Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8375937 | Global Dossier | 19.02.2013 | B2 | US2010307486 | 09.12.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2008CN01205 | 20.06.2008 | CN200710152549 | 27.09.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5153878B | Global Dossier | 27.02.2013 | B2 | JP2010540044 | 24.12.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2008CN01205 | 20.06.2008 | CN200710152549 | 27.09.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2196149 | Global Dossier | 22.07.2015 | B1 | EP2196149 | 05.09.2012 | A4 | EP2196149 | 16.06.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2008CN01205 | 20.06.2008 | CN200710152549 | 27.09.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2545270T | 09.09.2015 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2008CN01205 | 20.06.2008 | CN200710152549 | 27.09.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2009039721 | Global Dossier | 02.04.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CN200710152549 | 27.09.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101174418B | Global Dossier | 16.08.2012 | B1 | KR20100075561 | 02.07.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | CN200710152549 | 27.09.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101396280 | 01.04.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | CN200710152549 | 27.09.2007 |