EP2154903 - MOBILE COMMUNICATION SYSTEM, BASE STATION DEVICE, AND MOBILE STATION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.03.2016 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.12.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 10.01.2018 [2018/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22, Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 545-8522 / JP | [2015/20] |
Former [2010/07] | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22, Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 545-8522 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YAMADA, Shohei c/o Sharp kabushiki Kaisha 22-22, Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 545-8522 / JP | 02 /
KATO, Yasuyuki c/o Sharp kabushiki Kaisha 22-22, Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 545-8522 / JP | [2015/11] |
Former [2010/07] | 01 /
YAMADA, Shohei c/o Sharp kabushiki Kaisha 22-22, Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 545-8522 / JP | ||
02 /
KATO, Yasuyuki c/o Sharp kabushiki Kaisha 22-22, Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 545-8522 / JP | Representative(s) | Müller Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB St.-Martin-Straße 58 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/20] | Müller Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB St.-Martin-Strasse 58 81541 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/07] | Müller - Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte Innere Wiener Strasse 17 81667 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08764997.6 | 03.06.2008 | [2010/07] | WO2008JP60184 | Priority number, date | JP20070150992 | 06.06.2007 Original published format: JP 2007150992 | JP20080021557 | 31.01.2008 Original published format: JP 2008021557 | [2010/07] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008149849 | Date: | 11.12.2008 | Language: | JA | [2008/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2154903 | Date: | 17.02.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2154903 | Date: | 13.05.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 11.12.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.06.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H04W74/08, H04J11/00, H04W74/00, // H04W56/00, H04W72/04 | [2015/09] | CPC: |
H04W74/0833 (EP,US);
H04L5/0057 (US);
H04W74/002 (EP,US);
H04W74/0866 (EP,US);
H04W72/20 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2010/27] | H04W74/08, H04J11/00, H04W4/00, // H04W56/00 | ||
Former IPC [2010/08] | H04W84/00, H04J11/00, H04W4/00 | ||
Former IPC [2010/07] | H04Q7/20, H04J11/00, H04Q7/38 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/20] |
Former [2010/07] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | MOBILES KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM SOWIE BASISSTATION UND MOBILSTATION DAFÜR | [2010/07] | English: | MOBILE COMMUNICATION SYSTEM, BASE STATION DEVICE, AND MOBILE STATION DEVICE | [2010/07] | French: | SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION MOBILE, DISPOSITIF DE STATION DE BASE ET DISPOSITIF DE STATION MOBILE | [2010/07] | Entry into regional phase | 24.09.2009 | Translation filed | 24.09.2009 | National basic fee paid | 24.09.2009 | Search fee paid | 24.09.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.09.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.09.2009 | Examination requested [2010/07] | 22.12.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.10.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.02.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.06.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.10.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.12.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.03.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.02.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.04.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 01.04.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.04.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP13004450.6 / EP2685778 | EP15001298.7 / EP2953416 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.10.2011 | Opposition(s) | 16.02.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 03.06.2008 | AT | 13.05.2015 | BE | 13.05.2015 | CY | 13.05.2015 | CZ | 13.05.2015 | DK | 13.05.2015 | EE | 13.05.2015 | ES | 13.05.2015 | FI | 13.05.2015 | HR | 13.05.2015 | IT | 13.05.2015 | LT | 13.05.2015 | LV | 13.05.2015 | MC | 13.05.2015 | MT | 13.05.2015 | PL | 13.05.2015 | RO | 13.05.2015 | SE | 13.05.2015 | SI | 13.05.2015 | SK | 13.05.2015 | TR | 13.05.2015 | IE | 03.06.2015 | LU | 03.06.2015 | CH | 30.06.2015 | LI | 30.06.2015 | BG | 13.08.2015 | NO | 13.08.2015 | GR | 14.08.2015 | IS | 13.09.2015 | PT | 14.09.2015 | [2018/02] |
Former [2017/39] | HU | 03.06.2008 | |
AT | 13.05.2015 | ||
BE | 13.05.2015 | ||
CY | 13.05.2015 | ||
CZ | 13.05.2015 | ||
DK | 13.05.2015 | ||
EE | 13.05.2015 | ||
ES | 13.05.2015 | ||
FI | 13.05.2015 | ||
HR | 13.05.2015 | ||
IT | 13.05.2015 | ||
LT | 13.05.2015 | ||
LV | 13.05.2015 | ||
MC | 13.05.2015 | ||
MT | 13.05.2015 | ||
PL | 13.05.2015 | ||
RO | 13.05.2015 | ||
SE | 13.05.2015 | ||
SI | 13.05.2015 | ||
SK | 13.05.2015 | ||
TR | 13.05.2015 | ||
IE | 03.06.2015 | ||
CH | 30.06.2015 | ||
LI | 30.06.2015 | ||
BG | 13.08.2015 | ||
NO | 13.08.2015 | ||
GR | 14.08.2015 | ||
IS | 13.09.2015 | ||
PT | 14.09.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 13.05.2015 | |
BE | 13.05.2015 | ||
CZ | 13.05.2015 | ||
DK | 13.05.2015 | ||
EE | 13.05.2015 | ||
ES | 13.05.2015 | ||
FI | 13.05.2015 | ||
HR | 13.05.2015 | ||
IT | 13.05.2015 | ||
LT | 13.05.2015 | ||
LV | 13.05.2015 | ||
MC | 13.05.2015 | ||
MT | 13.05.2015 | ||
PL | 13.05.2015 | ||
RO | 13.05.2015 | ||
SI | 13.05.2015 | ||
SK | 13.05.2015 | ||
IE | 03.06.2015 | ||
CH | 30.06.2015 | ||
LI | 30.06.2015 | ||
BG | 13.08.2015 | ||
NO | 13.08.2015 | ||
GR | 14.08.2015 | ||
IS | 13.09.2015 | ||
PT | 14.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/37] | AT | 13.05.2015 | |
BE | 13.05.2015 | ||
CZ | 13.05.2015 | ||
DK | 13.05.2015 | ||
EE | 13.05.2015 | ||
ES | 13.05.2015 | ||
FI | 13.05.2015 | ||
HR | 13.05.2015 | ||
IT | 13.05.2015 | ||
LT | 13.05.2015 | ||
LV | 13.05.2015 | ||
MC | 13.05.2015 | ||
PL | 13.05.2015 | ||
RO | 13.05.2015 | ||
SI | 13.05.2015 | ||
SK | 13.05.2015 | ||
IE | 03.06.2015 | ||
CH | 30.06.2015 | ||
LI | 30.06.2015 | ||
BG | 13.08.2015 | ||
NO | 13.08.2015 | ||
GR | 14.08.2015 | ||
IS | 13.09.2015 | ||
PT | 14.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 13.05.2015 | |
CZ | 13.05.2015 | ||
DK | 13.05.2015 | ||
EE | 13.05.2015 | ||
ES | 13.05.2015 | ||
FI | 13.05.2015 | ||
HR | 13.05.2015 | ||
IT | 13.05.2015 | ||
LT | 13.05.2015 | ||
LV | 13.05.2015 | ||
MC | 13.05.2015 | ||
PL | 13.05.2015 | ||
RO | 13.05.2015 | ||
SI | 13.05.2015 | ||
SK | 13.05.2015 | ||
IE | 03.06.2015 | ||
CH | 30.06.2015 | ||
LI | 30.06.2015 | ||
BG | 13.08.2015 | ||
NO | 13.08.2015 | ||
GR | 14.08.2015 | ||
IS | 13.09.2015 | ||
PT | 14.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 13.05.2015 | |
CZ | 13.05.2015 | ||
DK | 13.05.2015 | ||
EE | 13.05.2015 | ||
ES | 13.05.2015 | ||
FI | 13.05.2015 | ||
HR | 13.05.2015 | ||
IT | 13.05.2015 | ||
LT | 13.05.2015 | ||
LV | 13.05.2015 | ||
MC | 13.05.2015 | ||
PL | 13.05.2015 | ||
RO | 13.05.2015 | ||
SK | 13.05.2015 | ||
IE | 03.06.2015 | ||
CH | 30.06.2015 | ||
LI | 30.06.2015 | ||
BG | 13.08.2015 | ||
NO | 13.08.2015 | ||
GR | 14.08.2015 | ||
IS | 13.09.2015 | ||
PT | 14.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | AT | 13.05.2015 | |
CZ | 13.05.2015 | ||
DK | 13.05.2015 | ||
EE | 13.05.2015 | ||
ES | 13.05.2015 | ||
FI | 13.05.2015 | ||
HR | 13.05.2015 | ||
IT | 13.05.2015 | ||
LT | 13.05.2015 | ||
LV | 13.05.2015 | ||
MC | 13.05.2015 | ||
PL | 13.05.2015 | ||
RO | 13.05.2015 | ||
SK | 13.05.2015 | ||
IE | 03.06.2015 | ||
BG | 13.08.2015 | ||
NO | 13.08.2015 | ||
GR | 14.08.2015 | ||
IS | 13.09.2015 | ||
PT | 14.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/13] | AT | 13.05.2015 | |
CZ | 13.05.2015 | ||
DK | 13.05.2015 | ||
EE | 13.05.2015 | ||
ES | 13.05.2015 | ||
FI | 13.05.2015 | ||
HR | 13.05.2015 | ||
IT | 13.05.2015 | ||
LT | 13.05.2015 | ||
LV | 13.05.2015 | ||
MC | 13.05.2015 | ||
PL | 13.05.2015 | ||
RO | 13.05.2015 | ||
SK | 13.05.2015 | ||
BG | 13.08.2015 | ||
NO | 13.08.2015 | ||
GR | 14.08.2015 | ||
IS | 13.09.2015 | ||
PT | 14.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | AT | 13.05.2015 | |
CZ | 13.05.2015 | ||
DK | 13.05.2015 | ||
EE | 13.05.2015 | ||
ES | 13.05.2015 | ||
FI | 13.05.2015 | ||
HR | 13.05.2015 | ||
IT | 13.05.2015 | ||
LT | 13.05.2015 | ||
LV | 13.05.2015 | ||
PL | 13.05.2015 | ||
RO | 13.05.2015 | ||
SK | 13.05.2015 | ||
BG | 13.08.2015 | ||
NO | 13.08.2015 | ||
GR | 14.08.2015 | ||
IS | 13.09.2015 | ||
PT | 14.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | AT | 13.05.2015 | |
DK | 13.05.2015 | ||
EE | 13.05.2015 | ||
ES | 13.05.2015 | ||
FI | 13.05.2015 | ||
HR | 13.05.2015 | ||
IT | 13.05.2015 | ||
LT | 13.05.2015 | ||
LV | 13.05.2015 | ||
BG | 13.08.2015 | ||
NO | 13.08.2015 | ||
GR | 14.08.2015 | ||
IS | 13.09.2015 | ||
PT | 14.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/08] | AT | 13.05.2015 | |
DK | 13.05.2015 | ||
ES | 13.05.2015 | ||
FI | 13.05.2015 | ||
HR | 13.05.2015 | ||
IT | 13.05.2015 | ||
LT | 13.05.2015 | ||
LV | 13.05.2015 | ||
BG | 13.08.2015 | ||
NO | 13.08.2015 | ||
GR | 14.08.2015 | ||
IS | 13.09.2015 | ||
PT | 14.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | AT | 13.05.2015 | |
DK | 13.05.2015 | ||
ES | 13.05.2015 | ||
FI | 13.05.2015 | ||
HR | 13.05.2015 | ||
LT | 13.05.2015 | ||
LV | 13.05.2015 | ||
BG | 13.08.2015 | ||
NO | 13.08.2015 | ||
GR | 14.08.2015 | ||
IS | 13.09.2015 | ||
PT | 14.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/51] | AT | 13.05.2015 | |
ES | 13.05.2015 | ||
FI | 13.05.2015 | ||
HR | 13.05.2015 | ||
LT | 13.05.2015 | ||
LV | 13.05.2015 | ||
BG | 13.08.2015 | ||
NO | 13.08.2015 | ||
GR | 14.08.2015 | ||
IS | 13.09.2015 | ||
PT | 14.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | ES | 13.05.2015 | |
FI | 13.05.2015 | ||
HR | 13.05.2015 | ||
LT | 13.05.2015 | ||
LV | 13.05.2015 | ||
BG | 13.08.2015 | ||
NO | 13.08.2015 | ||
GR | 14.08.2015 | ||
IS | 13.09.2015 | ||
PT | 14.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | ES | 13.05.2015 | |
FI | 13.05.2015 | ||
HR | 13.05.2015 | ||
LT | 13.05.2015 | ||
LV | 13.05.2015 | ||
NO | 13.08.2015 | ||
GR | 14.08.2015 | ||
PT | 14.09.2015 | Cited in | International search | [A]JP2003163962 (NTT DOCOMO INC); | [A]JP2007006080 (FUJITSU LTD); | [A]WO2007052811 (NTT DOCOMO INC [JP], et al) |