EP2183467 - ROTOR ARRANGEMENT OF A TURBINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 15.09.2023 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.09.2023 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 18.10.2023 [2023/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ansaldo Energia IP UK Limited 5th Floor, North Side 7/10 Chandos Street Cavendish Square London W1G 9DQ / GB | [2023/42] |
Former [2017/21] | For all designated states Ansaldo Energia IP UK Limited 5th Floor, North Side 7/10 Chandos Street Cavendish Square London W1G 9DQ / GB | ||
Former [2016/33] | For all designated states General Electric Technology GmbH Brown Boveri Strasse 7 5400 Baden / CH | ||
Former [2015/47] | For all designated states ALSTOM Technology Ltd Brown Boveri Strasse 7 5400 Baden / CH | ||
Former [2010/19] | For all designated states Alstom Technology Ltd Brown Boveri Strasse 7 5400 Baden / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WUNDERLE, Helmar Ziegelmattenweg 4 79761 Waldshut-Tiengen / DE | 02 /
SCHLECHTRIEM, Stefan Sonnenweg 15 CH-5507 Mellingen / CH | 03 /
GRAF, Peter Am Rhein 3/B 79790 Küssaberg / DE | 04 /
GLASER, Silvio Hinterhofstrasse 10 CH-5242 Birr / CH | 05 /
VON ARX, Beat Hochgasse 19 CH-4632 Trimbach / CH | [2010/24] |
Former [2010/19] | 01 /
WUNDERLE, Helmar Ziegelmattenweg 4 79761 Waldshut-Tiengen / DE | ||
02 /
SCHLECHTRIEM, Stefan Winkelackerweg 2 CH-5522 Tägerig / CH | |||
03 /
GRAF, Peter Am Rhein 3/B 79790 Küssaberg / DE | |||
04 /
GLASER, Silvio Hinterhofstrasse 10 CH-5242 Birr / CH | |||
05 /
VON ARX, Beat Hochgasse 19 CH-4632 Trimbach / CH | Representative(s) | Studio Torta S.p.A., et al Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | [2023/42] |
Former [2015/47] | Alstom Technology Ltd CHTI Intellectual Property Brown Boveri Strasse 7 5400 Baden / CH | Application number, filing date | 08775236.6 | 21.07.2008 | [2010/19] | WO2008EP59507 | Priority number, date | CH20070001258 | 08.08.2007 Original published format: CH 12582007 | [2010/19] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009019126 | Date: | 12.02.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2183467 | Date: | 12.05.2010 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.02.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2183467 | Date: | 18.11.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/47] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP2183467 | Date: | 18.10.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.02.2009 | Classification | IPC: | F01D11/00, F01D5/30 | [2015/28] | CPC: |
F01D5/3007 (EP,US);
F01D11/005 (EP,US);
F05D2240/55 (EP,US);
F05D2250/13 (EP,US);
F05D2250/182 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49316 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2010/19] | F01D5/30 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/47] |
Former [2010/19] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | ROTORANORDNUNG VON EINER TURBINE | [2010/19] | English: | ROTOR ARRANGEMENT OF A TURBINE | [2010/19] | French: | AGENCEMENT DE ROTOR DE TURBINE | [2010/19] | Entry into regional phase | 01.02.2010 | National basic fee paid | 01.02.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.02.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.02.2010 | Examination requested [2010/19] | 24.01.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.08.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.02.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.06.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.07.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.10.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 09.10.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.10.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.01.2011 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
13.08.2016
25.08.2016
ADMISSIBLE MTU Aero Engines AG Postfach 50 06 40 80976 München / DE Opponent's representative Wallinger, Michael Wallinger Ricker Schlotter Tostmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Zweibrückenstrasse 5-7 80331 München / DE | [2018/04] |
Former [2016/38] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
13.08.2016
MTU Aero Engines AG Postfach 50 06 40 80976 München / DE | 28.09.2016 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 01.02.2017 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 09.10.2018 | Date of oral proceedings | 09.05.2019 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 09.05.2019 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 14.02.2023 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 01.06.2023 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 01.09.2023 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 17.07.2019 | Appeal received No. T2063/19 | 27.08.2019 | Statement of grounds filed | 14.02.2023 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor withdrawn | 14.02.2023 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.07.2008 | BG | 18.11.2015 | CY | 18.11.2015 | CZ | 18.11.2015 | DK | 18.11.2015 | EE | 18.11.2015 | ES | 18.11.2015 | FI | 18.11.2015 | HR | 18.11.2015 | IT | 18.11.2015 | LT | 18.11.2015 | LV | 18.11.2015 | MC | 18.11.2015 | MT | 18.11.2015 | NL | 18.11.2015 | PL | 18.11.2015 | RO | 18.11.2015 | SE | 18.11.2015 | SI | 18.11.2015 | SK | 18.11.2015 | TR | 18.11.2015 | NO | 18.02.2016 | GR | 19.02.2016 | IS | 18.03.2016 | PT | 18.03.2016 | AT | 21.07.2016 | IE | 21.07.2016 | LU | 21.07.2016 | BE | 31.07.2016 | CH | 31.07.2016 | LI | 31.07.2016 | FR | 01.08.2016 | GB | 21.07.2018 | [2019/21] |
Former [2018/38] | HU | 21.07.2008 | |
BG | 18.11.2015 | ||
CY | 18.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 18.11.2015 | ||
DK | 18.11.2015 | ||
EE | 18.11.2015 | ||
ES | 18.11.2015 | ||
FI | 18.11.2015 | ||
HR | 18.11.2015 | ||
IT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LV | 18.11.2015 | ||
MC | 18.11.2015 | ||
MT | 18.11.2015 | ||
NL | 18.11.2015 | ||
PL | 18.11.2015 | ||
RO | 18.11.2015 | ||
SE | 18.11.2015 | ||
SI | 18.11.2015 | ||
SK | 18.11.2015 | ||
TR | 18.11.2015 | ||
NO | 18.02.2016 | ||
GR | 19.02.2016 | ||
IS | 18.03.2016 | ||
PT | 18.03.2016 | ||
AT | 21.07.2016 | ||
IE | 21.07.2016 | ||
LU | 21.07.2016 | ||
BE | 31.07.2016 | ||
CH | 31.07.2016 | ||
LI | 31.07.2016 | ||
FR | 01.08.2016 | ||
Former [2018/33] | HU | 21.07.2008 | |
CY | 18.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 18.11.2015 | ||
DK | 18.11.2015 | ||
EE | 18.11.2015 | ||
ES | 18.11.2015 | ||
FI | 18.11.2015 | ||
HR | 18.11.2015 | ||
IT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LV | 18.11.2015 | ||
MC | 18.11.2015 | ||
MT | 18.11.2015 | ||
NL | 18.11.2015 | ||
PL | 18.11.2015 | ||
RO | 18.11.2015 | ||
SE | 18.11.2015 | ||
SI | 18.11.2015 | ||
SK | 18.11.2015 | ||
TR | 18.11.2015 | ||
NO | 18.02.2016 | ||
GR | 19.02.2016 | ||
IS | 18.03.2016 | ||
PT | 18.03.2016 | ||
AT | 21.07.2016 | ||
IE | 21.07.2016 | ||
LU | 21.07.2016 | ||
BE | 31.07.2016 | ||
CH | 31.07.2016 | ||
LI | 31.07.2016 | ||
FR | 01.08.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 21.07.2008 | |
CY | 18.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 18.11.2015 | ||
DK | 18.11.2015 | ||
EE | 18.11.2015 | ||
ES | 18.11.2015 | ||
FI | 18.11.2015 | ||
HR | 18.11.2015 | ||
IT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LV | 18.11.2015 | ||
MC | 18.11.2015 | ||
NL | 18.11.2015 | ||
PL | 18.11.2015 | ||
RO | 18.11.2015 | ||
SE | 18.11.2015 | ||
SI | 18.11.2015 | ||
SK | 18.11.2015 | ||
TR | 18.11.2015 | ||
NO | 18.02.2016 | ||
GR | 19.02.2016 | ||
IS | 18.03.2016 | ||
PT | 18.03.2016 | ||
AT | 21.07.2016 | ||
IE | 21.07.2016 | ||
LU | 21.07.2016 | ||
BE | 31.07.2016 | ||
CH | 31.07.2016 | ||
LI | 31.07.2016 | ||
FR | 01.08.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 21.07.2008 | |
CY | 18.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 18.11.2015 | ||
DK | 18.11.2015 | ||
EE | 18.11.2015 | ||
ES | 18.11.2015 | ||
FI | 18.11.2015 | ||
HR | 18.11.2015 | ||
IT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LV | 18.11.2015 | ||
MC | 18.11.2015 | ||
NL | 18.11.2015 | ||
PL | 18.11.2015 | ||
RO | 18.11.2015 | ||
SE | 18.11.2015 | ||
SI | 18.11.2015 | ||
SK | 18.11.2015 | ||
NO | 18.02.2016 | ||
GR | 19.02.2016 | ||
IS | 18.03.2016 | ||
PT | 18.03.2016 | ||
AT | 21.07.2016 | ||
IE | 21.07.2016 | ||
LU | 21.07.2016 | ||
BE | 31.07.2016 | ||
CH | 31.07.2016 | ||
LI | 31.07.2016 | ||
FR | 01.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/49] | CZ | 18.11.2015 | |
DK | 18.11.2015 | ||
EE | 18.11.2015 | ||
ES | 18.11.2015 | ||
FI | 18.11.2015 | ||
HR | 18.11.2015 | ||
IT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LV | 18.11.2015 | ||
MC | 18.11.2015 | ||
NL | 18.11.2015 | ||
PL | 18.11.2015 | ||
RO | 18.11.2015 | ||
SE | 18.11.2015 | ||
SI | 18.11.2015 | ||
SK | 18.11.2015 | ||
NO | 18.02.2016 | ||
GR | 19.02.2016 | ||
IS | 18.03.2016 | ||
PT | 18.03.2016 | ||
AT | 21.07.2016 | ||
IE | 21.07.2016 | ||
LU | 21.07.2016 | ||
BE | 31.07.2016 | ||
CH | 31.07.2016 | ||
LI | 31.07.2016 | ||
FR | 01.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/41] | CZ | 18.11.2015 | |
DK | 18.11.2015 | ||
EE | 18.11.2015 | ||
ES | 18.11.2015 | ||
FI | 18.11.2015 | ||
HR | 18.11.2015 | ||
IT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LV | 18.11.2015 | ||
MC | 18.11.2015 | ||
NL | 18.11.2015 | ||
PL | 18.11.2015 | ||
RO | 18.11.2015 | ||
SE | 18.11.2015 | ||
SI | 18.11.2015 | ||
SK | 18.11.2015 | ||
NO | 18.02.2016 | ||
GR | 19.02.2016 | ||
IS | 18.03.2016 | ||
PT | 18.03.2016 | ||
IE | 21.07.2016 | ||
LU | 21.07.2016 | ||
BE | 31.07.2016 | ||
CH | 31.07.2016 | ||
LI | 31.07.2016 | ||
FR | 01.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/22] | CZ | 18.11.2015 | |
DK | 18.11.2015 | ||
EE | 18.11.2015 | ||
ES | 18.11.2015 | ||
FI | 18.11.2015 | ||
HR | 18.11.2015 | ||
IT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LV | 18.11.2015 | ||
MC | 18.11.2015 | ||
NL | 18.11.2015 | ||
PL | 18.11.2015 | ||
RO | 18.11.2015 | ||
SE | 18.11.2015 | ||
SI | 18.11.2015 | ||
SK | 18.11.2015 | ||
NO | 18.02.2016 | ||
GR | 19.02.2016 | ||
IS | 18.03.2016 | ||
PT | 18.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.07.2016 | ||
CH | 31.07.2016 | ||
LI | 31.07.2016 | ||
FR | 01.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | CZ | 18.11.2015 | |
DK | 18.11.2015 | ||
EE | 18.11.2015 | ||
ES | 18.11.2015 | ||
FI | 18.11.2015 | ||
HR | 18.11.2015 | ||
IT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LV | 18.11.2015 | ||
NL | 18.11.2015 | ||
PL | 18.11.2015 | ||
RO | 18.11.2015 | ||
SE | 18.11.2015 | ||
SI | 18.11.2015 | ||
SK | 18.11.2015 | ||
NO | 18.02.2016 | ||
GR | 19.02.2016 | ||
IS | 18.03.2016 | ||
PT | 18.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | CZ | 18.11.2015 | |
DK | 18.11.2015 | ||
EE | 18.11.2015 | ||
ES | 18.11.2015 | ||
FI | 18.11.2015 | ||
HR | 18.11.2015 | ||
IT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LV | 18.11.2015 | ||
NL | 18.11.2015 | ||
PL | 18.11.2015 | ||
RO | 18.11.2015 | ||
SE | 18.11.2015 | ||
SI | 18.11.2015 | ||
SK | 18.11.2015 | ||
NO | 18.02.2016 | ||
GR | 19.02.2016 | ||
IS | 18.03.2016 | ||
PT | 18.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | CZ | 18.11.2015 | |
DK | 18.11.2015 | ||
EE | 18.11.2015 | ||
ES | 18.11.2015 | ||
FI | 18.11.2015 | ||
HR | 18.11.2015 | ||
IT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LV | 18.11.2015 | ||
NL | 18.11.2015 | ||
PL | 18.11.2015 | ||
RO | 18.11.2015 | ||
SE | 18.11.2015 | ||
SK | 18.11.2015 | ||
NO | 18.02.2016 | ||
GR | 19.02.2016 | ||
IS | 18.03.2016 | ||
PT | 18.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | CZ | 18.11.2015 | |
EE | 18.11.2015 | ||
ES | 18.11.2015 | ||
FI | 18.11.2015 | ||
HR | 18.11.2015 | ||
IT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LV | 18.11.2015 | ||
NL | 18.11.2015 | ||
PL | 18.11.2015 | ||
RO | 18.11.2015 | ||
SE | 18.11.2015 | ||
SK | 18.11.2015 | ||
NO | 18.02.2016 | ||
GR | 19.02.2016 | ||
IS | 18.03.2016 | ||
PT | 18.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/34] | CZ | 18.11.2015 | |
ES | 18.11.2015 | ||
FI | 18.11.2015 | ||
HR | 18.11.2015 | ||
IT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LV | 18.11.2015 | ||
NL | 18.11.2015 | ||
PL | 18.11.2015 | ||
SE | 18.11.2015 | ||
NO | 18.02.2016 | ||
GR | 19.02.2016 | ||
IS | 18.03.2016 | ||
PT | 18.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/25] | ES | 18.11.2015 | |
FI | 18.11.2015 | ||
HR | 18.11.2015 | ||
IT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LV | 18.11.2015 | ||
NL | 18.11.2015 | ||
PL | 18.11.2015 | ||
SE | 18.11.2015 | ||
NO | 18.02.2016 | ||
GR | 19.02.2016 | ||
IS | 18.03.2016 | ||
PT | 18.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | ES | 18.11.2015 | |
FI | 18.11.2015 | ||
HR | 18.11.2015 | ||
IT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LT | 18.11.2015 | ||
NL | 18.11.2015 | ||
PL | 18.11.2015 | ||
SE | 18.11.2015 | ||
NO | 18.02.2016 | ||
GR | 19.02.2016 | ||
IS | 18.03.2016 | ||
PT | 18.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | ES | 18.11.2015 | |
HR | 18.11.2015 | ||
IT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LT | 18.11.2015 | ||
NL | 18.11.2015 | ||
SE | 18.11.2015 | ||
NO | 18.02.2016 | ||
IS | 18.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/22] | ES | 18.11.2015 | |
IT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LT | 18.11.2015 | ||
NL | 18.11.2015 | ||
NO | 18.02.2016 | ||
IS | 18.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/21] | ES | 18.11.2015 | |
IT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LT | 18.11.2015 | ||
NO | 18.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/20] | ES | 18.11.2015 | |
LT | 18.11.2015 | Cited in | International search | [X]US3047268 (LEAVITT STANLEY L) [X] 1-3,5-14 * figures 1-4 *; | [A]US3112914 (WELLMAN ROBERT H) [A] 1-14* figures 4,5 *; | [A]GB1527074 (ROLLS ROYCE) [A] 1-14 * figure 3 *; | [X]EP0710766 (ROLLS ROYCE PLC [GB]) [X] 1-3,5,7-14 * column 2, line 7 - line 9 * * figures 1-3 *; | [X]WO9950534 (PRATT & WHITNEY CANADA [CA]) [X] 1-14 * figures 2,4 *; | [A]EP1795706 (HONEYWELL INT INC [US]) [A] 11-14 * figure 1A * | Opposition | US3047268 | US3112914 | GB1527074 | DE3743253 | EP0710766 | WO9950534 | EP1795706 |