EP2170492 - HYDROPHILIC MEMBRANE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.06.2014 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.06.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.07.2014 [2014/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lydall Solutech B.V. Eisterweg 4 6422 PN Heerlen / NL | [2010/14] |
Former [2009/38] | For all designated states DSM IP Assets B.V. Het Overloon 1 6411 TE Heerlen / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOVING, Hendrik Derk Doctor Mostartstraat 10 NL-6114EX Susteren / NL | 02 /
QIU, Jun Beltmolen 128 6003 BW Weert / NL | 03 /
THIES, Jens Christoph Wintersteeg 7 NL-6245ME Eijsden / NL | 04 /
CALIS, Gijsbertus Hendrikus Maria Burgemeester Kengenstraat 60 NL-6336BK Hulsberg / NL | 05 /
KAMP, OP DEN, Johannes Leonardus Maria Aldenhofstraat 26 NL-6191GT Beek / NL | [2010/27] |
Former [2010/14] | 01 /
HOVING, Hendrik Derk Doctor Mostartstraat 10 NL-6114EX Susteren / NL | ||
02 /
QIU, Jun Schaesbergerweg 142a NL-6415AK Heerlen / NL | |||
03 /
THIES, Jens Christoph Wintersteeg 7 NL-6245ME Eijsden / NL | |||
04 /
CALIS, Gijsbertus Hendrikus Maria Burgemeester Kengenstraat 60 NL-6336BK Hulsberg / NL | |||
05 /
KAMP, OP DEN, Johannes Leonardus Maria Aldenhofstraat 26 NL-6191GT Beek / NL | Representative(s) | Delorme, Nicolas, et al Cabinet Germain & Maureau 12, rue Boileau BP 6153 69466 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR | [2012/28] |
Former [2012/20] | (deleted) | ||
Former [2010/51] | Dörner, Kötter & Kollegen Körnerstrasse 27 58095 Hagen / DE | ||
Former [2010/38] | (deleted) | ||
Former [2010/14] | op den Brouw-Sprakel, Vera Stefanie Irene, et al Algemeen Octrooi- en Merkenbureau P.O. Box 645 5600 AP Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 08775335.6 | 24.07.2008 | [2010/14] | WO2008EP59724 | Priority number, date | EP20070014585 | 25.07.2007 Original published format: EP 07014585 | [2010/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009013340 | Date: | 29.01.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2170492 | Date: | 07.04.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.01.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.01.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B01D67/00, B01D69/14, B01D71/02, B01D71/52, B01D71/70 | [2010/14] | CPC: |
B01D69/02 (EP,KR,US);
B01D67/0088 (KR);
B01D67/0079 (KR);
B01D67/009 (KR);
B01D69/107 (KR);
B01D69/108 (KR);
B01D69/1213 (KR);
B01D71/022 (KR);
B01D71/024 (EP,KR,US);
B01D71/025 (EP,KR,US);
B01D71/027 (EP,KR,US);
B01D71/46 (KR);
B01D71/5211 (EP,KR,US);
B01D71/70 (EP,KR,US);
B01D2323/12 (KR);
B01D2323/345 (EP,KR,US);
B01D2325/02833 (KR);
B01D2325/02834 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/14] | Title | German: | HYDROPHILE MEMBRAN | [2010/14] | English: | HYDROPHILIC MEMBRANE | [2010/14] | French: | MEMBRANE HYDROPHILE | [2010/14] | Entry into regional phase | 20.01.2010 | National basic fee paid | 20.01.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.01.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.01.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.01.2010 | Examination requested [2010/14] | 04.03.2013 | Observations by third parties | 01.02.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/28] | 03.03.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2014/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2013 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2004053060 (ROZIERE JACQUES [FR], et al); | [X]EP1479734 (DSM IP ASSETS BV [NL]); | [X]WO2006016800 (DSM IP ASSETS BV [NL], et al); | [X]US2006194096 (VALLE KARINE [FR], et al) | other | US4505985 | WO2004112176 |