EP2148963 - Full moment nodal connection between column and beam [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2010/05] | HALO/SPIDER, FULL-MOMENT, COLUMN/BEAM CONNECTION IN A BUILDING FRAME | ||
[2016/19] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.07.2017 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.10.2019 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 13.11.2019 [2019/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ConXtech, Inc. 24493 Clawiter Road Hayward, CA 94545 / US | [2010/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SIMMONS, Robert, J. 27308 Fairview Avenue Hayward, CA 94545 / US | [2010/05] | Representative(s) | Walker, Ross Thomson, et al Forresters IP LLP Skygarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/10] | Walker, Ross Thomson, et al Forresters Skygarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | ||
Former [2012/16] | Walker, Ross Thomson, et al Forresters 15 Hamilton Square Birkenhead Merseyside CH41 6BR / GB | ||
Former [2010/05] | Wombwell, Francis Potts, Kerr & Co. 15, Hamilton Square Birkenhead Merseyside CH41 6BR / GB | Application number, filing date | 08767946.0 | 30.05.2008 | [2010/05] | WO2008US06825 | Priority number, date | US20070932486P | 30.05.2007 Original published format: US 932486 P | [2010/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008150433 | Date: | 11.12.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2148963 | Date: | 03.02.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.12.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2148963 | Date: | 21.09.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 11.12.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.01.2014 | Classification | IPC: | E04D1/00, E04B1/24 | [2014/08] | CPC: |
E04B1/24 (EP,BR,US);
E04B1/38 (KR);
E04B1/58 (KR);
E04B2001/2415 (EP,BR,US);
E04B2001/2424 (EP,BR,US);
E04B2001/2454 (EP,BR,US)
|
Former IPC [2010/05] | E04D1/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/38] |
Former [2010/05] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Momentenstarrer Knoten zwischen Stütze und Träger | [2016/19] | English: | Full moment nodal connection between column and beam | [2016/19] | French: | Connexion à moment complet entre colonne et poutre | [2016/19] |
Former [2010/05] | VOLLBEWEGLICHE HALO/SPIDER-SÄULEN/BALKEN-VERBINDUNG IN EINEM GEBÄUDERAHMEN | ||
Former [2010/05] | HALO/SPIDER, FULL-MOMENT, COLUMN/BEAM CONNECTION IN A BUILDING FRAME | ||
Former [2010/05] | CONNEXION COLONNE/POUTRE À MOMENT COMPLET ET HALO/CROISILLON DANS UN BÂTI DE CONSTRUCTION | Entry into regional phase | 04.11.2009 | National basic fee paid | 04.11.2009 | Search fee paid | 04.11.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.11.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.11.2009 | Examination requested [2010/05] | 06.08.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.06.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.10.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.04.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.08.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 12.08.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.08.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP16189759.0 / EP3162976 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.06.2015 | Opposition(s) | 22.06.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.05.2008 | AT | 21.09.2016 | BE | 21.09.2016 | CY | 21.09.2016 | CZ | 21.09.2016 | DK | 21.09.2016 | EE | 21.09.2016 | FI | 21.09.2016 | HR | 21.09.2016 | LT | 21.09.2016 | LV | 21.09.2016 | MC | 21.09.2016 | PL | 21.09.2016 | RO | 21.09.2016 | SI | 21.09.2016 | SK | 21.09.2016 | BG | 21.12.2016 | GR | 22.12.2016 | IS | 21.01.2017 | PT | 23.01.2017 | LU | 30.05.2017 | MT | 30.05.2017 | CH | 31.05.2017 | LI | 31.05.2017 | [2019/46] |
Former [2019/31] | HU | 30.05.2008 | |
AT | 21.09.2016 | ||
BE | 21.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2016 | ||
DK | 21.09.2016 | ||
EE | 21.09.2016 | ||
FI | 21.09.2016 | ||
HR | 21.09.2016 | ||
LT | 21.09.2016 | ||
LV | 21.09.2016 | ||
MC | 21.09.2016 | ||
PL | 21.09.2016 | ||
RO | 21.09.2016 | ||
SI | 21.09.2016 | ||
SK | 21.09.2016 | ||
BG | 21.12.2016 | ||
GR | 22.12.2016 | ||
IS | 21.01.2017 | ||
PT | 23.01.2017 | ||
LU | 30.05.2017 | ||
MT | 30.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 21.09.2016 | |
BE | 21.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2016 | ||
DK | 21.09.2016 | ||
EE | 21.09.2016 | ||
FI | 21.09.2016 | ||
HR | 21.09.2016 | ||
LT | 21.09.2016 | ||
LV | 21.09.2016 | ||
MC | 21.09.2016 | ||
PL | 21.09.2016 | ||
RO | 21.09.2016 | ||
SI | 21.09.2016 | ||
SK | 21.09.2016 | ||
BG | 21.12.2016 | ||
GR | 22.12.2016 | ||
IS | 21.01.2017 | ||
PT | 23.01.2017 | ||
LU | 30.05.2017 | ||
MT | 30.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/17] | AT | 21.09.2016 | |
BE | 21.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2016 | ||
DK | 21.09.2016 | ||
EE | 21.09.2016 | ||
FI | 21.09.2016 | ||
HR | 21.09.2016 | ||
LT | 21.09.2016 | ||
LV | 21.09.2016 | ||
MC | 21.09.2016 | ||
PL | 21.09.2016 | ||
RO | 21.09.2016 | ||
SI | 21.09.2016 | ||
SK | 21.09.2016 | ||
BG | 21.12.2016 | ||
GR | 22.12.2016 | ||
IS | 21.01.2017 | ||
PT | 23.01.2017 | ||
LU | 30.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/13] | AT | 21.09.2016 | |
BE | 21.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2016 | ||
DK | 21.09.2016 | ||
EE | 21.09.2016 | ||
FI | 21.09.2016 | ||
HR | 21.09.2016 | ||
LT | 21.09.2016 | ||
LV | 21.09.2016 | ||
MC | 21.09.2016 | ||
PL | 21.09.2016 | ||
RO | 21.09.2016 | ||
SI | 21.09.2016 | ||
SK | 21.09.2016 | ||
BG | 21.12.2016 | ||
GR | 22.12.2016 | ||
IS | 21.01.2017 | ||
PT | 23.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/06] | AT | 21.09.2016 | |
BE | 21.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2016 | ||
DK | 21.09.2016 | ||
EE | 21.09.2016 | ||
FI | 21.09.2016 | ||
HR | 21.09.2016 | ||
LT | 21.09.2016 | ||
LV | 21.09.2016 | ||
MC | 21.09.2016 | ||
PL | 21.09.2016 | ||
RO | 21.09.2016 | ||
SI | 21.09.2016 | ||
SK | 21.09.2016 | ||
BG | 21.12.2016 | ||
GR | 22.12.2016 | ||
IS | 21.01.2017 | ||
PT | 23.01.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | AT | 21.09.2016 | |
BE | 21.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2016 | ||
DK | 21.09.2016 | ||
EE | 21.09.2016 | ||
FI | 21.09.2016 | ||
HR | 21.09.2016 | ||
LT | 21.09.2016 | ||
LV | 21.09.2016 | ||
PL | 21.09.2016 | ||
RO | 21.09.2016 | ||
SI | 21.09.2016 | ||
SK | 21.09.2016 | ||
BG | 21.12.2016 | ||
GR | 22.12.2016 | ||
IS | 21.01.2017 | ||
PT | 23.01.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/36] | AT | 21.09.2016 | |
BE | 21.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2016 | ||
DK | 21.09.2016 | ||
EE | 21.09.2016 | ||
FI | 21.09.2016 | ||
HR | 21.09.2016 | ||
LT | 21.09.2016 | ||
LV | 21.09.2016 | ||
PL | 21.09.2016 | ||
RO | 21.09.2016 | ||
SK | 21.09.2016 | ||
BG | 21.12.2016 | ||
GR | 22.12.2016 | ||
IS | 21.01.2017 | ||
PT | 23.01.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/34] | AT | 21.09.2016 | |
BE | 21.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2016 | ||
DK | 21.09.2016 | ||
EE | 21.09.2016 | ||
FI | 21.09.2016 | ||
HR | 21.09.2016 | ||
LT | 21.09.2016 | ||
LV | 21.09.2016 | ||
PL | 21.09.2016 | ||
RO | 21.09.2016 | ||
SK | 21.09.2016 | ||
BG | 21.12.2016 | ||
GR | 22.12.2016 | ||
IS | 21.01.2017 | ||
PT | 23.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/32] | AT | 21.09.2016 | |
BE | 21.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2016 | ||
EE | 21.09.2016 | ||
FI | 21.09.2016 | ||
HR | 21.09.2016 | ||
LT | 21.09.2016 | ||
LV | 21.09.2016 | ||
PL | 21.09.2016 | ||
RO | 21.09.2016 | ||
SK | 21.09.2016 | ||
BG | 21.12.2016 | ||
GR | 22.12.2016 | ||
IS | 21.01.2017 | ||
PT | 23.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/13] | FI | 21.09.2016 | |
HR | 21.09.2016 | ||
LT | 21.09.2016 | ||
LV | 21.09.2016 | ||
GR | 22.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | FI | 21.09.2016 | |
HR | 21.09.2016 | ||
LT | 21.09.2016 | ||
GR | 22.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | FI | 21.09.2016 | |
HR | 21.09.2016 | ||
LT | 21.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | LT | 21.09.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR1514258 (MORICE) [X] 2-4 * page 3, column left, paragraph last; figure 7 *; | [X]JPH0681394 (KAJIMA CORP, et al) [X] 2-4* figures 1,2 *; | [X]JPH07150635 (KAJIMA CORP) [X] 2-4 * figure 1 *; | [X]JPH08144370 (ARTES KK) [X] 2-4 * figure 1 *; | [X]JP2004011377 (OHBAYASHI CORP) [X] 2-4 * the whole document *; | [X]US2004139683 (SIMMONS ROBERT J [US]) [X] 2-4 * paragraphs [0019] - [0023] - [0029]; figure 1a * | International search | [Y]US4018057 (ERZEN CEVDET, et al); | [X]US6837016 (SIMMONS ROBERT J [US], et al) |