27.02.2015 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 01.04.2015 [2015/14] |
11.11.2014 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
29.06.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
23.05.2014 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
16.05.2014 |
Change - inventor |
published on 18.06.2014 [2014/25] |
15.10.2013 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
14.06.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
24.05.2013 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 26.06.2013 [2013/26] |
24.05.2013 |
Change - classification |
published on 26.06.2013 [2013/26] |
24.05.2013 |
Change - classification |
published on 26.06.2013 [2013/26] |
23.06.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
10.02.2012 |
Change - applicant |
published on 14.03.2012 [2012/11] |
17.06.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
13.08.2010 |
Change - extension states |
published on 15.09.2010 [2010/37] |
16.06.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
22.01.2010 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 24.02.2010 [2010/08] |
22.01.2010 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 24.02.2010 [2010/08] |
18.12.2009 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
02.12.2009 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
01.12.2009 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
22.12.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
12.12.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
11.11.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|