EP2289256 - GLOBAL OPERATOR LICENSE PRIORITIZING AND DISTRIBUTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 13.09.2019 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2019 | Withdrawal of application | published on 16.10.2019 [2019/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/09] | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget L M Ericsson (PUBL) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PUCAR RIMHAGEN, Anna Solkurvan 10 S-591 52 Motala / SE | 02 /
ENGSTRÖM, Stefan Vårbruksgatan 69 S-583 32 Linköping / SE | [2011/09] | Representative(s) | Brann AB P.O. Box 3690 Sveavägen 63 103 59 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/09] | Kühn, Friedrich Heinrich Ericsson AB Patent Unit LTE Torshamnsgatan 23 164 80 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 08767184.8 | 16.06.2008 | [2011/09] | WO2008SE50718 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009154522 | Date: | 23.12.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2289256 | Date: | 02.03.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.12.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 23.12.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.09.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H04W16/00, H04W28/00, G06F21/10 | [2014/43] | CPC: |
H04W4/20 (EP);
H04W16/14 (US);
G06F21/10 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2011/09] | H04W16/00, H04W28/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/09] | Title | German: | LIZENZPRIORISIERUNG UND VERTEILUNG GLOBALER BETREIBER | [2011/09] | English: | GLOBAL OPERATOR LICENSE PRIORITIZING AND DISTRIBUTION | [2011/09] | French: | HIÉRARCHISATION ET DISTRIBUTION DE LICENCE D'OPÉRATEUR GLOBALE | [2011/09] | Entry into regional phase | 21.10.2010 | National basic fee paid | 21.10.2010 | Search fee paid | 21.10.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.10.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.10.2010 | Examination requested [2011/09] | 27.11.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.07.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.10.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.02.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.06.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.09.2019 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2019/42] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.07.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 16.01.2011 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   24.02.2011 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5745879 (WYMAN ROBERT M [US]) [Y] 1-15 * abstract *; | [X]US2003050073 (WASKO STEPHEN [GB]) [X] 1-15 * paragraphs [0001] - [0003] - [0 23] - [0033] *; | [Y]US7231370 (KAPUR RAJIV [IN]) [Y] 1-15* abstract * | International search | [X]US2003050073 (WASKO STEPHEN [GB]); | [A]WO2004004398 (NOKIA CORP [FI], et al); | [A]US7133681 (TALLEY RYAN [US], et al) | Examination | US2008082450 |