EP2165180 - MEASURING OF FUEL COMPOSITION BY USING LASER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.05.2014 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.05.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.06.2014 [2014/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Integrated Optoelectronics AS Box 24, Tiller 7475 Trondheim / NO | [2010/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BUGGE, Renato Anders Wigensvel 18 N-7024 Trondheim / NO | [2010/38] |
Former [2010/12] | 01 /
BUGGE, Renato Lade Allè 12 N-7041 Trondheim / NO | Representative(s) | Curo AS Vestre Rosten 81 7075 Tiller / NO | [N/P] |
Former [2010/12] | Curo AS Industriveien 53 7080 Heimdal / NO | Application number, filing date | 08766910.7 | 02.06.2008 | [2010/12] | WO2008NO00195 | Priority number, date | NO20070003522 | 09.07.2007 Original published format: NO 20073522 | [2010/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009008729 | Date: | 15.01.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2165180 | Date: | 24.03.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.01.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | XN | 15.01.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/39, G01N33/22 | [2010/12] | CPC: |
G01N21/39 (EP,US);
G01N33/2829 (EP,US);
G01N21/85 (EP,US);
G01N2201/1293 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/12] | Title | German: | MESSEN DER BRENNSTOFFZUSAMMENSETZUNG UNTER VERWENDUNG EINES LASERS | [2010/12] | English: | MEASURING OF FUEL COMPOSITION BY USING LASER | [2010/12] | French: | MESURE DE LA COMPOSITION DE CARBURANTS AU MOYEN D'UN LASER | [2010/12] | Entry into regional phase | 15.01.2010 | National basic fee paid | 15.01.2010 | Search fee paid | 15.01.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.01.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.01.2010 | Examination requested [2010/12] | 03.01.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/25] | 31.01.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2014/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2013 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP1174705 (SIEMENS AG [DE]); | [X]EP1447657 (SIEMENS AG [DE]); | [A]DE4216508 (BRANDT ORTWIN DR [DE]); | [Y]US6937633 (CHUA SOO JIN [SG], et al); | [Y]US5445964 (LEE PETER S [US], et al); | [Y]US4318058 (MITO IKUO, et al) | [X] - HANSON R.K., "Advances in Tunable Diode Laser (TDL) Sensing for Combustion and Propulsion", STANFORD UNIVERSITY, (20060518), pages 2, 6, 10 - 11, 23 - 27, XP008128137 | [X] - MCNESBY K.L. ET AL., "Detection and Measurement of Middle Distillate Fuel Vapors Using Tunable Diode Lasers", APPLIED OPTICS, (2001), vol. 39, pages 5006 - 5011, XP008128139 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1364/AO.40.000840 |