EP2153974 - BIAXIALLY ORIENTED POLYARYLENE SULFIDE FILM AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.07.2017 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toray Industries, Inc. 1-1, Nihonbashi-Muromachi 2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo, 103-8666 / JP | [2010/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MACHIDA, Tetsuya c/o Shiga Plant Toray Industries Inc. 1-1 Sonoyama 1-chome Otsu-shi Shiga 520-8558 / JP | 02 /
OHKURA, Masatoshi c/o Shiga Plant Toray Industries Inc. 1-1 Sonoyama 1-chome Otsu-shi Shiga 520-8558 / JP | 03 /
IMANISHI, Yasuyuki c/o Shiga Plant Toray Industries Inc. 1-1 Sonoyama 1-chome Otsu-shi Shiga 520-8558 / JP | [2016/37] |
Former [2010/07] | 01 /
MACHIDA, Tetsuya c/o Shiga Plant Toray Industries Inc. 1-1 Sonoyama 1-chome Otsu-shi Shiga 520-8558 / JP | ||
02 /
OHKURA, Masatoshi c/o Shiga Plant Toray Industries Inc. 1-1 Sonoyama 1-chome Otsu-shi Shiga 520-8558 / JP | |||
03 /
IMANISHI, Yasuyuki c/o Shiga Plant Toray Industries Inc. 1-1 Sonoyama 1-chome Otsu-shi Shiga 520-8558 / JP | Representative(s) | Webster, Jeremy Mark, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/37] | Webster, Jeremy Mark, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | ||
Former [2010/07] | Webster, Jeremy Mark, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane GB-London EC2V 8AS / GB | Application number, filing date | 08764257.5 | 07.05.2008 | [2010/07] | WO2008JP58460 | Priority number, date | JP20070124340 | 09.05.2007 Original published format: JP 2007124340 | [2010/07] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008139989 | Date: | 20.11.2008 | Language: | JA | [2008/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2153974 | Date: | 17.02.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2153974 | Date: | 14.09.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 20.11.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.06.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B29C55/12, C08J5/18, B29K81/00, B29L7/00 | [2010/07] | CPC: |
B29C55/143 (EP,KR,US);
C08J5/18 (EP,KR,US);
B29D7/01 (KR);
C08L81/02 (KR);
B29K2081/04 (EP,KR,US);
C08J2381/02 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/37] |
Former [2010/07] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | BIAXIAL AUSGERICHTETER POLYARYLENSULFIDFILM UND DESSEN HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN | [2010/07] | English: | BIAXIALLY ORIENTED POLYARYLENE SULFIDE FILM AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THE SAME | [2010/07] | French: | FILM DE SULFURE DE POLYARYLENE A ORIENTATION BIAXIALE ET PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION DE CELUI-CI | [2010/07] | Entry into regional phase | 26.11.2009 | Translation filed | 27.11.2009 | National basic fee paid | 27.11.2009 | Search fee paid | 27.11.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.11.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.11.2009 | Examination requested [2010/07] | 13.01.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.03.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.06.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.09.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.01.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.03.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.08.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 05.08.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 05.08.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.03.2015 | Opposition(s) | 15.06.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 21.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.05.2008 | AT | 14.09.2016 | BE | 14.09.2016 | CY | 14.09.2016 | CZ | 14.09.2016 | DK | 14.09.2016 | EE | 14.09.2016 | ES | 14.09.2016 | FI | 14.09.2016 | HR | 14.09.2016 | IT | 14.09.2016 | LT | 14.09.2016 | LV | 14.09.2016 | MC | 14.09.2016 | NL | 14.09.2016 | PL | 14.09.2016 | RO | 14.09.2016 | SE | 14.09.2016 | SI | 14.09.2016 | SK | 14.09.2016 | TR | 14.09.2016 | BG | 14.12.2016 | NO | 14.12.2016 | GR | 15.12.2016 | IS | 14.01.2017 | PT | 16.01.2017 | GB | 07.05.2017 | IE | 07.05.2017 | LU | 07.05.2017 | MT | 07.05.2017 | CH | 31.05.2017 | LI | 31.05.2017 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/46] | HU | 07.05.2008 | |
AT | 14.09.2016 | ||
BE | 14.09.2016 | ||
CY | 14.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.09.2016 | ||
DK | 14.09.2016 | ||
EE | 14.09.2016 | ||
ES | 14.09.2016 | ||
FI | 14.09.2016 | ||
HR | 14.09.2016 | ||
IT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LV | 14.09.2016 | ||
MC | 14.09.2016 | ||
NL | 14.09.2016 | ||
PL | 14.09.2016 | ||
RO | 14.09.2016 | ||
SE | 14.09.2016 | ||
SI | 14.09.2016 | ||
SK | 14.09.2016 | ||
BG | 14.12.2016 | ||
NO | 14.12.2016 | ||
GR | 15.12.2016 | ||
IS | 14.01.2017 | ||
PT | 16.01.2017 | ||
GB | 07.05.2017 | ||
IE | 07.05.2017 | ||
LU | 07.05.2017 | ||
MT | 07.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 07.05.2008 | |
AT | 14.09.2016 | ||
BE | 14.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.09.2016 | ||
DK | 14.09.2016 | ||
EE | 14.09.2016 | ||
ES | 14.09.2016 | ||
FI | 14.09.2016 | ||
HR | 14.09.2016 | ||
IT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LV | 14.09.2016 | ||
MC | 14.09.2016 | ||
NL | 14.09.2016 | ||
PL | 14.09.2016 | ||
RO | 14.09.2016 | ||
SE | 14.09.2016 | ||
SI | 14.09.2016 | ||
SK | 14.09.2016 | ||
BG | 14.12.2016 | ||
NO | 14.12.2016 | ||
GR | 15.12.2016 | ||
IS | 14.01.2017 | ||
PT | 16.01.2017 | ||
GB | 07.05.2017 | ||
IE | 07.05.2017 | ||
LU | 07.05.2017 | ||
MT | 07.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 14.09.2016 | |
BE | 14.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.09.2016 | ||
DK | 14.09.2016 | ||
EE | 14.09.2016 | ||
ES | 14.09.2016 | ||
FI | 14.09.2016 | ||
HR | 14.09.2016 | ||
IT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LV | 14.09.2016 | ||
MC | 14.09.2016 | ||
NL | 14.09.2016 | ||
PL | 14.09.2016 | ||
RO | 14.09.2016 | ||
SE | 14.09.2016 | ||
SI | 14.09.2016 | ||
SK | 14.09.2016 | ||
BG | 14.12.2016 | ||
NO | 14.12.2016 | ||
GR | 15.12.2016 | ||
IS | 14.01.2017 | ||
PT | 16.01.2017 | ||
GB | 07.05.2017 | ||
IE | 07.05.2017 | ||
LU | 07.05.2017 | ||
MT | 07.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 14.09.2016 | |
BE | 14.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.09.2016 | ||
DK | 14.09.2016 | ||
EE | 14.09.2016 | ||
ES | 14.09.2016 | ||
FI | 14.09.2016 | ||
HR | 14.09.2016 | ||
IT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LV | 14.09.2016 | ||
MC | 14.09.2016 | ||
NL | 14.09.2016 | ||
PL | 14.09.2016 | ||
RO | 14.09.2016 | ||
SE | 14.09.2016 | ||
SI | 14.09.2016 | ||
SK | 14.09.2016 | ||
BG | 14.12.2016 | ||
NO | 14.12.2016 | ||
GR | 15.12.2016 | ||
IS | 14.01.2017 | ||
PT | 16.01.2017 | ||
GB | 07.05.2017 | ||
IE | 07.05.2017 | ||
LU | 07.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 14.09.2016 | |
BE | 14.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.09.2016 | ||
DK | 14.09.2016 | ||
EE | 14.09.2016 | ||
ES | 14.09.2016 | ||
FI | 14.09.2016 | ||
HR | 14.09.2016 | ||
IT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LV | 14.09.2016 | ||
MC | 14.09.2016 | ||
NL | 14.09.2016 | ||
PL | 14.09.2016 | ||
RO | 14.09.2016 | ||
SE | 14.09.2016 | ||
SI | 14.09.2016 | ||
SK | 14.09.2016 | ||
BG | 14.12.2016 | ||
NO | 14.12.2016 | ||
GR | 15.12.2016 | ||
IS | 14.01.2017 | ||
PT | 16.01.2017 | ||
GB | 07.05.2017 | ||
LU | 07.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/17] | AT | 14.09.2016 | |
BE | 14.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.09.2016 | ||
DK | 14.09.2016 | ||
EE | 14.09.2016 | ||
ES | 14.09.2016 | ||
FI | 14.09.2016 | ||
HR | 14.09.2016 | ||
IT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LV | 14.09.2016 | ||
MC | 14.09.2016 | ||
NL | 14.09.2016 | ||
PL | 14.09.2016 | ||
RO | 14.09.2016 | ||
SE | 14.09.2016 | ||
SI | 14.09.2016 | ||
SK | 14.09.2016 | ||
BG | 14.12.2016 | ||
NO | 14.12.2016 | ||
GR | 15.12.2016 | ||
IS | 14.01.2017 | ||
PT | 16.01.2017 | ||
LU | 07.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/13] | AT | 14.09.2016 | |
BE | 14.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.09.2016 | ||
DK | 14.09.2016 | ||
EE | 14.09.2016 | ||
ES | 14.09.2016 | ||
FI | 14.09.2016 | ||
HR | 14.09.2016 | ||
IT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LV | 14.09.2016 | ||
MC | 14.09.2016 | ||
NL | 14.09.2016 | ||
PL | 14.09.2016 | ||
RO | 14.09.2016 | ||
SE | 14.09.2016 | ||
SI | 14.09.2016 | ||
SK | 14.09.2016 | ||
BG | 14.12.2016 | ||
NO | 14.12.2016 | ||
GR | 15.12.2016 | ||
IS | 14.01.2017 | ||
PT | 16.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/06] | AT | 14.09.2016 | |
BE | 14.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.09.2016 | ||
DK | 14.09.2016 | ||
EE | 14.09.2016 | ||
ES | 14.09.2016 | ||
FI | 14.09.2016 | ||
HR | 14.09.2016 | ||
IT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LV | 14.09.2016 | ||
MC | 14.09.2016 | ||
NL | 14.09.2016 | ||
PL | 14.09.2016 | ||
RO | 14.09.2016 | ||
SE | 14.09.2016 | ||
SI | 14.09.2016 | ||
SK | 14.09.2016 | ||
BG | 14.12.2016 | ||
NO | 14.12.2016 | ||
GR | 15.12.2016 | ||
IS | 14.01.2017 | ||
PT | 16.01.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | AT | 14.09.2016 | |
BE | 14.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.09.2016 | ||
DK | 14.09.2016 | ||
EE | 14.09.2016 | ||
ES | 14.09.2016 | ||
FI | 14.09.2016 | ||
HR | 14.09.2016 | ||
IT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LV | 14.09.2016 | ||
NL | 14.09.2016 | ||
PL | 14.09.2016 | ||
RO | 14.09.2016 | ||
SE | 14.09.2016 | ||
SI | 14.09.2016 | ||
SK | 14.09.2016 | ||
BG | 14.12.2016 | ||
NO | 14.12.2016 | ||
GR | 15.12.2016 | ||
IS | 14.01.2017 | ||
PT | 16.01.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/36] | AT | 14.09.2016 | |
BE | 14.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.09.2016 | ||
DK | 14.09.2016 | ||
EE | 14.09.2016 | ||
ES | 14.09.2016 | ||
FI | 14.09.2016 | ||
HR | 14.09.2016 | ||
IT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LV | 14.09.2016 | ||
NL | 14.09.2016 | ||
PL | 14.09.2016 | ||
RO | 14.09.2016 | ||
SE | 14.09.2016 | ||
SK | 14.09.2016 | ||
BG | 14.12.2016 | ||
NO | 14.12.2016 | ||
GR | 15.12.2016 | ||
IS | 14.01.2017 | ||
PT | 16.01.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/34] | AT | 14.09.2016 | |
BE | 14.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.09.2016 | ||
DK | 14.09.2016 | ||
EE | 14.09.2016 | ||
ES | 14.09.2016 | ||
FI | 14.09.2016 | ||
HR | 14.09.2016 | ||
IT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LV | 14.09.2016 | ||
NL | 14.09.2016 | ||
PL | 14.09.2016 | ||
RO | 14.09.2016 | ||
SE | 14.09.2016 | ||
SK | 14.09.2016 | ||
BG | 14.12.2016 | ||
NO | 14.12.2016 | ||
GR | 15.12.2016 | ||
IS | 14.01.2017 | ||
PT | 16.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/32] | AT | 14.09.2016 | |
BE | 14.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.09.2016 | ||
EE | 14.09.2016 | ||
ES | 14.09.2016 | ||
FI | 14.09.2016 | ||
HR | 14.09.2016 | ||
IT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LV | 14.09.2016 | ||
NL | 14.09.2016 | ||
PL | 14.09.2016 | ||
RO | 14.09.2016 | ||
SE | 14.09.2016 | ||
SK | 14.09.2016 | ||
BG | 14.12.2016 | ||
NO | 14.12.2016 | ||
GR | 15.12.2016 | ||
IS | 14.01.2017 | ||
PT | 16.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/13] | ES | 14.09.2016 | |
FI | 14.09.2016 | ||
HR | 14.09.2016 | ||
LT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LV | 14.09.2016 | ||
NL | 14.09.2016 | ||
SE | 14.09.2016 | ||
NO | 14.12.2016 | ||
GR | 15.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | ES | 14.09.2016 | |
FI | 14.09.2016 | ||
HR | 14.09.2016 | ||
LT | 14.09.2016 | ||
SE | 14.09.2016 | ||
NO | 14.12.2016 | ||
GR | 15.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | FI | 14.09.2016 | |
HR | 14.09.2016 | ||
LT | 14.09.2016 | ||
SE | 14.09.2016 | ||
NO | 14.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | FI | 14.09.2016 | |
LT | 14.09.2016 | ||
NO | 14.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | LT | 14.09.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4629778 (SUGIE TOSHINORI [JP], et al) [X] 1-10* example 3, table 3 * | International search | [Y]JPS57205118 (TORAY INDUSTRIES); | [X]JPH02117925 (TORAY INDUSTRIES); | [A]JPH04142918 (TOYO BOSEKI); | [X]JPH06322151 (TORAY INDUSTRIES); | [A]JP2003199734 (KONISHIROKU PHOTO IND); | [X]JP2007098941 (TORAY INDUSTRIES); | [XP]WO2007129721 (TORAY INDUSTRIES [JP], et al) | by applicant | JPS453368B | JPS5212240B | JPS5535456 | JPS59155462 | JPS617332 | JPS62121761 | JPS63189458 | JPS63260426 | JPH0381367 | JPH04146935 | JPH06305019 | JP2001302918 |