EP2150794 - KNOCKING DETERMINATION DEVICE AND KNOCKING DETERMINATION METHOD FOR INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.09.2016 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG | published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | [2015/46] |
Former [2013/08] | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | ||
Former [2010/06] | For all designated states Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi 471-8571 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KANEKO, Rihito c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi 471-8571 / JP | 02 /
KASASHIMA, Kenji c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi 471-8571 / JP | 03 /
YOSHIHARA, Masatomo c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi 471-8571 / JP | 04 /
SENDA, Kenji c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi 471-8571 / JP | 05 /
HANAI, Norihito c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi 471-8571 / JP | 06 /
YAMASAKO, Yasuhiro c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi 471-8571 / JP | 07 /
TAKEMURA, Yuichi c/o DENSO CORPORATION 1-1 Showa-cho Kariya-shi Aichi 448-8661 / JP | [2014/28] |
Former [2014/26] | 01 /
KANEKO, Rihito c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi 471-8571 / JP | ||
02 /
KASASHIMA, Kenji c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi 471-8571 / JP | |||
03 /
YOSHIHARA, Masatomo c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi 471-8571 / JP | |||
04 /
SENDA, Kenji c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi 471-8571 / JP | |||
05 /
HANAI, Norihito c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi 471-8571 / JP | |||
06 /
YAMASAKO, Yasuhiro c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi 471-8571 / JP | |||
07 /
TAKEMURA, Yuichi c/o DENSO CORPORATION 1-1 Showa-cho Kariya-shi Aichi 448-8661 / JP | |||
Former [2010/06] | 01 /
KANEKO, Rihito c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1 Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi 471-8571 / JP | ||
02 /
KASASHIMA, Kenji c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1 Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi 471-8571 / JP | |||
03 /
YOSHIHARA, Masatomo c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1 Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi 471-8571 / JP | |||
04 /
SENDA, Kenji c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1 Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi 471-8571 / JP | |||
05 /
HANAI, Norihito c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1 Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi 471-8571 / JP | |||
06 /
YAMASAKO, Yasuhiro c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1 Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi 471-8571 / JP | |||
07 /
TAKEMURA, Yuichi c/o DENSO CORPORATION 1-1 Showa-cho Kariya-shi Aichi 448-8661 / JP | Representative(s) | Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro PartG mbB Prinz-Ludwig-Straße 40A 85354 Freising / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/38] | Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro Prinz-Ludwig-Straße 40A 85354 Freising / DE | ||
Former [2010/06] | Topf, Michael Klaus Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro Prinz-Ludwig-Strasse 40A 85354 Freising / DE | Application number, filing date | 08764967.9 | 27.05.2008 | [2010/06] | WO2008JP60118 | Priority number, date | JP20070143883 | 30.05.2007 Original published format: JP 2007143883 | [2010/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008149832 | Date: | 11.12.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2150794 | Date: | 10.02.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.12.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2150794 | Date: | 11.11.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.12.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G01L23/22 | [2010/06] | CPC: |
G01L23/225 (EP,US);
G01L23/22 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/46] |
Former [2010/06] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | KLOPFBESTIMMUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND KLOPFBESTIMMUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR EINEN VERBRENNUNGSMOTOR | [2010/06] | English: | KNOCKING DETERMINATION DEVICE AND KNOCKING DETERMINATION METHOD FOR INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE | [2010/06] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ PERMETTANT DE DÉCELER UN COGNEMENT POUR MOTEUR À COMBUSTION INTERNE | [2010/06] | Entry into regional phase | 30.12.2009 | National basic fee paid | 30.12.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.12.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.12.2008 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 30.12.2009 | Examination requested [2010/06] | 02.07.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.11.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.06.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.09.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 29.09.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.09.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.07.2010 | Opposition(s) | 12.08.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.05.2008 | AT | 11.11.2015 | BE | 11.11.2015 | BG | 11.11.2015 | CY | 11.11.2015 | CZ | 11.11.2015 | DK | 11.11.2015 | EE | 11.11.2015 | ES | 11.11.2015 | FI | 11.11.2015 | HR | 11.11.2015 | IT | 11.11.2015 | LT | 11.11.2015 | LV | 11.11.2015 | MC | 11.11.2015 | NL | 11.11.2015 | PL | 11.11.2015 | RO | 11.11.2015 | SE | 11.11.2015 | SI | 11.11.2015 | SK | 11.11.2015 | TR | 11.11.2015 | NO | 11.02.2016 | GR | 12.02.2016 | IS | 11.03.2016 | PT | 11.03.2016 | GB | 27.05.2016 | IE | 27.05.2016 | LU | 27.05.2016 | CH | 31.05.2016 | LI | 31.05.2016 | MT | 31.05.2016 | [2018/38] |
Former [2018/32] | HU | 27.05.2008 | |
AT | 11.11.2015 | ||
BE | 11.11.2015 | ||
CY | 11.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 11.11.2015 | ||
DK | 11.11.2015 | ||
EE | 11.11.2015 | ||
ES | 11.11.2015 | ||
FI | 11.11.2015 | ||
HR | 11.11.2015 | ||
IT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LV | 11.11.2015 | ||
MC | 11.11.2015 | ||
NL | 11.11.2015 | ||
PL | 11.11.2015 | ||
RO | 11.11.2015 | ||
SE | 11.11.2015 | ||
SI | 11.11.2015 | ||
SK | 11.11.2015 | ||
TR | 11.11.2015 | ||
NO | 11.02.2016 | ||
GR | 12.02.2016 | ||
IS | 11.03.2016 | ||
PT | 11.03.2016 | ||
GB | 27.05.2016 | ||
IE | 27.05.2016 | ||
LU | 27.05.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
MT | 31.05.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 27.05.2008 | |
AT | 11.11.2015 | ||
BE | 11.11.2015 | ||
CY | 11.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 11.11.2015 | ||
DK | 11.11.2015 | ||
EE | 11.11.2015 | ||
ES | 11.11.2015 | ||
FI | 11.11.2015 | ||
HR | 11.11.2015 | ||
IT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LV | 11.11.2015 | ||
MC | 11.11.2015 | ||
NL | 11.11.2015 | ||
PL | 11.11.2015 | ||
RO | 11.11.2015 | ||
SE | 11.11.2015 | ||
SI | 11.11.2015 | ||
SK | 11.11.2015 | ||
TR | 11.11.2015 | ||
NO | 11.02.2016 | ||
GR | 12.02.2016 | ||
IS | 11.03.2016 | ||
PT | 11.03.2016 | ||
GB | 27.05.2016 | ||
IE | 27.05.2016 | ||
LU | 27.05.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 27.05.2008 | |
AT | 11.11.2015 | ||
BE | 11.11.2015 | ||
CY | 11.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 11.11.2015 | ||
DK | 11.11.2015 | ||
EE | 11.11.2015 | ||
ES | 11.11.2015 | ||
FI | 11.11.2015 | ||
HR | 11.11.2015 | ||
IT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LV | 11.11.2015 | ||
MC | 11.11.2015 | ||
NL | 11.11.2015 | ||
PL | 11.11.2015 | ||
RO | 11.11.2015 | ||
SE | 11.11.2015 | ||
SI | 11.11.2015 | ||
SK | 11.11.2015 | ||
NO | 11.02.2016 | ||
GR | 12.02.2016 | ||
IS | 11.03.2016 | ||
PT | 11.03.2016 | ||
GB | 27.05.2016 | ||
IE | 27.05.2016 | ||
LU | 27.05.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/36] | AT | 11.11.2015 | |
BE | 11.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 11.11.2015 | ||
DK | 11.11.2015 | ||
EE | 11.11.2015 | ||
ES | 11.11.2015 | ||
FI | 11.11.2015 | ||
HR | 11.11.2015 | ||
IT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LV | 11.11.2015 | ||
NL | 11.11.2015 | ||
PL | 11.11.2015 | ||
RO | 11.11.2015 | ||
SE | 11.11.2015 | ||
SI | 11.11.2015 | ||
SK | 11.11.2015 | ||
NO | 11.02.2016 | ||
GR | 12.02.2016 | ||
IS | 11.03.2016 | ||
PT | 11.03.2016 | ||
GB | 27.05.2016 | ||
IE | 27.05.2016 | ||
LU | 27.05.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 11.11.2015 | |
BE | 11.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 11.11.2015 | ||
DK | 11.11.2015 | ||
EE | 11.11.2015 | ||
ES | 11.11.2015 | ||
FI | 11.11.2015 | ||
HR | 11.11.2015 | ||
IT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LV | 11.11.2015 | ||
NL | 11.11.2015 | ||
PL | 11.11.2015 | ||
RO | 11.11.2015 | ||
SE | 11.11.2015 | ||
SI | 11.11.2015 | ||
SK | 11.11.2015 | ||
NO | 11.02.2016 | ||
GR | 12.02.2016 | ||
IS | 11.03.2016 | ||
PT | 11.03.2016 | ||
LU | 27.05.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/04] | AT | 11.11.2015 | |
BE | 11.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 11.11.2015 | ||
DK | 11.11.2015 | ||
EE | 11.11.2015 | ||
ES | 11.11.2015 | ||
FI | 11.11.2015 | ||
HR | 11.11.2015 | ||
IT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LV | 11.11.2015 | ||
NL | 11.11.2015 | ||
PL | 11.11.2015 | ||
RO | 11.11.2015 | ||
SE | 11.11.2015 | ||
SI | 11.11.2015 | ||
SK | 11.11.2015 | ||
NO | 11.02.2016 | ||
GR | 12.02.2016 | ||
IS | 11.03.2016 | ||
PT | 11.03.2016 | ||
LU | 27.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 11.11.2015 | |
BE | 11.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 11.11.2015 | ||
DK | 11.11.2015 | ||
EE | 11.11.2015 | ||
ES | 11.11.2015 | ||
FI | 11.11.2015 | ||
HR | 11.11.2015 | ||
IT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LV | 11.11.2015 | ||
NL | 11.11.2015 | ||
PL | 11.11.2015 | ||
RO | 11.11.2015 | ||
SE | 11.11.2015 | ||
SI | 11.11.2015 | ||
SK | 11.11.2015 | ||
NO | 11.02.2016 | ||
GR | 12.02.2016 | ||
IS | 11.03.2016 | ||
PT | 11.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 11.11.2015 | |
CZ | 11.11.2015 | ||
DK | 11.11.2015 | ||
EE | 11.11.2015 | ||
ES | 11.11.2015 | ||
FI | 11.11.2015 | ||
HR | 11.11.2015 | ||
IT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LV | 11.11.2015 | ||
NL | 11.11.2015 | ||
PL | 11.11.2015 | ||
RO | 11.11.2015 | ||
SE | 11.11.2015 | ||
SI | 11.11.2015 | ||
SK | 11.11.2015 | ||
NO | 11.02.2016 | ||
GR | 12.02.2016 | ||
IS | 11.03.2016 | ||
PT | 11.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | AT | 11.11.2015 | |
CZ | 11.11.2015 | ||
DK | 11.11.2015 | ||
EE | 11.11.2015 | ||
ES | 11.11.2015 | ||
FI | 11.11.2015 | ||
HR | 11.11.2015 | ||
IT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LV | 11.11.2015 | ||
NL | 11.11.2015 | ||
PL | 11.11.2015 | ||
RO | 11.11.2015 | ||
SE | 11.11.2015 | ||
SK | 11.11.2015 | ||
NO | 11.02.2016 | ||
GR | 12.02.2016 | ||
IS | 11.03.2016 | ||
PT | 11.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 11.11.2015 | |
CZ | 11.11.2015 | ||
EE | 11.11.2015 | ||
ES | 11.11.2015 | ||
FI | 11.11.2015 | ||
HR | 11.11.2015 | ||
IT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LV | 11.11.2015 | ||
NL | 11.11.2015 | ||
PL | 11.11.2015 | ||
RO | 11.11.2015 | ||
SE | 11.11.2015 | ||
SK | 11.11.2015 | ||
NO | 11.02.2016 | ||
GR | 12.02.2016 | ||
IS | 11.03.2016 | ||
PT | 11.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/34] | AT | 11.11.2015 | |
CZ | 11.11.2015 | ||
ES | 11.11.2015 | ||
FI | 11.11.2015 | ||
HR | 11.11.2015 | ||
IT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LV | 11.11.2015 | ||
NL | 11.11.2015 | ||
PL | 11.11.2015 | ||
SE | 11.11.2015 | ||
NO | 11.02.2016 | ||
GR | 12.02.2016 | ||
IS | 11.03.2016 | ||
PT | 11.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 11.11.2015 | |
ES | 11.11.2015 | ||
FI | 11.11.2015 | ||
HR | 11.11.2015 | ||
IT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LV | 11.11.2015 | ||
NL | 11.11.2015 | ||
PL | 11.11.2015 | ||
SE | 11.11.2015 | ||
NO | 11.02.2016 | ||
GR | 12.02.2016 | ||
IS | 11.03.2016 | ||
PT | 11.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 11.11.2015 | |
ES | 11.11.2015 | ||
FI | 11.11.2015 | ||
HR | 11.11.2015 | ||
IT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LT | 11.11.2015 | ||
NL | 11.11.2015 | ||
PL | 11.11.2015 | ||
SE | 11.11.2015 | ||
NO | 11.02.2016 | ||
GR | 12.02.2016 | ||
IS | 11.03.2016 | ||
PT | 11.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | ES | 11.11.2015 | |
HR | 11.11.2015 | ||
IT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LT | 11.11.2015 | ||
NL | 11.11.2015 | ||
SE | 11.11.2015 | ||
NO | 11.02.2016 | ||
IS | 11.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/22] | ES | 11.11.2015 | |
IT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LT | 11.11.2015 | ||
NL | 11.11.2015 | ||
NO | 11.02.2016 | ||
IS | 11.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/21] | ES | 11.11.2015 | |
IT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LT | 11.11.2015 | ||
NO | 11.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/20] | ES | 11.11.2015 | |
LT | 11.11.2015 | Cited in | International search | [X]US2007000307 (YOSHIHARA MASATOMO [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,10,11,19,20 * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0053]; figures 1,8 *; | [X]US2006142925 (KANEKO RIHITO [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,10,11,19,20 * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0074]; figures 1-7 *; | [X]US2006136117 (KANEKO RIHITO [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,10,11,19,20 * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0079]; figures 1-9 *; | [A]US2004074476 (UCHIDA TOSHIO [JP], et al) [A] 1-27 * figures 4,5 *; | [A]EP0454486 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [A] 1-27 * page 5, line 37 - page 8, line 5; figures 1-6 *; | [A]US2001052336 (TANAYA KIMIHIKO [JP], et al) [A] 1-27 * paragraph [0051] - paragraph [0092]; figures 1-3 *; | [A]JPH11270400 (UNISIA JECS CORP) [A] 1-27 * abstract *; | [PX]WO2008001939 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP], et al) [PX] 1-27 * figures 1-21; claims 1-54 * | by applicant | JP2005330954 | US2007000307 | US2006142925 | US2006136117 | US2004074476 | EP0454486 | US2001052336 |