EP2165369 - ANTI-FUSE MEMORY CELL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.07.2017 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sidense Corp. 84 Hines Road Suite 260 Ottawa, Ontario K2K 3G3 / CA | [2010/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KURJANOWICZ, Wlodek 280 McLean Avenue Arnprior, Ontario K7S 3T2 / CA | 02 /
SMITH, Steven 38 Pine Ridge Road Wakefield, Québec J0X 3G0 / CA | [2010/12] | Representative(s) | V.O. P.O. Box 87930 2508 DH Den Haag / NL | [2016/36] |
Former [2010/12] | Hatzmann, Martin, et al Vereenigde Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 08772785.5 | 11.06.2008 | [2010/12] | WO2008CA01122 | Priority number, date | US20070762552 | 13.06.2007 Original published format: US 762552 | [2010/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008151429 | Date: | 18.12.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2165369 | Date: | 24.03.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.12.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2165369 | Date: | 07.09.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 18.12.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.12.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H01L29/66, G11C11/40, G11C17/16, H01L21/336, H01L29/78, H03K19/177, H01L27/10, H01L27/112, // H01L23/525 | [2016/15] | CPC: |
G11C17/16 (EP,KR,US);
G11C5/02 (KR);
G11C5/06 (KR);
H10B20/00 (EP,US);
H10B20/25 (EP,KR,US);
H01L23/5252 (EP,US);
H01L2924/0002 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/0002, H01L2924/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2011/01] | H01L29/66, G11C11/40, G11C17/16, H01L21/336, H01L29/78, H03K19/177, H01L27/10, // H01L23/525 | ||
Former IPC [2010/12] | H01L29/66, G11C11/40, G11C17/16, H01L21/336, H01L29/78, H03K19/177 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/36] |
Former [2010/12] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | ANTISCHMELZVERBINDUNGS-SPEICHERZELLE | [2010/12] | English: | ANTI-FUSE MEMORY CELL | [2010/12] | French: | CELLULE DE MÉMOIRE ANTI-FUSIBLE | [2010/12] | Entry into regional phase | 13.01.2010 | National basic fee paid | 13.01.2010 | Search fee paid | 13.01.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.01.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.01.2010 | Examination requested [2010/12] | 27.06.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.07.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.11.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.07.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.11.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.03.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.07.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 13.07.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.07.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.07.2013 | Opposition(s) | 08.06.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 15.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 11.06.2008 | AT | 07.09.2016 | BE | 07.09.2016 | CY | 07.09.2016 | CZ | 07.09.2016 | DK | 07.09.2016 | EE | 07.09.2016 | ES | 07.09.2016 | FI | 07.09.2016 | HR | 07.09.2016 | IT | 07.09.2016 | LT | 07.09.2016 | LV | 07.09.2016 | MC | 07.09.2016 | NL | 07.09.2016 | PL | 07.09.2016 | RO | 07.09.2016 | SE | 07.09.2016 | SI | 07.09.2016 | SK | 07.09.2016 | TR | 07.09.2016 | BG | 07.12.2016 | NO | 07.12.2016 | GR | 08.12.2016 | IS | 07.01.2017 | PT | 09.01.2017 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/46] | HU | 11.06.2008 | |
AT | 07.09.2016 | ||
BE | 07.09.2016 | ||
CY | 07.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 07.09.2016 | ||
DK | 07.09.2016 | ||
EE | 07.09.2016 | ||
ES | 07.09.2016 | ||
FI | 07.09.2016 | ||
HR | 07.09.2016 | ||
IT | 07.09.2016 | ||
LT | 07.09.2016 | ||
LV | 07.09.2016 | ||
MC | 07.09.2016 | ||
NL | 07.09.2016 | ||
PL | 07.09.2016 | ||
RO | 07.09.2016 | ||
SE | 07.09.2016 | ||
SI | 07.09.2016 | ||
SK | 07.09.2016 | ||
BG | 07.12.2016 | ||
NO | 07.12.2016 | ||
GR | 08.12.2016 | ||
IS | 07.01.2017 | ||
PT | 09.01.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 11.06.2008 | |
AT | 07.09.2016 | ||
BE | 07.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 07.09.2016 | ||
DK | 07.09.2016 | ||
EE | 07.09.2016 | ||
ES | 07.09.2016 | ||
FI | 07.09.2016 | ||
HR | 07.09.2016 | ||
IT | 07.09.2016 | ||
LT | 07.09.2016 | ||
LV | 07.09.2016 | ||
MC | 07.09.2016 | ||
NL | 07.09.2016 | ||
PL | 07.09.2016 | ||
RO | 07.09.2016 | ||
SE | 07.09.2016 | ||
SI | 07.09.2016 | ||
SK | 07.09.2016 | ||
BG | 07.12.2016 | ||
NO | 07.12.2016 | ||
GR | 08.12.2016 | ||
IS | 07.01.2017 | ||
PT | 09.01.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 07.09.2016 | |
BE | 07.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 07.09.2016 | ||
DK | 07.09.2016 | ||
EE | 07.09.2016 | ||
ES | 07.09.2016 | ||
FI | 07.09.2016 | ||
HR | 07.09.2016 | ||
IT | 07.09.2016 | ||
LT | 07.09.2016 | ||
LV | 07.09.2016 | ||
MC | 07.09.2016 | ||
NL | 07.09.2016 | ||
PL | 07.09.2016 | ||
RO | 07.09.2016 | ||
SE | 07.09.2016 | ||
SI | 07.09.2016 | ||
SK | 07.09.2016 | ||
BG | 07.12.2016 | ||
NO | 07.12.2016 | ||
GR | 08.12.2016 | ||
IS | 07.01.2017 | ||
PT | 09.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 07.09.2016 | |
BE | 07.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 07.09.2016 | ||
DK | 07.09.2016 | ||
EE | 07.09.2016 | ||
ES | 07.09.2016 | ||
FI | 07.09.2016 | ||
HR | 07.09.2016 | ||
IT | 07.09.2016 | ||
LT | 07.09.2016 | ||
LV | 07.09.2016 | ||
NL | 07.09.2016 | ||
PL | 07.09.2016 | ||
RO | 07.09.2016 | ||
SE | 07.09.2016 | ||
SI | 07.09.2016 | ||
SK | 07.09.2016 | ||
BG | 07.12.2016 | ||
NO | 07.12.2016 | ||
GR | 08.12.2016 | ||
IS | 07.01.2017 | ||
PT | 09.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/34] | AT | 07.09.2016 | |
BE | 07.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 07.09.2016 | ||
DK | 07.09.2016 | ||
EE | 07.09.2016 | ||
ES | 07.09.2016 | ||
FI | 07.09.2016 | ||
HR | 07.09.2016 | ||
IT | 07.09.2016 | ||
LT | 07.09.2016 | ||
LV | 07.09.2016 | ||
NL | 07.09.2016 | ||
PL | 07.09.2016 | ||
RO | 07.09.2016 | ||
SE | 07.09.2016 | ||
SK | 07.09.2016 | ||
BG | 07.12.2016 | ||
NO | 07.12.2016 | ||
GR | 08.12.2016 | ||
IS | 07.01.2017 | ||
PT | 09.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/32] | AT | 07.09.2016 | |
BE | 07.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 07.09.2016 | ||
EE | 07.09.2016 | ||
ES | 07.09.2016 | ||
FI | 07.09.2016 | ||
HR | 07.09.2016 | ||
IT | 07.09.2016 | ||
LT | 07.09.2016 | ||
LV | 07.09.2016 | ||
NL | 07.09.2016 | ||
PL | 07.09.2016 | ||
RO | 07.09.2016 | ||
SE | 07.09.2016 | ||
SK | 07.09.2016 | ||
BG | 07.12.2016 | ||
NO | 07.12.2016 | ||
GR | 08.12.2016 | ||
IS | 07.01.2017 | ||
PT | 09.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/13] | ES | 07.09.2016 | |
FI | 07.09.2016 | ||
HR | 07.09.2016 | ||
LT | 07.09.2016 | ||
LV | 07.09.2016 | ||
NL | 07.09.2016 | ||
SE | 07.09.2016 | ||
NO | 07.12.2016 | ||
GR | 08.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | ES | 07.09.2016 | |
FI | 07.09.2016 | ||
HR | 07.09.2016 | ||
LT | 07.09.2016 | ||
SE | 07.09.2016 | ||
NO | 07.12.2016 | ||
GR | 08.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | FI | 07.09.2016 | |
HR | 07.09.2016 | ||
LT | 07.09.2016 | ||
SE | 07.09.2016 | ||
NO | 07.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | FI | 07.09.2016 | |
LT | 07.09.2016 | ||
NO | 07.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | LT | 07.09.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5646438 (FRERICHS HEINZ-PETER [DE]); | [XI]WO2005109516 (SIDENSE CORP [CA], et al); | [A]US2006292755 (PARRIS PATRICE M [US], et al) | International search | [A]US5646438 (FRERICHS HEINZ-PETER [DE]); | [X]US6369422 (LOJEK BOHUMIL [US]); | [A]US6531410 (BERTIN CLAUDE LOUIS [US], et al); | [A]US6713839 (MADURAWE RAMINDA U [US]); | [A]US6940751 (PENG JACK ZEZHONG [US], et al); | [X]US2006244099 (KURJANOWICZ WLODEK [CA]); | [X]US2006292755 (PARRIS PATRICE M [US], et al) | by applicant | US3423646 | US3634929 | US4322822 | US4507757 | US4543594 | US4823181 | US4899205 | US5019878 | US5110754 | US5241496 | US5672994 | US5742555 | US6087707 | US2002027822 | US2002074616 | US6515344 | US6580145 | US6597234 | US6611040 | US2003202376 | US2003206467 | US6667602 | US6667902 | US6671040 | US2004004269 | US2004023440 | WO2005109516 |