EP2156558 - MOSFET GATE DRIVE WITH REDUCED POWER LOSS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.06.2019 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.09.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.08.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.06.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.07.2019 [2019/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Advanced Analogic Technologies Incorporated 2740 Zanker Road San Jose, CA 95134 / US | [2017/06] |
Former [2016/50] | For all designated states Advanced Analogic Technologies Incorporated 3230 Scott Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | ||
Former [2010/08] | For all designated states Advanced Analogic Technologies, Inc. 3230 Scott Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WILLIAMS, Richard, K. 10292 Norwich Ave. Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | [2010/08] | Representative(s) | Lloyd, Patrick Alexander Desmond, et al Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/34] | Lloyd, Patrick Alexander Desmond, et al Reddie & Grose LLP 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | ||
Former [2010/08] | Borchert, Uwe Rudolf Puschmann Borchert Bardehle Patentanwälte Partnerschaft Bajuwarenring 21 82041 Oberhaching / DE | Application number, filing date | 08767451.1 | 30.04.2008 | [2010/08] | WO2008US05543 | Priority number, date | US20070931097P | 21.05.2007 Original published format: US 931097 P | US20070890942 | 08.08.2007 Original published format: US 890942 | [2010/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008153631 | Date: | 18.12.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2156558 | Date: | 24.02.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.12.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 18.12.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.03.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H03K17/687, H02M1/08 | [2010/08] | CPC: |
H03K17/6872 (EP,US);
H02M1/08 (KR);
H03K17/18 (EP,US);
H03K17/687 (KR);
H03K17/08142 (EP,US);
H03K17/145 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/08] | Title | German: | MOSFET-GATEANSTEUERUNG MIT VERRINGERTEM LEISTUNGSVERLUST | [2010/08] | English: | MOSFET GATE DRIVE WITH REDUCED POWER LOSS | [2010/08] | French: | COMMANDE DE GRILLE DE MOSFET AVEC PERTE DE PUISSANCE RÉDUITE | [2010/08] | Entry into regional phase | 11.12.2009 | National basic fee paid | 11.12.2009 | Search fee paid | 11.12.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.12.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.12.2009 | Examination requested [2010/08] | 13.04.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.03.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.08.2018 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 14.09.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.01.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/30] | 08.03.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2019/30] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.03.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2019 | 12   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0963044 (NEC CORP [JP]) [A] 1* paragraph [0074] - paragraph [0083]; figure 9 * | International search | [A]US4748351 (BARZEGAR FARHAD [US]); | [A]US5436577 (LEE CHEOL-HEE [KR]); | [A]US5525925 (BAYER ERICH [DE]); | [A]US5737169 (SELLERS JEFF C [US]); | [A]JP2005304218 (RENESAS TECH CORP) | Examination | US2006033525 |