Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9511569 | Global Dossier | 06.12.2016 | B2 | US2009017240 | 15.01.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US16703608 | 02.07.2008 | US94776707 | 03.07.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2010532286 | Global Dossier | 07.10.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2008US68970 | 02.07.2008 | US94776707 | 03.07.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2008272943 | Global Dossier | 24.12.2009 | A2 | AU2008272943 | 08.01.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2008US68970 | 02.07.2008 | US94776707 | 03.07.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2167316 | Global Dossier | 31.03.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2008US68970 | 02.07.2008 | US94776707 | 03.07.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101687398 | 31.03.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2008US68970 | 02.07.2008 | US94776707 | 03.07.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2009006503 | Global Dossier | 08.01.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US94776707 | 03.07.2007 |