EP2406523 - ACTUATOR WITH PUSH CABLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.02.2013 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.02.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.03.2013 [2013/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kataka A/s Advokat Michael Seiffert Amaliegade 22 1256 Copenhagen K / DK | [2012/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SO̸RENSEN, Jens Jo̸rren Blekingegade 1 DK-2300 Ko̸benhavn S / DK | 02 /
JUUL RASMUSSEN, Janus Granvej 55 DK-3200 Helsinge / DK | [2012/03] | Representative(s) | Nordic Patent Service A/S Bredgade 30 1260 Copenhagen K / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2012/03] | Nordic Patent Service A/S Pilestræde 58 1112 Copenhagen K / DK | Application number, filing date | 08773338.2 | 08.05.2008 | WO2008EP03697 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009135508 | Date: | 12.11.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2406523 | Date: | 18.01.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.11.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.11.2009 | Classification | IPC: | F16H19/00, F16G13/20 | [2012/03] | CPC: |
F16G13/20 (EP,US);
F16H19/0636 (EP,US);
F16H19/0618 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49716 (EP,US);
Y10T74/18568 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2012/03] | Title | German: | AKTUATOR MIT ZUGKABEL | [2012/03] | English: | ACTUATOR WITH PUSH CABLE | [2012/03] | French: | ACTIONNEUR DOTÉ D UN CÂBLE DE POUSSÉE | [2012/03] | Entry into regional phase | 11.04.2011 | National basic fee paid | 11.04.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.04.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.04.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.04.2011 | Examination requested [2012/03] | 21.05.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.10.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/13] | 05.11.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/13] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.05.2012 | Request for further processing for: | 11.04.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 11.04.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 11.04.2011 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the filing fee | 11.04.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 11.04.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 11.04.2011 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee | 11.04.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 11.04.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 11.04.2011 | Decision despatched | 11.04.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 11.04.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 11.04.2011 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees TR, SK, SI, SE, RO, PT, PL, NO, NL, MT, MC, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, HR, GR, GB, FR, FI, ES, EE, DK, DE, CZ, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT | 11.04.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 11.04.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 11.04.2011 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 08.12.2010 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   30.06.2011 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DA]WO9953221 (VELUX IND AS [DK], et al) [DA] 1-19,47-55 * the whole document * | by applicant | WO9953221 |