EP2160149 - ADJUSTABLE TENSION RING FOR AMELIORATION OF URINARY INCONTINENCE IN FEMALES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.02.2017 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG | published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ConTIPI Medical Ltd. 2 Alon HaTavor Street Southern Industrial Park 38900 Caesarea / IL | [2014/38] |
Former [2010/10] | For all designated states Contipi Ltd. 2 Alon Hatavor Street Southern Industrial Park 38900 Caesarea / IL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZIV, Elan 8 HaIlanot Street 52648 Ramat-Gan / IL | 02 /
PERLE, Amir 18 Caspari Street 3467718 Haifa / IL | 03 /
BAUDER, Idan 30/1 HaTivat Givati Street 21997 Carmiel / IL | 04 /
BAR-OR, Jonathan Kibbutz Degania Alef 15120 Doar-Na Emek HaYarden / IL | [2016/12] |
Former [2010/10] | 01 /
ZIV, Elan 8 HaIlanot Street 52648 Ramat-Gan / IL | ||
02 /
PERLE, Amir 2 Tidhar Street 34655 Haifa / IL | |||
03 /
BAUDER, Idan 30/1 HaTivat Givati Street 21997 Carmiel / IL | |||
04 /
BAR-OR, Jonathan Kibbutz Degania Alef 15120 Doar-Na Emek HaYarden / IL | Representative(s) | Dennemeyer & Associates S.A. Postfach 70 04 25 81304 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/09] | Dennemeyer & Associates S.A. Poccistrasse 11 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2014/05] | Speich, Stéphane, et al Dennemeyer & Associates S.A. 55, rue des Bruyères 1274 Luxembourg-Howald / LU | ||
Former [2012/47] | Dennemeyer & Associates S.A. 55, rue des Bruyères 1274 Howald / LU | ||
Former [2010/10] | Fichter, Robert Arno Dennemeyer & Associates S.A. 55, rue des Bruyères 1274 Howald / LU | Application number, filing date | 08763544.7 | 11.06.2008 | [2010/10] | WO2008IL00786 | Priority number, date | US20070929063P | 11.06.2007 Original published format: US 929063 P | US20080071344P | 23.04.2008 Original published format: US 71344 P | [2010/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008152628 | Date: | 18.12.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2160149 | Date: | 10.03.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.12.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2160149 | Date: | 13.04.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.12.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/00 | [2010/10] | CPC: |
A61F2/005 (EP,US);
A61F2/0027 (US);
A61F2250/0001 (EP,US);
A61F2250/0003 (EP,US);
A61F2250/0012 (EP,US);
A61F2250/007 (EP,US);
A61F2250/009 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/15] |
Former [2010/10] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERSTELLBARER SPANNRING ZUR LINDERUNG VON HARNINKONTINENZ BEI FRAUEN | [2010/10] | English: | ADJUSTABLE TENSION RING FOR AMELIORATION OF URINARY INCONTINENCE IN FEMALES | [2010/10] | French: | ANNEAU DE TENSION AJUSTABLE CONTRE L'INCONTINENCE URINAIRE DE LA FEMME | [2010/10] | Entry into regional phase | 08.01.2010 | National basic fee paid | 08.01.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.01.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.01.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.01.2010 | Examination requested [2010/10] | 31.01.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.06.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.10.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.02.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.06.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.11.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.02.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 22.02.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.02.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP14192972.9 / EP2856971 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 31.01.2014 | Opposition(s) | 16.01.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 11.06.2008 | AT | 13.04.2016 | BE | 13.04.2016 | BG | 13.04.2016 | CY | 13.04.2016 | CZ | 13.04.2016 | DK | 13.04.2016 | EE | 13.04.2016 | ES | 13.04.2016 | FI | 13.04.2016 | HR | 13.04.2016 | IS | 13.04.2016 | IT | 13.04.2016 | LT | 13.04.2016 | LV | 13.04.2016 | MC | 13.04.2016 | NL | 13.04.2016 | PL | 13.04.2016 | RO | 13.04.2016 | SE | 13.04.2016 | SI | 13.04.2016 | SK | 13.04.2016 | TR | 13.04.2016 | IE | 11.06.2016 | LU | 11.06.2016 | CH | 30.06.2016 | LI | 30.06.2016 | MT | 30.06.2016 | NO | 13.07.2016 | GR | 14.07.2016 | PT | 16.08.2016 | [2018/38] |
Former [2018/32] | HU | 11.06.2008 | |
AT | 13.04.2016 | ||
BE | 13.04.2016 | ||
CY | 13.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2016 | ||
DK | 13.04.2016 | ||
EE | 13.04.2016 | ||
ES | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
HR | 13.04.2016 | ||
IS | 13.04.2016 | ||
IT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
MC | 13.04.2016 | ||
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
RO | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
SI | 13.04.2016 | ||
SK | 13.04.2016 | ||
TR | 13.04.2016 | ||
IE | 11.06.2016 | ||
LU | 11.06.2016 | ||
CH | 30.06.2016 | ||
LI | 30.06.2016 | ||
MT | 30.06.2016 | ||
NO | 13.07.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 11.06.2008 | |
AT | 13.04.2016 | ||
BE | 13.04.2016 | ||
CY | 13.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2016 | ||
DK | 13.04.2016 | ||
EE | 13.04.2016 | ||
ES | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
HR | 13.04.2016 | ||
IT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
MC | 13.04.2016 | ||
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
RO | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
SI | 13.04.2016 | ||
SK | 13.04.2016 | ||
TR | 13.04.2016 | ||
IE | 11.06.2016 | ||
LU | 11.06.2016 | ||
CH | 30.06.2016 | ||
LI | 30.06.2016 | ||
NO | 13.07.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 11.06.2008 | |
AT | 13.04.2016 | ||
BE | 13.04.2016 | ||
CY | 13.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2016 | ||
DK | 13.04.2016 | ||
EE | 13.04.2016 | ||
ES | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
HR | 13.04.2016 | ||
IT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
MC | 13.04.2016 | ||
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
RO | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
SI | 13.04.2016 | ||
SK | 13.04.2016 | ||
IE | 11.06.2016 | ||
CH | 30.06.2016 | ||
LI | 30.06.2016 | ||
NO | 13.07.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/24] | AT | 13.04.2016 | |
BE | 13.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2016 | ||
DK | 13.04.2016 | ||
EE | 13.04.2016 | ||
ES | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
HR | 13.04.2016 | ||
IT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
MC | 13.04.2016 | ||
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
RO | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
SI | 13.04.2016 | ||
SK | 13.04.2016 | ||
IE | 11.06.2016 | ||
CH | 30.06.2016 | ||
LI | 30.06.2016 | ||
NO | 13.07.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | AT | 13.04.2016 | |
BE | 13.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2016 | ||
DK | 13.04.2016 | ||
EE | 13.04.2016 | ||
ES | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
HR | 13.04.2016 | ||
IT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
MC | 13.04.2016 | ||
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
RO | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
SK | 13.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.07.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | AT | 13.04.2016 | |
BE | 13.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2016 | ||
DK | 13.04.2016 | ||
EE | 13.04.2016 | ||
ES | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
HR | 13.04.2016 | ||
IT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
MC | 13.04.2016 | ||
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
RO | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.07.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 13.04.2016 | |
BE | 13.04.2016 | ||
DK | 13.04.2016 | ||
ES | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
HR | 13.04.2016 | ||
IT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
MC | 13.04.2016 | ||
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.07.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 13.04.2016 | |
BE | 13.04.2016 | ||
ES | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
HR | 13.04.2016 | ||
IT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.07.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/52] | AT | 13.04.2016 | |
ES | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
HR | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.07.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | AT | 13.04.2016 | |
ES | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
HR | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.07.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | AT | 13.04.2016 | |
ES | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
HR | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | FI | 13.04.2016 | |
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | LT | 13.04.2016 | |
NO | 13.07.2016 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE271657 (LEVY) [A] 1,4,13,18 * the whole document *; | [DA]GB1115727 (HARRY HALL TOMKIN) [DA] 1* the whole document *; | [XY]DE19816349 (HUEBNER FRANK-PETER [DE]) [X] 1,2,4,20-28 * column 1, line 56 - column 2, line 40; figure - * [Y] 8-13; | [Y]WO2005087153 (CONTIPI LTD [IL], et al) [Y] 8-13 * page 16, line 4 - page 17, line 16; figures 7-10 *; | [DA]WO2005087154 (CONTIPI LTD [IL], et al) [DA] 1 * page 12, line 8 - page 13, line 7; figures 3A-3D,4A-4C * * page 3, line 32 - page 4, line 1 * * page 9, line 10 - line 15 * |