Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5680961B | Global Dossier | 04.03.2015 | B2 | JP2010532527 | 07.10.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | US77137107 | 29.06.2007 | WO2008US66763 | 12.06.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2176747 | Global Dossier | 15.11.2017 | B1 | EP2176747 | 01.05.2013 | A4 | EP2176747 | 21.04.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US77137107 | 29.06.2007 | WO2008US66763 | 12.06.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BRPI0811105 | 16.04.2019 | B1 | BRPI0811105 | 09.12.2014 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US77137107 | 29.06.2007 | WO2008US66763 | 12.06.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101689119B | 20.03.2013 | B | CN101689119 | 31.03.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | US77137107 | 29.06.2007 | WO2008US66763 | 12.06.2008 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2009005996 | Global Dossier | 08.01.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US77137107 | 29.06.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8069341 | Global Dossier | 29.11.2011 | B2 | US2009006534 | 01.01.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US77137107 | 29.06.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2462749 | 27.09.2012 | C2 | RU2009149161 | 10.07.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | US77137107 | 29.06.2007 |