EP2157413 - INFRARED RAY DETECTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.02.2015 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.02.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.04.2015 [2015/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [2012/11] |
Former [2010/08] | For all designated states Panasonic Electric Works Co., Ltd 1048, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8686 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NISHIKAWA, Takayuki c/o Panasonic Electric Works Co., Ltd. 1048, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8686 / JP | 02 /
KAMITSU, Tomohiro c/o Panasonic Electric Works Co., Ltd. 1048, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8686 / JP | 03 /
HONDA, Yoshiaki c/o Panasonic Electric Works Co., Ltd. 1048, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8686 / JP | [2014/25] |
Former [2010/08] | 01 /
NISHIKAWA, Takayuki Panasonic Electric Works Co., Ltd 1048, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8686 / JP | ||
02 /
KAMITSU, Tomohiro Panasonic Electric Works Co., Ltd 1048, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8686 / JP | |||
03 /
HONDA, Yoshiaki Panasonic Electric Works Co., Ltd 1048, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8686 / JP | Representative(s) | Appelt, Christian W. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/08] | Appelt, Christian W. Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08765170.9 | 05.06.2008 | [2010/08] | WO2008JP60357 | Priority number, date | JP20070153010 | 08.06.2007 Original published format: JP 2007153010 | JP20070304477 | 26.11.2007 Original published format: JP 2007304477 | [2010/08] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008149926 | Date: | 11.12.2008 | Language: | JA | [2008/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2157413 | Date: | 24.02.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 11.12.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.05.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G01J1/04, G01J1/02, G01V8/14 | [2010/08] | CPC: |
G01V8/20 (EP,US);
G01J5/02 (KR);
G01J5/0022 (EP,US);
G01J5/0025 (EP,US);
G01J5/08 (EP,US);
G01J5/0803 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/08] | Title | German: | INFRAROTSTRAHLENDETEKTOR | [2010/08] | English: | INFRARED RAY DETECTOR | [2010/08] | French: | DÉTECTEUR DE RAYONS INFRAROUGES | [2010/08] | Entry into regional phase | 25.11.2009 | Translation filed | 25.11.2009 | National basic fee paid | 25.11.2009 | Search fee paid | 25.11.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.11.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.11.2009 | Examination requested [2010/08] | 10.10.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.05.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.10.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/14] | 10.11.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2015/14] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.05.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4442359 (LEDERER DAVID B [US]) [A] 1-9* the whole document *; | [A]EP1498749 (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP]) [A] 1-9 * paragraphs [0046] - [0049]; figures 8a,9 *; | [A]WO2007019136 (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US]) [A] 1-9 * pages 8,9; figure 2c * | International search | [A]WO9811521 (BARONE STEPHEN [US]); | [A]JPH0729492U ; | [A]JPH044290U | Examination | JPH11248540 | by applicant | JPH11248540 | JPH10214546 |