EP2170439 - A CANNULA-INSERTION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.05.2018 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.06.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] | Applicant(s) | For:DE
Roche Diabetes Care GmbH Sandhofer Strasse 116 68305 Mannheim / DE | For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HR
HU
IE
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
MT
NL
NO
PL
PT
RO
SE
SI
SK
TR
F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG Grenzacherstrasse 124 4070 Basel / CH | [2017/29] |
Former [2016/35] | For:DE
Roche Diabetes Care GmbH Sandhofer Strasse 116 68305 Mannheim / DE | ||
For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HR
HU
IE
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
MT
NL
NO
PL
PT
RO
SE
SI
SK
TR
F.Hoffmann-La Roche AG Grenzacherstrasse 124 4070 Basel / CH | |||
Former [2014/10] | For:DE
Roche Diagnostics GmbH Sandhofer Strasse 116 68305 Mannheim / DE | ||
For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HR
HU
IE
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
MT
NL
NO
PL
PT
RO
SE
SI
SK
TR
F.Hoffmann-La Roche AG Grenzacherstrasse 124 4070 Basel / CH | |||
Former [2010/14] | For all designated states Medingo Ltd. Yoqneam Industrial Park Building 7 P.O. Box 261 20692 Yoqneam Illit / IL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YODFAT, Ofer 72 Galil St. 71908 Maccabim-reut / IL | 02 /
NETA, Avraham D. N. Misgav 20103 Gilon / IL | 03 /
GESCHEIT, Illai 6 Oppenheimer St. 69395 Tel-aviv / IL | [2010/14] | Representative(s) | Evens, Paul Jonathan, et al Maguire Boss 24 East Street St. Ives, Cambridgeshire PE27 5PD / GB | [2017/29] |
Former [2010/14] | Evens, Paul Jonathan, et al Maguire Boss 24 East Street St. Ives Cambridgeshire PE27 5PD / GB | Application number, filing date | 08763617.1 | 25.06.2008 | [2010/14] | WO2008IL00860 | Priority number, date | US20070937214P | 25.06.2007 Original published format: US 937214 P | US20070937155P | 25.06.2007 Original published format: US 937155 P | US20070937163P | 25.06.2007 Original published format: US 937163 P | [2010/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009001346 | Date: | 31.12.2008 | Language: | EN | [2009/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2170439 | Date: | 07.04.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.12.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2170439 | Date: | 19.07.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.12.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A61M5/32, A61M5/14, A61M5/142, A61B5/00, A61M5/158, A61B5/145, A61M5/42 | [2017/05] | CPC: |
A61M5/14248 (EP,US);
A61B5/6849 (EP,US);
A61M5/158 (EP,US);
A61M5/422 (EP,US);
A61B5/14532 (EP,US);
A61M2005/14252 (EP,US);
A61M2005/1426 (EP,US);
A61M2005/1581 (EP,US);
A61M2005/1585 (EP,US);
A61M2205/3606 (EP,US);
A61M2205/362 (EP,US);
A61M2205/3673 (EP,US);
A61M5/1413 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2010/14] | A61M5/32, A61M5/14 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/29] |
Former [2010/14] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | KANÜLENEINSTECHVORRICHTUNG | [2017/05] | English: | A CANNULA-INSERTION DEVICE | [2010/14] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'INTRODUCTION DE CANULE | [2010/14] |
Former [2010/14] | KANÜLENEINFÜHRVORRICHTUNG | Entry into regional phase | 18.01.2010 | National basic fee paid | 18.01.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.01.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.01.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.01.2010 | Examination requested [2010/14] | 23.08.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.02.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.01.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.07.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.02.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.06.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 01.06.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.06.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.08.2011 | Opposition(s) | 20.04.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 05.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 08.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.06.2008 | AT | 19.07.2017 | CY | 19.07.2017 | CZ | 19.07.2017 | EE | 19.07.2017 | ES | 19.07.2017 | FI | 19.07.2017 | HR | 19.07.2017 | IT | 19.07.2017 | LT | 19.07.2017 | LV | 19.07.2017 | MC | 19.07.2017 | PL | 19.07.2017 | PT | 19.07.2017 | RO | 19.07.2017 | SE | 19.07.2017 | SI | 19.07.2017 | SK | 19.07.2017 | TR | 19.07.2017 | BG | 19.10.2017 | NO | 19.10.2017 | GR | 20.10.2017 | IS | 19.11.2017 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/27] | HU | 25.06.2008 | |
AT | 19.07.2017 | ||
CZ | 19.07.2017 | ||
EE | 19.07.2017 | ||
ES | 19.07.2017 | ||
FI | 19.07.2017 | ||
HR | 19.07.2017 | ||
IT | 19.07.2017 | ||
LT | 19.07.2017 | ||
LV | 19.07.2017 | ||
MC | 19.07.2017 | ||
PL | 19.07.2017 | ||
PT | 19.07.2017 | ||
RO | 19.07.2017 | ||
SE | 19.07.2017 | ||
SI | 19.07.2017 | ||
SK | 19.07.2017 | ||
TR | 19.07.2017 | ||
BG | 19.10.2017 | ||
NO | 19.10.2017 | ||
GR | 20.10.2017 | ||
IS | 19.11.2017 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AT | 19.07.2017 | |
CZ | 19.07.2017 | ||
EE | 19.07.2017 | ||
ES | 19.07.2017 | ||
FI | 19.07.2017 | ||
HR | 19.07.2017 | ||
IT | 19.07.2017 | ||
LT | 19.07.2017 | ||
LV | 19.07.2017 | ||
MC | 19.07.2017 | ||
PL | 19.07.2017 | ||
RO | 19.07.2017 | ||
SE | 19.07.2017 | ||
SI | 19.07.2017 | ||
SK | 19.07.2017 | ||
TR | 19.07.2017 | ||
BG | 19.10.2017 | ||
NO | 19.10.2017 | ||
GR | 20.10.2017 | ||
IS | 19.11.2017 | ||
Former [2019/15] | AT | 19.07.2017 | |
CZ | 19.07.2017 | ||
EE | 19.07.2017 | ||
ES | 19.07.2017 | ||
FI | 19.07.2017 | ||
HR | 19.07.2017 | ||
IT | 19.07.2017 | ||
LT | 19.07.2017 | ||
LV | 19.07.2017 | ||
MC | 19.07.2017 | ||
PL | 19.07.2017 | ||
RO | 19.07.2017 | ||
SE | 19.07.2017 | ||
SI | 19.07.2017 | ||
SK | 19.07.2017 | ||
BG | 19.10.2017 | ||
NO | 19.10.2017 | ||
GR | 20.10.2017 | ||
IS | 19.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 19.07.2017 | |
CZ | 19.07.2017 | ||
EE | 19.07.2017 | ||
ES | 19.07.2017 | ||
FI | 19.07.2017 | ||
HR | 19.07.2017 | ||
IT | 19.07.2017 | ||
LT | 19.07.2017 | ||
LV | 19.07.2017 | ||
PL | 19.07.2017 | ||
RO | 19.07.2017 | ||
SE | 19.07.2017 | ||
SI | 19.07.2017 | ||
SK | 19.07.2017 | ||
BG | 19.10.2017 | ||
NO | 19.10.2017 | ||
GR | 20.10.2017 | ||
IS | 19.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/25] | AT | 19.07.2017 | |
CZ | 19.07.2017 | ||
EE | 19.07.2017 | ||
ES | 19.07.2017 | ||
FI | 19.07.2017 | ||
HR | 19.07.2017 | ||
IT | 19.07.2017 | ||
LT | 19.07.2017 | ||
LV | 19.07.2017 | ||
PL | 19.07.2017 | ||
RO | 19.07.2017 | ||
SE | 19.07.2017 | ||
SK | 19.07.2017 | ||
BG | 19.10.2017 | ||
NO | 19.10.2017 | ||
GR | 20.10.2017 | ||
IS | 19.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 19.07.2017 | |
CZ | 19.07.2017 | ||
EE | 19.07.2017 | ||
ES | 19.07.2017 | ||
FI | 19.07.2017 | ||
HR | 19.07.2017 | ||
LT | 19.07.2017 | ||
LV | 19.07.2017 | ||
PL | 19.07.2017 | ||
RO | 19.07.2017 | ||
SE | 19.07.2017 | ||
SK | 19.07.2017 | ||
BG | 19.10.2017 | ||
NO | 19.10.2017 | ||
GR | 20.10.2017 | ||
IS | 19.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 19.07.2017 | |
CZ | 19.07.2017 | ||
ES | 19.07.2017 | ||
FI | 19.07.2017 | ||
HR | 19.07.2017 | ||
LT | 19.07.2017 | ||
LV | 19.07.2017 | ||
PL | 19.07.2017 | ||
SE | 19.07.2017 | ||
BG | 19.10.2017 | ||
NO | 19.10.2017 | ||
GR | 20.10.2017 | ||
IS | 19.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/12] | AT | 19.07.2017 | |
ES | 19.07.2017 | ||
FI | 19.07.2017 | ||
HR | 19.07.2017 | ||
LT | 19.07.2017 | ||
LV | 19.07.2017 | ||
PL | 19.07.2017 | ||
SE | 19.07.2017 | ||
BG | 19.10.2017 | ||
NO | 19.10.2017 | ||
GR | 20.10.2017 | ||
IS | 19.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 19.07.2017 | |
ES | 19.07.2017 | ||
FI | 19.07.2017 | ||
HR | 19.07.2017 | ||
LT | 19.07.2017 | ||
PL | 19.07.2017 | ||
SE | 19.07.2017 | ||
BG | 19.10.2017 | ||
NO | 19.10.2017 | ||
GR | 20.10.2017 | ||
IS | 19.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 19.07.2017 | |
FI | 19.07.2017 | ||
HR | 19.07.2017 | ||
LT | 19.07.2017 | ||
SE | 19.07.2017 | ||
NO | 19.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | FI | 19.07.2017 | |
LT | 19.07.2017 | ||
SE | 19.07.2017 | ||
NO | 19.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/08] | FI | 19.07.2017 | |
LT | 19.07.2017 | ||
NO | 19.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/07] | LT | 19.07.2017 | |
NO | 19.10.2017 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9933504 (MINIMED INC [US]) [X] 1-3,5,7-9,11-14 * abstract * * figures 30-46 * * page 1 - page 6 * * page 10 - page 17 * * page 20 - page 22 * * page 25 - page 27 *; | [X]US2004158207 (HUNN MARCEL [CH], et al) [X] 1-10,12-15 * abstract * * figures 1,2,9-18 * * paragraphs [0008] - [0021] - [0028] , [0031] - [0042] - [0064] , [0065] , [0073] , [0076] - [0081] - [0088] *; | [X]US2005101932 (COTE STEVE [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5,7-10,13,14 * abstract * * figures 54-104 * * paragraphs [0001] - [0012] - [0133] , [0134] , [0139] , [0141] , [0145] , [0147] , [0148] , [0153] , [0164] , [0166] * * paragraphs [0178] - [0190] - [0202] - [0241] *; | [X]US2006020189 (BRISTER MARK [US], et al) [X] 1-12,14 * abstract * * figures 1-4,6-12 * * paragraphs [0005] - [0025] - [0089] - [0091] - [0097] , [0123] , [0177] - [0197] - [0205] *; | [PX]WO2008012817 (MEDINGO LTD [IL], et al) [PX] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [PX]WO2008065646 (MEDINGO LTD [IL], et al) [PX] 1-15* the whole document * | Examination | EP1704889 | WO2008014792 | by applicant | US4755173 | US5176662 | US5257980 | US5390671 | US5568806 | US5586553 | US6093172 | US6143164 | US6699218 | US6830562 | US7110803 | US20080483707 | WO2007IL00163 | US20070706606 | US20070937155 | WO2007IL00932 | WO2007IL01096 | WO2007IL01177 | WO2007IL01454 | WO2007IL01578 | WO2007IL01579 | US20070963481 | US20080116546 |