EP2299807 - METHOD FOR THE TREATING OF PRODUCTS, SUCH AS EGGS TO BE HATCHED, WITH A CONDITIONED GAS STREAM, AND CLIMATE CHAMBER FOR CARRYING OUT THE METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.06.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 30.06.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.02.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.08.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.01.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.06.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.07.2024 [2024/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HatchTech Group B.V. Gildetrom 25 3905 TB Veenendaal / NL | [2011/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
METER, Tjitze Houtvesterlaan 19 3903 DH Veenendaal / NL | [2023/31] |
Former [2011/13] | 01 /
METER, Tjitze Houtvesterlaan 19 NL-3903 DH Veenendaal / NL | Representative(s) | Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS The Hague / NL | [2013/28] |
Former [2011/13] | van Westenbrugge, Andries, et al Nederlandsch Octrooibureau J.W. Frisolaan 13 2517 JS Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 08766817.4 | 18.06.2008 | [2011/13] | WO2008NL50394 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009154439 | Date: | 23.12.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2299807 | Date: | 30.03.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.12.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2299807 | Date: | 02.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.12.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A01K41/00, A01K45/00, A01K41/02 | [2023/07] | CPC: |
A01K45/00 (EP,US);
A01K41/00 (EP,US);
A01K41/023 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2011/13] | A01K41/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2023/31] |
Former [2011/13] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON PRODUKTEN, WIE ZUM BEISPIEL AUSZUBRÜTENDEN EIERN, MIT EINEM KONDITIONIERTEN GASSTROM UND KLIMAKAMMER ZUR DURCHFÜHRUNG DES VERFAHRENS | [2011/13] | English: | METHOD FOR THE TREATING OF PRODUCTS, SUCH AS EGGS TO BE HATCHED, WITH A CONDITIONED GAS STREAM, AND CLIMATE CHAMBER FOR CARRYING OUT THE METHOD | [2011/13] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR TRAITER DES PRODUITS, TELS QUE DES OEUFS MIS À INCUBER, AVEC UN COURANT DE GAZ CONDITIONNÉ, ET CHAMBRE CLIMATISÉE POUR RÉALISER CE PROCÉDÉ | [2019/17] |
Former [2011/13] | PROCÉDÉ POUR TRAITER DES PRODUITS, TELS QUE DES UFS MIS À INCUBER, AVEC UN COURANT DE GAZ CONDITIONNÉ, ET CHAMBRE CLIMATISÉE POUR RÉALISER CE PROCÉDÉ | Entry into regional phase | 16.12.2010 | National basic fee paid | 16.12.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.12.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.12.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.12.2010 | Examination requested [2011/13] | 18.12.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.04.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.02.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.08.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.10.2019 | Date of oral proceedings | 20.12.2019 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 08.01.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.06.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 20.08.2020 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 30.09.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 14.02.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.06.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 21.06.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.06.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Appeal following examination | 26.11.2020 | Appeal received No. T0180/21 | 26.11.2020 | Payment of appeal fee | 05.02.2021 | Statement of grounds filed | 24.10.2022 | Result of appeal procedure: remittal for grant | 28.10.2022 | Despatch of the decision of the Board of Appeal | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.12.2014 | Opposition(s) | 03.05.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/28] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 20.08.2020 | Request for further processing filed | 20.08.2020 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 31.08.2020 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 06.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 13.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 29.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 28.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 30.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 28.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 16 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 02.08.2023 | HR | 02.08.2023 | RO | 02.08.2023 | SK | 02.08.2023 | NO | 02.11.2023 | GR | 03.11.2023 | IS | 02.12.2023 | [2024/23] |
Former [2024/10] | HR | 02.08.2023 | |
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | NO | 02.11.2023 | |
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | NO | 02.11.2023 | |
GR | 03.11.2023 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2654345 (EDWARDS GEORGE S) [A] 1-24 * column 1, line 1 - column 7, line 62; figures 1-13; claims 1-17 *; | [XY]GB2208315 (LEMONNIER YVES) [X] 1-6,10,11,13,14,21-24 * abstract * * pages 1-10 * [Y] 7-9,19,20; | [X]US4957066 (DAMBRE PIERRE [FR]) [X] 1-5,10,13,14 * abstract * * column 1, line 5 - column 4, line 1 *; | [DY]EP1104987 (METER HOLDING B V T [NL]) [DY] 7-9,19,20 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] - [0050] *; | [DA]WO2007142511 (HATCHTECH GROUP BV [NL], et al) [DA] 1-24 * abstract ** page 1, line 3 - page 15, line 28 * | Examination | EP2257152 |