Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8628500 | Global Dossier | 14.01.2014 | B2 | US2011288390 | 24.11.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201113136291 | 27.07.2011 | US93716307 | 25.06.2007 | US93721407 | 25.06.2007 | US93715507 | 25.06.2007 | US21521908 | 24.06.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8715232 | Global Dossier | 06.05.2014 | B2 | US2010106088 | 29.04.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US93716307 | 25.06.2007 | US93721407 | 25.06.2007 | US93715507 | 25.06.2007 | WO2008IL00861 | 25.06.2008 | US45218708 | 25.06.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8002752 | Global Dossier | 23.08.2011 | B2 | US2008319416 | 25.12.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US93716307 | 25.06.2007 | US93721407 | 25.06.2007 | US93715507 | 25.06.2007 | US21521908 | 24.06.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9808574 | Global Dossier | 07.11.2017 | B2 | US2008319414 | 25.12.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US93716307 | 25.06.2007 | US93721407 | 25.06.2007 | US93715507 | 25.06.2007 | US21525508 | 24.06.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2010531197 | Global Dossier | 24.09.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | US93716307 | 25.06.2007 | US93721407 | 25.06.2007 | US93715507 | 25.06.2007 | WO2008IL00860 | 25.06.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5385901B | Global Dossier | 08.01.2014 | B2 | JP2010531196 | 24.09.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | US93716307 | 25.06.2007 | US93721407 | 25.06.2007 | US93715507 | 25.06.2007 | WO2008IL00859 | 25.06.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2185223 | Global Dossier | 19.07.2017 | B1 | EP2185223 | 19.05.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US93716307 | 25.06.2007 | US93721407 | 25.06.2007 | US93715507 | 25.06.2007 | WO2008IL00859 | 25.06.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2167174 | Global Dossier | 31.03.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US93716307 | 25.06.2007 | US93721407 | 25.06.2007 | US93715507 | 25.06.2007 | WO2008IL00861 | 25.06.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2008269311 | Global Dossier | 31.12.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US93716307 | 25.06.2007 | US93721407 | 25.06.2007 | US93715507 | 25.06.2007 | WO2008IL00860 | 25.06.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2008269310 | Global Dossier | 31.12.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US93716307 | 25.06.2007 | US93721407 | 25.06.2007 | US93715507 | 25.06.2007 | WO2008IL00859 | 25.06.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2170439 | Global Dossier | 19.07.2017 | B1 | EP2170439 | 07.04.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US93716307 | 25.06.2007 | US93721407 | 25.06.2007 | US93715507 | 25.06.2007 | WO2008IL00860 | 25.06.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101784296 | 21.07.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | US93716307 | 25.06.2007 | US93721407 | 25.06.2007 | US93715507 | 25.06.2007 | WO2008IL00860 | 25.06.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101815550 | 25.08.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | US93716307 | 25.06.2007 | US93721407 | 25.06.2007 | US93715507 | 25.06.2007 | WO2008IL00859 | 25.06.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK2170439T | 28.08.2017 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US93716307 | 25.06.2007 | US93721407 | 25.06.2007 | US93715507 | 25.06.2007 | WO2008IL00860 | 25.06.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK2185223T | 28.08.2017 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US93716307 | 25.06.2007 | US93721407 | 25.06.2007 | US93715507 | 25.06.2007 | WO2008IL00859 | 25.06.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL2185223T | 31.10.2017 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US93716307 | 25.06.2007 | US93721407 | 25.06.2007 | US93715507 | 25.06.2007 | EP08763616 | 25.06.2008 | WO2008IL00859 | 25.06.2008 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2009001347 | Global Dossier | 31.12.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US93716307 | 25.06.2007 | US93721407 | 25.06.2007 | US93715507 | 25.06.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2009001346 | Global Dossier | 31.12.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US93716307 | 25.06.2007 | US93721407 | 25.06.2007 | US93715507 | 25.06.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2009001345 | Global Dossier | 31.12.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US93716307 | 25.06.2007 | US93721407 | 25.06.2007 | US93715507 | 25.06.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5820008B | Global Dossier | 24.11.2015 | B2 | JP2014128710 | 10.07.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | US93716307 | 25.06.2007 | US93721407 | 25.06.2007 | US93715507 | 25.06.2007 |