17.08.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] |
13.07.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.08.2018 [2018/33] |
15.06.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.07.2018 [2018/29] |
08.06.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.07.2018 [2018/28] |
01.09.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.10.2017 [2017/40] |
13.01.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.02.2017 [2017/07] |
16.12.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.01.2017 [2017/03] |
05.08.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.09.2016 [2016/36] |
27.05.2016 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 29.06.2016 [2016/26] |
06.05.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.06.2016 [2016/23] |
29.04.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.06.2016 [2016/22] |
15.04.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.05.2016 [2016/20] |
19.02.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.03.2016 [2016/12] |
12.02.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.03.2016 [2016/11] |
05.02.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.03.2016 [2016/10] |
29.01.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.03.2016 [2016/09] |
22.01.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.02.2016 [2016/08] |
15.01.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.02.2016 [2016/07] |
19.06.2015 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 22.07.2015 [2015/30] |
15.06.2015 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
15.06.2015 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
12.06.2015 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
12.06.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
03.03.2015 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
20.06.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
01.02.2014 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
24.09.2013 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
20.09.2013 |
First examination report |
|
27.06.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
01.03.2013 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
03.08.2012 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 05.09.2012 [2012/36] |
03.08.2012 |
Change - classification |
published on 05.09.2012 [2012/36] |
03.08.2012 |
Change - classification |
published on 05.09.2012 [2012/36] |
29.06.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
21.09.2011 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee |
|
21.09.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
01.08.2011 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
03.12.2010 |
Change - extension states |
published on 05.01.2011 [2011/01] |
14.05.2010 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 16.06.2010 [2010/24] |
14.05.2010 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 16.06.2010 [2010/24] |
11.05.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
23.04.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
23.04.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
17.04.2009 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.04.2009 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
27.08.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|