.12.2009 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
24.11.2009 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
14.01.2009 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
30.12.2008 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
01.08.2008 | PCT data prior to European publication |