EP2150108 - CINNAMALDEHYDE FORMULATIONS AND METHODS OF USE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.02.2013 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.02.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.03.2013 [2013/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Valent Biosciences, Corp. 870 Technology Way Libertyville Illinois 60048 / US | [2010/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WANG, Yueh 1315 N. Salem Boulevard Arlington Heights, IL 60004 / US | 02 /
SHAMMO, Bassam 2017 Clarewood Lane Mundelein, IL 60060 / US | 03 /
DICKENSON, Rebecca 843 Brahms Rd. Volo, IL 60073 / US | 04 /
LOPEZ, John 7239 Buchanan Drive Gurnee, IL 60031 / US | 05 /
FUGIEL, Judith 675 Tallgrass Lane Lake Villa, IL 60046 / US | 06 /
REHBERGER, Linda 3945 Miller Dr. Glenview, IL 60025 / US | 07 /
WARRIOR, Prem 2, 192nd Street, SW Bothell, WA 98012 / US | [2010/11] |
Former [2010/06] | 01 /
WANG, Yueh 1315 N. Salem Boulevard Arlington Heights, IL 60004 / US | ||
02 /
SHAMMO, Bassam 2017 Clarewood Lane Mundelein, IL 60060 / US | |||
03 /
DICKENSON, Rebecca 843 Brahms Rd. Volo, IL 60073 / US | |||
04 /
LOPEZ, John 7239 Buchanan Drive Gurnee, IL 60031 / US | |||
05 /
FUGIEL, Judith 675 Tallgrass Lane Lake Villa, IL 60046 / US | |||
06 /
REHBERGER, Linda 3945 Miller Dr. Glenview, IL 60025 / US | |||
07 /
WARRIOR, Prem 14584 North Somerset Circle Green Oaks, IL 60048 / US | Representative(s) | Brearley, Helen Rebecca Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/06] | Brearley, Helen Rebecca Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks Kent TN13 1XR / GB | Application number, filing date | 08767735.7 | 16.05.2008 | [2010/06] | WO2008US06269 | Priority number, date | US20070930725P | 18.05.2007 Original published format: US 930725 P | [2010/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008143961 | Date: | 27.11.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2150108 | Date: | 10.02.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.11.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 27.11.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.05.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A01N35/02, A01N25/02, A01N25/22, A01P5/00 | [2011/22] | CPC: |
A01N35/02 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
A01N35/02, A01N2300/00 (US,EP);
A01N35/02, A01N25/02, A01N25/30 (EP,US) |
Former IPC [2010/06] | A01N31/00, A01N35/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/06] | Title | German: | ZIMTALDEHYDFORMULIERUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERWENDUNG | [2010/06] | English: | CINNAMALDEHYDE FORMULATIONS AND METHODS OF USE | [2010/06] | French: | FORMULATIONS DE CINNAMALDÉHYDE ET PROCÉDÉS D'UTILISATION | [2010/06] | Entry into regional phase | 16.12.2009 | National basic fee paid | 16.12.2009 | Search fee paid | 16.12.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.12.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.12.2009 | Examination requested [2010/06] | 30.11.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.05.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.09.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/10] | 19.10.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/10] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.05.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4978686 (SOTOME KIYOSHI [JP]) [Y] 1-15 * column 2, line 40 - line 44 * * column 6, line 33 * * column 4, paragraph composition 3 * * column 6 - column 12; tables 2, 5-7 *; | [Y]US6051233 (CHAMPON LOUIS S [US]) [Y] 1-15 * column 2, line 56 - column 3, line 18 * * column 3, line 53 - line 56 * * column 3, line 64 - line 65 * * column 3, line 12 - line 18 *; | [Y]US2001055628 (HSU HSINHUNG JOHN [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * page 1, paragraphs 5-9 ** page 2; example 1 *; | [Y]US2006199736 (VASEK GERALD J [US]) [Y] 1-15 * page 2, paragraph 27 * * page 3, paragraph 40; claim 8 * * page 3, paragraph 32 * * page 2, paragraph 28 * | International search | [Y]US4978686 (SOTOME KIYOSHI [JP]); | [Y]WO2007041886 (GIVAUDAN SA [CH], et al) | Examination | US2852426 | US2005129662 | WO2006107905 | by applicant | US4978686 | US5051255 | US5057141 | US5182207 | US5360607 | US5439934 | US6051233 | US6251951 | US2001055628 | US6750256 | US2006199736 | - Y.OKA, NEMATOLOGY, (2001), vol. 3, no. 2, pages 159 - 164 | - R. PANDEY, J. PHYTOPATHOLOGY, (2000), vol. 148, pages 501 - 502 |