06.03.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] |
11.10.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.11.2019 [2019/46] |
28.06.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 31.07.2019 [2019/31] |
21.09.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.10.2018 [2018/43] |
04.05.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.06.2018 [2018/23] |
20.04.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.05.2018 [2018/21] |
23.03.2018 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 25.04.2018 [2018/17] |
23.02.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.03.2018 [2018/13] |
05.01.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.02.2018 [2018/06] |
24.11.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.12.2017 [2017/52] |
29.09.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.11.2017 [2017/44] |
08.09.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.10.2017 [2017/41] |
01.09.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.10.2017 [2017/40] |
18.08.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.09.2017 [2017/38] |
11.08.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.09.2017 [2017/37] |
04.08.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.09.2017 [2017/36] |
28.07.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.08.2017 [2017/35] |
21.07.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.08.2017 [2017/34] |
21.07.2017 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 23.08.2017 [2017/34] |
07.07.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.08.2017 [2017/32] |
21.04.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.05.2017 [2017/21] |
24.02.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.03.2017 [2017/13] |
17.02.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.03.2017 [2017/12] |
10.02.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.03.2017 [2017/11] |
03.02.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.03.2017 [2017/10] |
27.01.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.03.2017 [2017/09] |
13.01.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.02.2017 [2017/07] |
12.08.2016 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 14.09.2016 [2016/37] |
09.08.2016 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
09.08.2016 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
03.08.2016 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
28.03.2016 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
23.03.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
22.01.2016 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
24.09.2015 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
17.06.2015 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
29.05.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
13.03.2015 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
27.02.2015 |
First examination report |
|
10.02.2015 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
27.06.2014 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 30.07.2014 [2014/31] |
27.06.2014 |
Change - classification |
published on 30.07.2014 [2014/31] |
27.06.2014 |
Change - classification |
published on 30.07.2014 [2014/31] |
28.03.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
03.06.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
29.03.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
27.05.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
16.07.2010 |
Change - extension states |
published on 18.08.2010 [2010/33] |
01.04.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
15.01.2010 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 17.02.2010 [2010/07] |
15.01.2010 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 17.02.2010 [2010/07] |
05.01.2010 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
29.12.2009 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
10.12.2009 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
05.12.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
22.11.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
11.11.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|