EP2170456 - SEIZURE FORECASTING, MICROSEIZURE PRECURSOR EVENTS, AND RELATED THERAPEUTIC METHODS AND DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.09.2017 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.09.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.11.2017 [2017/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MAYO FOUNDATION FOR MEDICAL EDUCATION AND RESEARCH 200 First Street S.W. Rochester, MN 55905 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2010/14] | For all designated states Mayo Foundation for Medical Education and Research 200 First Street SW Rochester, MN 55905 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WORRELL, Gregory A. 1220 First Street N.W. Rochester, Minnesota 55901 / US | 02 /
STEAD, Squire M. 820 8 Ave SW Pine Island, MN 55963-6778 / US | [2010/21] |
Former [2010/14] | 01 /
WORRELL, Gregory A. 1220 First Street N.W. Rochester, Minnesota 55901 / US | ||
02 /
STEAD, Squire M. 5010 Wood Lane N.W. Rochester, Minnesota 55901 / US | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/14] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstraße 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08772516.4 | 11.07.2008 | [2010/14] | WO2008US69769 | Priority number, date | US20070959076P | 11.07.2007 Original published format: US 959076 P | [2010/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009009724 | Date: | 15.01.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2170456 | Date: | 07.04.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.01.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 15.01.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.08.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A61N1/18, A61N1/05, A61B5/00, A61B5/0478, A61B5/0484, A61N1/36 | [2016/38] | CPC: |
A61N1/0531 (EP,US);
A61B5/291 (EP,US);
A61B5/377 (EP,US);
A61B5/4094 (EP,US);
A61N1/0534 (EP,US);
A61B2562/046 (EP,US);
A61N1/36082 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2010/14] | A61N1/18 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/14] | Title | German: | VORHERSAGE VON KRAMPFANFÄLLEN, MIKROANFALLS-VORLÄUFEREREIGNISSEN UND RELEVANTE THERAPEUTISCHE VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNGEN | [2010/14] | English: | SEIZURE FORECASTING, MICROSEIZURE PRECURSOR EVENTS, AND RELATED THERAPEUTIC METHODS AND DEVICES | [2010/14] | French: | PRÉVISION D'ATTAQUE, ÉVÈNEMENTS PRÉCURSEURS DE MICRO-ATTAQUE ET PROCÉDÉS ET DISPOSITIFS THÉRAPEUTIQUES APPARENTÉS | [2010/14] | Entry into regional phase | 09.02.2010 | National basic fee paid | 09.02.2010 | Search fee paid | 09.02.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.02.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.02.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.02.2010 | Examination requested [2010/14] | 17.03.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/44] | 04.05.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2017 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2007067003 (SANCHEZ JUSTIN C [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0103] - [0121] *; | [X]WO03077988 (UNIV DUKE [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * abstract * * pages 13-27 *; | [A]WO0007494 (DILORENZO DANIEL J [US]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | International search | [X]US2003083716 (NICOLELIS MIGUEL A L [US], et al); | [Y]US2007142871 (LIBBUS IMAD [US], et al); | [Y] - SMART ET AL., "Automatic Detection of High Frequency Epileptiform Oscillations from Intracranial EEG Recordings of Patients with Neocortical Epilepsy", (20050407), XP010905874 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TPSD.2005.1614347 |