EP2301211 - DATA PACKET PROCESSING FOR ESTIMATION OF A DIRECTION TOWARDS A TRANSMITTER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.08.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.09.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.04.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.03.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.11.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Technologies Oy Karakaari 7 02610 Espoo / FI | [2019/36] |
Former [2015/32] | For all designated states Nokia Technologies Oy Karaportti 3 02610 Espoo / FI | ||
Former [2014/24] | For all designated states Nokia Corporation Karakaari 7 02610 Espoo / FI | ||
Former [2011/13] | For all designated states Nokia Corporation Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAINULAINEN, Antti Paavo Tapani Ajurinmäki 5 A 28 FI-02650 Espoo / FI | 02 /
TEIKARI, Ilari Aleksi Poutunkuja 5 C 53 FI-00400 Helsinki / FI | 03 /
RANKI, Ville Valtteri Alberganesplanadi 9 B 30 FI-02600 Espoo / FI | [2011/17] |
Former [2011/13] | 01 /
KAINULAINEN, Antti Paavo Tapani Ajurinmäki 5 A 28 FI-02650 Espoo / FI | ||
02 /
TEIKARI, Ilari Aleksi Poutunkuja 5 C 53 FI-00500 Helsinki / FI | |||
03 /
RANKI, Ville Valtteri Alberganesplanadi 9 B 30 FI-02600 Espoo / FI | Representative(s) | Cohausz & Florack Patent- & Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Bleichstraße 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | [2021/41] |
Former [2011/13] | Cohausz & Florack Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft Bleichstraße 14 DE-40211 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 08775187.1 | 17.07.2008 | [2011/13] | WO2008EP59407 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010006651 | Date: | 21.01.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2301211 | Date: | 30.03.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.01.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2301211 | Date: | 13.10.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.01.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G01S3/16, H04B7/08, H04L25/03, H04W4/80 | [2020/47] | CPC: |
H04L25/03866 (EP,US);
H04B7/08 (KR);
G01S3/16 (EP,US);
H04B1/10 (US);
H04B7/0814 (EP,US);
H04B7/086 (EP,US);
H04L1/00 (KR);
H04L25/0204 (US);
H04L25/08 (US);
H04W4/80 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2011/13] | H04L25/03, H04B7/08 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2021/41] |
Former [2011/13] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | DATENPAKETVERARBEITUNG ZUR SCHÄTZUNG EINER RICHTUNG ZU EINEM SENDER | [2011/13] | English: | DATA PACKET PROCESSING FOR ESTIMATION OF A DIRECTION TOWARDS A TRANSMITTER | [2011/13] | French: | TRAITEMENT DE PAQUETS DE DONNÉES POUR L'ESTIMATION D'UNE DIRECTION VERS UN ÉMETTEUR | [2011/13] | Entry into regional phase | 20.01.2011 | National basic fee paid | 20.01.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.01.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.01.2010 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 20.01.2011 | Examination requested [2011/13] | 10.03.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.03.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.09.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.01.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.05.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.11.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.02.2021 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 28.04.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.09.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 02.09.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.09.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP11157674.0 / EP2326052 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.03.2018 | Opposition(s) | 14.07.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 11.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 15.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 14.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 15.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.07.2008 | AT | 13.10.2021 | CY | 13.10.2021 | CZ | 13.10.2021 | DK | 13.10.2021 | EE | 13.10.2021 | ES | 13.10.2021 | FI | 13.10.2021 | HR | 13.10.2021 | IT | 13.10.2021 | LT | 13.10.2021 | LV | 13.10.2021 | MC | 13.10.2021 | MT | 13.10.2021 | NL | 13.10.2021 | PL | 13.10.2021 | RO | 13.10.2021 | SE | 13.10.2021 | SI | 13.10.2021 | SK | 13.10.2021 | BG | 13.01.2022 | NO | 13.01.2022 | GR | 14.01.2022 | IS | 13.02.2022 | PT | 14.02.2022 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/20] | HU | 17.07.2008 | |
AT | 13.10.2021 | ||
CY | 13.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 13.10.2021 | ||
DK | 13.10.2021 | ||
EE | 13.10.2021 | ||
ES | 13.10.2021 | ||
FI | 13.10.2021 | ||
HR | 13.10.2021 | ||
IT | 13.10.2021 | ||
LT | 13.10.2021 | ||
LV | 13.10.2021 | ||
MC | 13.10.2021 | ||
NL | 13.10.2021 | ||
PL | 13.10.2021 | ||
RO | 13.10.2021 | ||
SE | 13.10.2021 | ||
SI | 13.10.2021 | ||
SK | 13.10.2021 | ||
BG | 13.01.2022 | ||
NO | 13.01.2022 | ||
GR | 14.01.2022 | ||
IS | 13.02.2022 | ||
PT | 14.02.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 17.07.2008 | |
AT | 13.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 13.10.2021 | ||
DK | 13.10.2021 | ||
EE | 13.10.2021 | ||
ES | 13.10.2021 | ||
FI | 13.10.2021 | ||
HR | 13.10.2021 | ||
IT | 13.10.2021 | ||
LT | 13.10.2021 | ||
LV | 13.10.2021 | ||
MC | 13.10.2021 | ||
NL | 13.10.2021 | ||
PL | 13.10.2021 | ||
RO | 13.10.2021 | ||
SE | 13.10.2021 | ||
SI | 13.10.2021 | ||
SK | 13.10.2021 | ||
BG | 13.01.2022 | ||
NO | 13.01.2022 | ||
GR | 14.01.2022 | ||
IS | 13.02.2022 | ||
PT | 14.02.2022 | ||
Former [2023/27] | AT | 13.10.2021 | |
CZ | 13.10.2021 | ||
DK | 13.10.2021 | ||
EE | 13.10.2021 | ||
ES | 13.10.2021 | ||
FI | 13.10.2021 | ||
HR | 13.10.2021 | ||
IT | 13.10.2021 | ||
LT | 13.10.2021 | ||
LV | 13.10.2021 | ||
MC | 13.10.2021 | ||
NL | 13.10.2021 | ||
PL | 13.10.2021 | ||
RO | 13.10.2021 | ||
SE | 13.10.2021 | ||
SI | 13.10.2021 | ||
SK | 13.10.2021 | ||
BG | 13.01.2022 | ||
NO | 13.01.2022 | ||
GR | 14.01.2022 | ||
IS | 13.02.2022 | ||
PT | 14.02.2022 | ||
Former [2023/11] | AT | 13.10.2021 | |
CZ | 13.10.2021 | ||
DK | 13.10.2021 | ||
EE | 13.10.2021 | ||
ES | 13.10.2021 | ||
FI | 13.10.2021 | ||
HR | 13.10.2021 | ||
LT | 13.10.2021 | ||
LV | 13.10.2021 | ||
MC | 13.10.2021 | ||
NL | 13.10.2021 | ||
PL | 13.10.2021 | ||
RO | 13.10.2021 | ||
SE | 13.10.2021 | ||
SI | 13.10.2021 | ||
SK | 13.10.2021 | ||
BG | 13.01.2022 | ||
NO | 13.01.2022 | ||
GR | 14.01.2022 | ||
IS | 13.02.2022 | ||
PT | 14.02.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AT | 13.10.2021 | |
CZ | 13.10.2021 | ||
DK | 13.10.2021 | ||
EE | 13.10.2021 | ||
ES | 13.10.2021 | ||
FI | 13.10.2021 | ||
HR | 13.10.2021 | ||
LT | 13.10.2021 | ||
LV | 13.10.2021 | ||
NL | 13.10.2021 | ||
PL | 13.10.2021 | ||
RO | 13.10.2021 | ||
SE | 13.10.2021 | ||
SI | 13.10.2021 | ||
SK | 13.10.2021 | ||
BG | 13.01.2022 | ||
NO | 13.01.2022 | ||
GR | 14.01.2022 | ||
IS | 13.02.2022 | ||
PT | 14.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | AT | 13.10.2021 | |
CZ | 13.10.2021 | ||
DK | 13.10.2021 | ||
EE | 13.10.2021 | ||
ES | 13.10.2021 | ||
FI | 13.10.2021 | ||
HR | 13.10.2021 | ||
LT | 13.10.2021 | ||
LV | 13.10.2021 | ||
NL | 13.10.2021 | ||
PL | 13.10.2021 | ||
RO | 13.10.2021 | ||
SE | 13.10.2021 | ||
SK | 13.10.2021 | ||
BG | 13.01.2022 | ||
NO | 13.01.2022 | ||
GR | 14.01.2022 | ||
IS | 13.02.2022 | ||
PT | 14.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AT | 13.10.2021 | |
EE | 13.10.2021 | ||
ES | 13.10.2021 | ||
FI | 13.10.2021 | ||
HR | 13.10.2021 | ||
LT | 13.10.2021 | ||
LV | 13.10.2021 | ||
NL | 13.10.2021 | ||
PL | 13.10.2021 | ||
RO | 13.10.2021 | ||
SE | 13.10.2021 | ||
BG | 13.01.2022 | ||
NO | 13.01.2022 | ||
GR | 14.01.2022 | ||
IS | 13.02.2022 | ||
PT | 14.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/25] | AT | 13.10.2021 | |
ES | 13.10.2021 | ||
FI | 13.10.2021 | ||
HR | 13.10.2021 | ||
LT | 13.10.2021 | ||
LV | 13.10.2021 | ||
NL | 13.10.2021 | ||
PL | 13.10.2021 | ||
SE | 13.10.2021 | ||
BG | 13.01.2022 | ||
NO | 13.01.2022 | ||
GR | 14.01.2022 | ||
IS | 13.02.2022 | ||
PT | 14.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/24] | AT | 13.10.2021 | |
ES | 13.10.2021 | ||
FI | 13.10.2021 | ||
HR | 13.10.2021 | ||
LT | 13.10.2021 | ||
LV | 13.10.2021 | ||
NL | 13.10.2021 | ||
PL | 13.10.2021 | ||
SE | 13.10.2021 | ||
BG | 13.01.2022 | ||
GR | 14.01.2022 | ||
IS | 13.02.2022 | ||
PT | 14.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AT | 13.10.2021 | |
ES | 13.10.2021 | ||
FI | 13.10.2021 | ||
HR | 13.10.2021 | ||
LT | 13.10.2021 | ||
LV | 13.10.2021 | ||
PL | 13.10.2021 | ||
BG | 13.01.2022 | ||
PT | 14.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/22] | AT | 13.10.2021 | |
FI | 13.10.2021 | ||
LT | 13.10.2021 | ||
BG | 13.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 13.10.2021 | |
BG | 13.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/19] | BG | 13.01.2022 | Cited in | International search | [X]US4864617 (HOLMQUIST KURT E [US]) [X] 1,10,20,26,31,32 * column 2, line 1 - line 35 * * column 2, line 62 - line 65 * * column 3, line 22 - line 31 * * column 3, line 55 - line 60 * * figure 1 *; | [X]EP0367487 (TRW INC [US]) [X] 33-45 * column 1, line 3 - line 8 * * column 2, line 40 - column 3, line 11 * * column 5, line 51 - column 6, line 20 *; | [A]WO9622662 (ARRAYCOMM INC [US]) [A] 33-45 * page 3, paragraph 2 - paragraph 4 * * page 17, line 30 - line 36 *; | [A]WO9626576 (3COM CORP [US]) [A] 1-32 * page 7, line 24 - line 28 * * page 9, line 16 - line 22 * * page 27, line 8 - line 25 * * page 28, line 8 - line 9 * * page 28, line 24 - line 30 *; | [Y]EP0953850 (LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [Y] 11,12,27,28 * paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0012] * * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0018] * * paragraph [0027] *; | [A]US6255991 (HEDIN GEORGE L [US]) [A] 33,37-39,43-45 * column 1, line 5 - line 23 * * column 3, line 35 - line 46 ** column 4, line 34 - line 41 *; | [A]US2001020917 (HAMADA HAJIME [JP], et al) [A] 33-45 * figures 9,10 * * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0014] * * paragraph [0089] - paragraph [0100] *; | [A]WO02054850 (NOKIA CORP [FI], et al) [A] 1-32 * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0008] * * page 7, line 15 - line 19 * * page 14, line 3 - line 4 * * paragraph [0040] *; | [A]GB2384957 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [A] 1,4-7,10,13-16 * page 13, line 7 - line 12 * * page 21, line 1 - line 9 * * page 22, line 14 - line 17 * * page 27, line 12 - line 19 * * page 28, line 8 - line 20 * * claim 3 * * claim 42 * * figures 7,8 *; | [A]JP2005065010 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [A] 1-3,10-12,20-22,26-28 * abstract *; | [A]WO2006029790 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE], et al) [A] 20,26 * page 1, line 28 - line 34 * * page 6, line 16 - line 22 *; | [XY]EP1648128 (OASIS SILICON SYSTEMS INC [US]) [X] 1-10,13-26,29-32 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0018] * * paragraph [0048] * [Y] 11,12,27,28; | [A]US2006182201 (LINDENMEIER HEINZ [DE], et al) [A] 1-3,10-12,20-22,26-28 * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0033] *; | [A]US2007189412 (XIA PENGFEI [US], et al) [A] 1,2,10,12,20,21,26,27 * paragraph [0043] * |