EP2152267 - TREATMENT OF IMATINIB RESISTANT LEUKEMIA WITH BOSUTINIB [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2010/07] | TREATMENT OF IMATINIB RESISTANT LEUKEMIA USING 4-AMINOQUINOLINE-3-CARBONITRILES | ||
[2014/38] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.05.2016 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.05.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.06.2016 [2016/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wyeth LLC 235 East 42nd Street New York, NY 10017-5755 / US | [2014/10] |
Former [2010/16] | For all designated states Wyeth LLC Five Giralda Farms Madison, NJ 07940 / US | ||
Former [2010/07] | For all designated states Wyeth LLC Five Giralda Farms Madison NJ 07940 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HEWES, Becker 45 Myrtle Terrace Winchester, Massachusetts 01890 / US | [2010/07] | Representative(s) | Pfizer European Patent Department 23-25 avenue du Docteur Lannelongue 75668 Paris Cedex 14 / FR | [2012/33] |
Former [2010/32] | Lane, Graham Mark Hamilton, et al Pfizer Limited, European Patent Department Ramsgate Road Sandwich, Kent CT13 9NJ / GB | ||
Former [2010/20] | Talbott, Dawn Jacqueline Wyeth Pharmaceuticals Huntercombe Lane South Taplow Maidenhead Berkshire SL6 0PH / GB | ||
Former [2010/07] | Talbott, Dawn Jacqueline Wyeth Laboratories Patent Department Huntercombe Lane South Taplow Maidenhead Berkshire SL6 0PH / GB | Application number, filing date | 08769857.7 | 30.05.2008 | [2010/07] | WO2008US65215 | Priority number, date | US20070932650P | 01.06.2007 Original published format: US 932650 P | [2010/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008150957 | Date: | 11.12.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/50] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2152267 | Date: | 17.02.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.12.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.08.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/4709, A61K31/496, A61P35/02 | [2015/07] | CPC: |
A61K31/4709 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/496 (EP,KR,US);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/02 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/4709, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/496, A61K2300/00 (US,EP) |
Former IPC [2014/38] | A61K31/496, A61P35/02 | ||
Former IPC [2010/07] | A61K31/4709, A61K31/496, A61P35/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/07] | Title | German: | BEHANDLUNG VON IMATINIBRESISTENTER LEUKÄMIE MIT BOSUTINIB | [2014/38] | English: | TREATMENT OF IMATINIB RESISTANT LEUKEMIA WITH BOSUTINIB | [2014/38] | French: | TRAITEMENT DE LEUCÉMIE RÉSISTANT À L'IMATINIB AVEC BOSUTINIBE | [2014/38] |
Former [2010/07] | BEHANDLUNG VON IMATINIBRESISTENTER LEUKÄMIE UNTER VERWENDUNG VON AMINOCHINOLIN-3-CARBONITRILEN | ||
Former [2010/07] | TREATMENT OF IMATINIB RESISTANT LEUKEMIA USING 4-AMINOQUINOLINE-3-CARBONITRILES | ||
Former [2010/07] | TRAITEMENT DE LEUCÉMIE RÉSISTANT À L'IMATINIB EN UTILISANT DES 4-AMINOQUINOLEINE-3-CARBONITRILES | Entry into regional phase | 30.11.2009 | National basic fee paid | 30.11.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.11.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.11.2009 | Examination requested [2010/07] | 24.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.10.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.08.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.10.2014 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 23.01.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.06.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 02.06.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.07.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.12.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/24] | 11.01.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/24] | Divisional application(s) | EP12160638.8 / EP2478905 | EP14167958.9 / EP2777704 | EP15191756.4 / EP3002009 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.03.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 01.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2005101780 (BOSCHELLI FRANK [US], et al); | [Y]WO2006124863 (IRM LLC [US], et al) [Y] 13,21,25 * paragraph [0026] *; | [DXY] - PUTTINI, MIRIAM ET AL, "In vitro and in vivo Activity of SKI-606, a Novel Src-Abl Inhibitor, against Imatinib - Resistant Bcr - Abl + Neoplastic Cells", CANCER RESEARCH, (2006), vol. 66, no. 23, pages 11414 - 11322, XP002508641 [DX] 1-7,10,12,14-18,20,22-24 * abstract * * table 1 * [Y] 8,9,13,21,25 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1158/0008-5472.CAN-06-1199 | [X] - JABBOUR ELIAS ET AL, "New targeted therapies for chronic myelogenous leukemia: opportunities to overcome imatinib resistance", SEMINARS IN HEMATOLOGY, PHILADELPHIA, PA, US, (20070101), vol. 44, no. 1 Suppl. 1, ISSN 0037-1963, pages s25 - s31, XP009086255 [X] 1-7,10,12,14-18,20,22-24 * page 28, column R, paragraph 2 - page 29, column L, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1053/j.seminhematol.2006.12.003 | [Y] - BOSCHELLI, DIANE H. ET AL, "7-Alkoxy-4-phenylamino-3-quinolinecarbonitriles as Dual Inhibitors of Src and Abl Kinases", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, (2004), vol. 47, no. 7, pages 1599 - 1601, XP002508643 [Y] 8,9 * table 1 * * Scheme 3 * * page 1599, column 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/JM0499458 | [A] - GUMIREDDY KIRANMAI ET AL, "A non-ATP-competitive inhibitor of BCR-ABL overrides imatinib resistance.", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA 8 FEB 2005, (20050208), vol. 102, no. 6, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 1992 - 1997, XP002508642 [A] 13,21,25 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/PNAS.0408283102 | [A] - BOSCHELLI, DIANE H. ET AL, "Investigation of the effect of varying the 4-anilino and 7-alkoxy groups of 3-quinolinecarbonitriles on the inhibition of Src kinase activity", BIOORGANIC & MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY LETTERS, (2003), vol. 13, no. 21, pages 3797 - 3800, XP002508644 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/J.BMCL.2003.07.001 | [A] - JABBOUR, ELIAS ET AL, "Current and emerging treatment options in chronic myeloid leukemia", CANCER (HOBOKEN, NJ, UNITED STATES), (20070412), vol. 109, no. 11, pages 2171 - 2181, XP002508645 [A] * page 2176, column L * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/CNCR.22661 | [DA] - MERCEDES E. GORRE ET AL., "Clinical Resistance to STI-571 Cancer Therapy Caused by BCR-ABL Gene Mutation or Amplification", SCIENCE, (2001), vol. 293, pages 876 - 880, XP002508646 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1062538 | [DA] - LE COUTRE P ET AL, "Induction of resistance to the Abelson inhibitor STI571 in human leukemic cells through gene amplification.", BLOOD 1 MAR 2000, (20000301), vol. 95, no. 5, ISSN 0006-4971, pages 1758 - 1766, XP002508647 | [A] - GOLAS J M ET AL, "SKI-606, a 4-anilino-3-quinolinecarbonitrile dual inhibitor of Src and Abl kinases,Is a Potent Antiproliferative Agent against Chronic Myelogenous Leukemia Cells in Culture and Causes Regression of K562 Xenografts in Nude Mice", CANCER RESEARCH, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR CANCER RESEARCH, BALTIMORE, MD.; US, (20030101), vol. 63, no. 2, pages 375 - 381, XP002283612 | Examination | - GUMIREDDY KIRANMAI ET AL, "A non-ATP-competitive inhibitor of BCR-ABL overrides imatinib resistance", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES, NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES, (20050208), vol. 102, no. 6, doi:10.1073/PNAS.0408283102, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 1992 - 1997, XP002508642 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/PNAS.0408283102 | - PUTTINI MIRIAM ET AL, "In vitro and in vivo Activity of SKI-606, a Novel Src-Abl Inhibitor, against Imatinib - Resistant Bcr - Abl + Neoplastic Cells", CANCER RESEARCH, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR CANCER RESEARCH, US, (20060101), vol. 66, no. 23, doi:10.1158/0008-5472.CAN-06-1199, ISSN 0008-5472, pages 11414 - 11322, XP002508641 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1158/0008-5472.CAN-06-1199 | by applicant | - PUTTINI ET AL., "SKI-606, a novel Src-Abl inhibitor is effective at reducing replication of imatininb resistant CML cell lines having certain mutations associate with imatinib resistance.", CANCER RES., (20061201), vol. 66, no. 23 |