EP2149213 - INTEGRATED MULTI-SAT LNB AND FREQUENCY TRANSLATION MODULE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.04.2018 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.04.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.05.2018 [2018/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The DirecTV Group, Inc. 2230 E. Imperial Highway El Segundo, CA 90245 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2010/05] | For all designated states The DirecTv Group, Inc. 2230 E. Imperial Highway El Segundo, CA 90245 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NORIN, John, L. 314 N. Catalina Avenue A Redondo Beach, CA 90277 / US | [2010/05] | Representative(s) | Jackson, Richard Eric, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/05] | Jackson, Richard Eric, et al Carpmaels & Ransford 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 08767915.5 | 28.05.2008 | [2010/05] | WO2008US06750 | Priority number, date | US20070932061P | 29.05.2007 Original published format: US 932061 P | US20070932060P | 29.05.2007 Original published format: US 932060 P | [2010/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008153800 | Date: | 18.12.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/51] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2149213 | Date: | 03.02.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.12.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.02.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H04H40/90 | [2010/05] | CPC: |
H04H40/90 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/05] | Title | German: | INTEGRIERTER MULTI-SAT-LNB UND FREQUENZÜBERSETZUNGSMODUL | [2010/05] | English: | INTEGRATED MULTI-SAT LNB AND FREQUENCY TRANSLATION MODULE | [2010/05] | French: | BLOC-CONVERTISSEUR À FAIBLE BRUIT MULTISATELLITE ET MODULE DE TRANSPOSITION EN FRÉQUENCE INTÉGRÉS | [2010/05] | Entry into regional phase | 20.11.2009 | National basic fee paid | 20.11.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.11.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.11.2009 | Examination requested [2010/05] | 23.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.10.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.09.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.02.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/19] | 04.01.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2018/19] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.03.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 20.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2017 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US7130576 (GURANTZ ITZHAK [US], et al) [X] 1-16 * column 4, lines 28-33 * * column 4, lines 47-49 * * column 5, lines 12,13 * * column 5, lines 32-34 * * column 6, lines 59-66 * * column 6, lines 11-14 * * column 7, lines 11-16 * * column 11, lines 6-8; figures 2,3,12; claim 2 * | by applicant | US7130576 |