04.10.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] |
12.07.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.08.2013 [2013/33] |
17.05.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.06.2013 [2013/25] |
27.07.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.08.2012 [2012/35] |
20.07.2012 |
Correction of patent specification |
published on 22.08.2012 [2012/34] |
06.07.2012 |
Change - extension states |
published on 08.08.2012 [2012/32] |
29.06.2012 |
Change: Fee payment for extension state |
|
29.06.2012 |
New entry: Fee payment for extension state |
|
11.05.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.06.2012 [2012/24] |
27.04.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.05.2012 [2012/22] |
24.02.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.03.2012 [2012/13] |
30.12.2011 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 01.02.2012 [2012/05] |
02.12.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.01.2012 [2012/01] |
18.11.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.12.2011 [2011/51] |
11.11.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.12.2011 [2011/50] |
04.11.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.12.2011 [2011/49] |
21.10.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.11.2011 [2011/47] |
23.09.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.10.2011 [2011/43] |
16.09.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.10.2011 [2011/42] |
09.09.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.10.2011 [2011/41] |
26.08.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.09.2011 [2011/39] |
19.08.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.09.2011 [2011/38] |
12.08.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.09.2011 [2011/37] |
05.08.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.09.2011 [2011/36] |
21.01.2011 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 23.02.2011 [2011/08] |
21.01.2011 |
Change - extension states |
published on 23.02.2011 [2011/08] |
21.01.2011 |
Change - German title |
published on 23.02.2011 [2011/08] |
14.01.2011 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
14.01.2011 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
17.09.2010 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
17.07.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
19.03.2010 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 21.04.2010 [2010/16] |
19.03.2010 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 21.04.2010 [2010/16] |
16.02.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
09.02.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
20.01.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
10.07.2009 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
04.02.2009 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
29.01.2009 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
11.11.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|