EP2154424 - Compact fluorescent lamp with diffusion film [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2010/07] | BULB-TYPE FLUORESCENT LAMP | ||
[2012/44] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.01.2014 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OSRAM GmbH Marcel-Breuer-Strasse 6 80807 München / DE | [2013/16] |
Former [2013/01] | For all designated states OSRAM GmbH Hellabrunner Strasse 1 81543 München / DE | ||
Former [2012/29] | For all designated states OSRAM AG Hellabrunner Strasse 1 81543 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/07] | For all designated states Osram Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung Hellabrunner Strasse 1 81543 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KONOMOTO, Takahiro Tobu Yokohama Bldg. No.3 (4F) 8-29 Kita-Saiwai 2-chome Nishi-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 220-0004 / JP | 02 /
OSAWA, Takashi Tobu Yokohama Bldg. No.3 (4F) 8-29 Kita-Saiwai 2-chome Nishi-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 220-0004 / JP | 03 /
NISHIO, Hironori Tobu Yokohama Bldg. No.3 (4F) 8-29 Kita-Saiwai 2-chome Nishi-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 220-0004 / JP | [2013/09] |
Former [2010/07] | 01 /
KONOMOTO, Takahiro Tobu Yokohama Bldg. No.3 (4F) 8-29 Kita-Saiwai 2-chome Nishi-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 220-0004 / JP | ||
02 /
OSAWA, Takashi Tobu Yokohama Bldg. No.3 (4F) 8-29 Kita-Saiwai 2-chome Nishi-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 220-0004 / JP | |||
03 /
NISHIO, Hironori Tobu Yokohama Bldg. No.3 (4F) 8-29 Kita-Saiwai 2-chome Nishi-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 220-0004 / JP | Application number, filing date | 08765365.5 | 10.06.2008 | [2010/07] | WO2008JP60575 | Priority number, date | JP20070153827 | 11.06.2007 Original published format: JP 2007153827 | [2010/07] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008153008 | Date: | 18.12.2008 | Language: | JA | [2008/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2154424 | Date: | 17.02.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2154424 | Date: | 27.02.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 18.12.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.08.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H01J61/32, H01J61/34, H01J61/35 | [2010/38] | CPC: |
H01J61/327 (EP,US);
H01J61/34 (EP,US);
H01J61/35 (EP,US);
Y02B20/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2010/07] | F21V3/04, F21S2/00, F21Y103/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/07] | Title | German: | Kompaktfluoreszenzlampe mit Diffusionsfilm | [2012/44] | English: | Compact fluorescent lamp with diffusion film | [2012/44] | French: | Lampe fluorescente compacte avec film de diffusion | [2012/44] |
Former [2010/07] | FLUORESZIERENDE GLÜHLAMPE | ||
Former [2010/07] | BULB-TYPE FLUORESCENT LAMP | ||
Former [2010/07] | LAMPE FLUORESCENTE DE TYPE AMPOULE | Entry into regional phase | 25.09.2009 | Translation filed | 28.09.2009 | National basic fee paid | 28.09.2009 | Search fee paid | 28.09.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.09.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.09.2009 | Examination requested [2010/07] | 27.04.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 29.06.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.10.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.01.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 08.01.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.10.2012 | Opposition(s) | 28.11.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/06] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 29.06.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 29.06.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 15.07.2011 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 10.06.2008 | AT | 27.02.2013 | BE | 27.02.2013 | CY | 27.02.2013 | CZ | 27.02.2013 | DK | 27.02.2013 | EE | 27.02.2013 | FI | 27.02.2013 | HR | 27.02.2013 | IT | 27.02.2013 | LT | 27.02.2013 | LV | 27.02.2013 | MC | 27.02.2013 | MT | 27.02.2013 | NL | 27.02.2013 | PL | 27.02.2013 | RO | 27.02.2013 | SE | 27.02.2013 | SI | 27.02.2013 | SK | 27.02.2013 | TR | 27.02.2013 | BG | 27.05.2013 | NO | 27.05.2013 | GR | 28.05.2013 | ES | 07.06.2013 | GB | 10.06.2013 | IE | 10.06.2013 | LU | 10.06.2013 | IS | 27.06.2013 | PT | 27.06.2013 | CH | 30.06.2013 | LI | 30.06.2013 | FR | 01.07.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 27.02.2013 | |
BE | 27.02.2013 | ||
CY | 27.02.2013 | ||
CZ | 27.02.2013 | ||
DK | 27.02.2013 | ||
EE | 27.02.2013 | ||
FI | 27.02.2013 | ||
HR | 27.02.2013 | ||
IT | 27.02.2013 | ||
LT | 27.02.2013 | ||
LV | 27.02.2013 | ||
MC | 27.02.2013 | ||
MT | 27.02.2013 | ||
NL | 27.02.2013 | ||
PL | 27.02.2013 | ||
RO | 27.02.2013 | ||
SE | 27.02.2013 | ||
SI | 27.02.2013 | ||
SK | 27.02.2013 | ||
TR | 27.02.2013 | ||
BG | 27.05.2013 | ||
NO | 27.05.2013 | ||
GR | 28.05.2013 | ||
ES | 07.06.2013 | ||
GB | 10.06.2013 | ||
IE | 10.06.2013 | ||
IS | 27.06.2013 | ||
PT | 27.06.2013 | ||
CH | 30.06.2013 | ||
LI | 30.06.2013 | ||
FR | 01.07.2013 | ||
Former [2015/13] | AT | 27.02.2013 | |
BE | 27.02.2013 | ||
CY | 27.02.2013 | ||
CZ | 27.02.2013 | ||
DK | 27.02.2013 | ||
EE | 27.02.2013 | ||
FI | 27.02.2013 | ||
HR | 27.02.2013 | ||
IT | 27.02.2013 | ||
LT | 27.02.2013 | ||
LV | 27.02.2013 | ||
MC | 27.02.2013 | ||
MT | 27.02.2013 | ||
NL | 27.02.2013 | ||
PL | 27.02.2013 | ||
RO | 27.02.2013 | ||
SE | 27.02.2013 | ||
SI | 27.02.2013 | ||
SK | 27.02.2013 | ||
BG | 27.05.2013 | ||
NO | 27.05.2013 | ||
GR | 28.05.2013 | ||
ES | 07.06.2013 | ||
GB | 10.06.2013 | ||
IE | 10.06.2013 | ||
IS | 27.06.2013 | ||
PT | 27.06.2013 | ||
CH | 30.06.2013 | ||
LI | 30.06.2013 | ||
FR | 01.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 27.02.2013 | |
BE | 27.02.2013 | ||
CY | 27.02.2013 | ||
CZ | 27.02.2013 | ||
DK | 27.02.2013 | ||
EE | 27.02.2013 | ||
FI | 27.02.2013 | ||
HR | 27.02.2013 | ||
IT | 27.02.2013 | ||
LT | 27.02.2013 | ||
LV | 27.02.2013 | ||
MC | 27.02.2013 | ||
NL | 27.02.2013 | ||
PL | 27.02.2013 | ||
RO | 27.02.2013 | ||
SE | 27.02.2013 | ||
SI | 27.02.2013 | ||
SK | 27.02.2013 | ||
BG | 27.05.2013 | ||
NO | 27.05.2013 | ||
GR | 28.05.2013 | ||
ES | 07.06.2013 | ||
GB | 10.06.2013 | ||
IE | 10.06.2013 | ||
IS | 27.06.2013 | ||
PT | 27.06.2013 | ||
CH | 30.06.2013 | ||
LI | 30.06.2013 | ||
FR | 01.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 27.02.2013 | |
BE | 27.02.2013 | ||
CY | 27.02.2013 | ||
CZ | 27.02.2013 | ||
DK | 27.02.2013 | ||
EE | 27.02.2013 | ||
FI | 27.02.2013 | ||
HR | 27.02.2013 | ||
IT | 27.02.2013 | ||
LT | 27.02.2013 | ||
LV | 27.02.2013 | ||
MC | 27.02.2013 | ||
NL | 27.02.2013 | ||
PL | 27.02.2013 | ||
RO | 27.02.2013 | ||
SE | 27.02.2013 | ||
SI | 27.02.2013 | ||
SK | 27.02.2013 | ||
BG | 27.05.2013 | ||
NO | 27.05.2013 | ||
GR | 28.05.2013 | ||
ES | 07.06.2013 | ||
GB | 10.06.2013 | ||
IE | 10.06.2013 | ||
IS | 27.06.2013 | ||
PT | 27.06.2013 | ||
CH | 30.06.2013 | ||
LI | 30.06.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | AT | 27.02.2013 | |
BE | 27.02.2013 | ||
CY | 27.02.2013 | ||
CZ | 27.02.2013 | ||
DK | 27.02.2013 | ||
EE | 27.02.2013 | ||
FI | 27.02.2013 | ||
HR | 27.02.2013 | ||
IT | 27.02.2013 | ||
LT | 27.02.2013 | ||
LV | 27.02.2013 | ||
MC | 27.02.2013 | ||
NL | 27.02.2013 | ||
PL | 27.02.2013 | ||
RO | 27.02.2013 | ||
SE | 27.02.2013 | ||
SI | 27.02.2013 | ||
SK | 27.02.2013 | ||
BG | 27.05.2013 | ||
NO | 27.05.2013 | ||
GR | 28.05.2013 | ||
ES | 07.06.2013 | ||
IE | 10.06.2013 | ||
IS | 27.06.2013 | ||
PT | 27.06.2013 | ||
CH | 30.06.2013 | ||
LI | 30.06.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | AT | 27.02.2013 | |
BE | 27.02.2013 | ||
CY | 27.02.2013 | ||
CZ | 27.02.2013 | ||
DK | 27.02.2013 | ||
EE | 27.02.2013 | ||
FI | 27.02.2013 | ||
HR | 27.02.2013 | ||
IT | 27.02.2013 | ||
LT | 27.02.2013 | ||
LV | 27.02.2013 | ||
MC | 27.02.2013 | ||
NL | 27.02.2013 | ||
PL | 27.02.2013 | ||
RO | 27.02.2013 | ||
SE | 27.02.2013 | ||
SI | 27.02.2013 | ||
SK | 27.02.2013 | ||
BG | 27.05.2013 | ||
NO | 27.05.2013 | ||
GR | 28.05.2013 | ||
ES | 07.06.2013 | ||
IS | 27.06.2013 | ||
PT | 27.06.2013 | ||
Former [2014/03] | AT | 27.02.2013 | |
BE | 27.02.2013 | ||
CY | 27.02.2013 | ||
CZ | 27.02.2013 | ||
DK | 27.02.2013 | ||
EE | 27.02.2013 | ||
FI | 27.02.2013 | ||
HR | 27.02.2013 | ||
IT | 27.02.2013 | ||
LT | 27.02.2013 | ||
LV | 27.02.2013 | ||
NL | 27.02.2013 | ||
PL | 27.02.2013 | ||
RO | 27.02.2013 | ||
SE | 27.02.2013 | ||
SI | 27.02.2013 | ||
SK | 27.02.2013 | ||
BG | 27.05.2013 | ||
NO | 27.05.2013 | ||
GR | 28.05.2013 | ||
ES | 07.06.2013 | ||
IS | 27.06.2013 | ||
PT | 27.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AT | 27.02.2013 | |
BE | 27.02.2013 | ||
CY | 27.02.2013 | ||
CZ | 27.02.2013 | ||
DK | 27.02.2013 | ||
EE | 27.02.2013 | ||
FI | 27.02.2013 | ||
HR | 27.02.2013 | ||
LT | 27.02.2013 | ||
LV | 27.02.2013 | ||
NL | 27.02.2013 | ||
PL | 27.02.2013 | ||
RO | 27.02.2013 | ||
SE | 27.02.2013 | ||
SI | 27.02.2013 | ||
SK | 27.02.2013 | ||
BG | 27.05.2013 | ||
NO | 27.05.2013 | ||
GR | 28.05.2013 | ||
ES | 07.06.2013 | ||
IS | 27.06.2013 | ||
PT | 27.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | AT | 27.02.2013 | |
BE | 27.02.2013 | ||
CZ | 27.02.2013 | ||
DK | 27.02.2013 | ||
EE | 27.02.2013 | ||
FI | 27.02.2013 | ||
HR | 27.02.2013 | ||
LT | 27.02.2013 | ||
LV | 27.02.2013 | ||
NL | 27.02.2013 | ||
PL | 27.02.2013 | ||
RO | 27.02.2013 | ||
SE | 27.02.2013 | ||
SI | 27.02.2013 | ||
SK | 27.02.2013 | ||
BG | 27.05.2013 | ||
NO | 27.05.2013 | ||
GR | 28.05.2013 | ||
ES | 07.06.2013 | ||
IS | 27.06.2013 | ||
PT | 27.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 27.02.2013 | |
BE | 27.02.2013 | ||
DK | 27.02.2013 | ||
EE | 27.02.2013 | ||
FI | 27.02.2013 | ||
HR | 27.02.2013 | ||
LT | 27.02.2013 | ||
LV | 27.02.2013 | ||
NL | 27.02.2013 | ||
PL | 27.02.2013 | ||
SE | 27.02.2013 | ||
SI | 27.02.2013 | ||
BG | 27.05.2013 | ||
NO | 27.05.2013 | ||
GR | 28.05.2013 | ||
ES | 07.06.2013 | ||
IS | 27.06.2013 | ||
PT | 27.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/41] | AT | 27.02.2013 | |
BE | 27.02.2013 | ||
FI | 27.02.2013 | ||
HR | 27.02.2013 | ||
LT | 27.02.2013 | ||
LV | 27.02.2013 | ||
PL | 27.02.2013 | ||
SE | 27.02.2013 | ||
SI | 27.02.2013 | ||
BG | 27.05.2013 | ||
NO | 27.05.2013 | ||
GR | 28.05.2013 | ||
ES | 07.06.2013 | ||
IS | 27.06.2013 | ||
PT | 27.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/40] | AT | 27.02.2013 | |
BE | 27.02.2013 | ||
FI | 27.02.2013 | ||
LT | 27.02.2013 | ||
LV | 27.02.2013 | ||
PL | 27.02.2013 | ||
SE | 27.02.2013 | ||
SI | 27.02.2013 | ||
BG | 27.05.2013 | ||
NO | 27.05.2013 | ||
GR | 28.05.2013 | ||
ES | 07.06.2013 | ||
IS | 27.06.2013 | ||
PT | 27.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/38] | AT | 27.02.2013 | |
BE | 27.02.2013 | ||
FI | 27.02.2013 | ||
LT | 27.02.2013 | ||
LV | 27.02.2013 | ||
PL | 27.02.2013 | ||
SE | 27.02.2013 | ||
SI | 27.02.2013 | ||
BG | 27.05.2013 | ||
NO | 27.05.2013 | ||
GR | 28.05.2013 | ||
ES | 07.06.2013 | ||
IS | 27.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 27.02.2013 | |
FI | 27.02.2013 | ||
LT | 27.02.2013 | ||
PL | 27.02.2013 | ||
SE | 27.02.2013 | ||
SI | 27.02.2013 | ||
BG | 27.05.2013 | ||
NO | 27.05.2013 | ||
GR | 28.05.2013 | ||
ES | 07.06.2013 | ||
IS | 27.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/36] | AT | 27.02.2013 | |
LT | 27.02.2013 | ||
PL | 27.02.2013 | ||
SE | 27.02.2013 | ||
BG | 27.05.2013 | ||
NO | 27.05.2013 | ||
ES | 07.06.2013 | ||
IS | 27.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | LT | 27.02.2013 | |
SE | 27.02.2013 | ||
BG | 27.05.2013 | ||
NO | 27.05.2013 | ||
IS | 27.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/33] | LT | 27.02.2013 | |
NO | 27.05.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPH0817222 (TOSHIBA LIGHTING & TECHNOLOGY); | [Y]JP2002124102 (TOSHIBA LIGHTING & TECHNOLOGY); | [Y]WO2006006097 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al); | [Y]US2006176429 (WATCHI MARIE-ISABELLE [FR], et al) | International search | [Y]JPH0817222 (TOSHIBA LIGHTING & TECHNOLOGY); | [Y]JP2002124102 (TOSHIBA LIGHTING & TECHNOLOGY); | [Y]JP2002358804 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [Y]JP2006100107 (HITACHI LIGHTING LTD) | by applicant | JP2003263972 |