EP2167021 - DENTRIFICE COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.05.2011 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.05.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.06.2011 [2011/25] | Applicant(s) | For:CY
GB
IE
MT
Unilever PLC Unilever House Blackfriars London Greater London EC4P 4BQ / GB | For all designated states Unilever N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2010/13] | For:CY
GB
IE
MT
Unilever PLC Unilever House Blackfriars London Greater London EC4P 4BQ / GB | ||
For all designated states Unilever N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AGARWAL, Rupesh, Kumar Hindustan Unilever Limited BD Sawant Marg Chakala Andheri (east) Mumbai 400 099 / IN | 02 /
FRANCIS, Edward Hindustan Unilever Limited BD Sawant Marg Chakala Andheri (east) Mumbai 400 099 / IN | 03 /
GREEN, Alison, Katharine Unilever R&D Port Sunlight Quarry Road East Bebington Wirral Merseyside CH63 3JW / GB | 04 /
NAVADA, Rekha Hindustan Unilever Limited BD Sawant Marg Chakala Andheri (east) Mumbai 400 099 / IN | [2010/13] | Representative(s) | Whaley, Christopher Unilever NV Patent Group Olivier van Noortlaan 120 3133 AT Vlaardingen / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2010/13] | Whaley, Christopher Unilever NV Patent Group Olivier van Noortlaan 120 3133 AT Vlaardingen / NL | Application number, filing date | 08774508.9 | 30.06.2008 | [2010/13] | WO2008EP58354 | Priority number, date | IN2007MUM1356 | 16.07.2007 Original published format: IN MU13562007 | EP20070119468 | 29.10.2007 Original published format: EP 07119468 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009010381 | Date: | 22.01.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2167021 | Date: | 31.03.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.01.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.01.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61K8/27, A61K8/86, A61Q11/00 | [2010/13] | CPC: |
A61K8/27 (EP);
A61K8/86 (EP);
A61Q11/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/13] | Title | German: | ZAHNPASTAZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [2010/13] | English: | DENTRIFICE COMPOSITION | [2010/13] | French: | COMPOSITION DE DENTIFRICE | [2010/13] | Entry into regional phase | 08.01.2010 | National basic fee paid | 08.01.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.01.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.05.2009 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 08.01.2010 | Examination requested [2010/13] | 12.08.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.12.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/25] | 28.01.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/25] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.08.2010 | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2010 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US5302373 (GIACIN) [Y] 1-3,7-14 * example IV *; | [Y]US3888976 (MLKVY) [Y] 1-14 * page 4, line 1 - line 12 * * page 6, line 23 - line 36 *; | [Y]EP0867173 (PROCTER & GAMBLE) [Y] 1-14 * claim - *; | [Y]EP0396232 (VIPONT PHARMACEUTICAL) [Y] 1-14 * examples III,IV *; | [Y]US4416867 (LEVER BROTHERS) [Y] 1-14 * example - *; | [Y]EP0867174 (PROCTER & GAMBLE) [Y] 1,4,5,7-10 * page 6, line 24 - page 7, line 5 *; | [AD]EP0251542 (LION CORPORATION) [AD] 1-14 * the whole document * |