EP2170590 - METHOD OF MANUFACTURING AN OPTICAL PRODUCT, AND AN APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.03.2015 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.04.2015 [2015/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Theta Optics LTD OY Ydinkuja 4 21420 Lieto / FI | [2010/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NIEMINEN, Olavi Uunimäenkuja 1 FIN-21410 Vanhalinna / FI | [2010/14] | Representative(s) | Kolster Oy Ab (Salmisaarenaukio 1) P.O. Box 204 00181 Helsinki / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2013/43] | Kolster Oy Ab Iso Roobertinkatu 23 PO Box 148 00121 Helsinki / FI | ||
Former [2010/14] | Kaukonen, Juha Veikko Kolster Oy Ab Iso Roobertinkatu 23 P.O. Box 148 00121 Helsinki / FI | Application number, filing date | 08775532.8 | 03.07.2008 | [2010/14] | WO2008FI50407 | Priority number, date | FI20070005507 | 04.07.2007 Original published format: FI 20075507 | [2010/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009004121 | Date: | 08.01.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2170590 | Date: | 07.04.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.01.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | FI | 08.01.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.03.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B29D11/00, G02B1/10, B05C13/02, B05C3/09, B29C65/76, B29C65/78, B29C65/00, B41J11/00 | [2014/16] | CPC: |
B29D11/00865 (EP,FI,US);
B29C65/00 (US);
B29C65/76 (US);
B29C65/7841 (US);
B29C66/5326 (US);
B41J11/0015 (EP,US);
G02B1/10 (FI);
B05C13/02 (EP,US);
B05C3/09 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
B29C65/7841, B29C65/00 (US);
B29C66/71, B29K2023/00 (US);
B29C66/71, B29K2023/06 (US);
B29C66/71, B29K2033/12 (US); |
Former IPC [2010/14] | B29D11/00, G02B1/10, B05C13/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/14] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES OPTISCHEN PRODUKTS UND VORRICHTUNG | [2010/14] | English: | METHOD OF MANUFACTURING AN OPTICAL PRODUCT, AND AN APPARATUS | [2010/14] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN PRODUIT OPTIQUE ET APPAREIL | [2010/14] | Entry into regional phase | 25.01.2010 | National basic fee paid | 25.01.2010 | Search fee paid | 25.01.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.01.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.01.2010 | Examination requested [2010/14] | 14.10.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/15] | 18.11.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB2159441 (ROEHM GMBH, et al) [X] 1,2,8,9* page 2, lines 97-120; figure 2 *; | [XYI]US6024902 (MAUS STEVEN M [US], et al) [X] 1,2,8,9 * column 19, line 39 - column 20, line 52; figures 3 - 3D, 4b * [Y] 3,6 [I] 5; | [Y]EP1321269 (SONY ERICSSON MOBILE COMM AB [SE]) [Y] 3 * paragraphs [0014] - [0018] - [0 23] - [0026] *; | [Y]WO2004056495 (VISION EASE LENS INC [US], et al) [Y] 6 * abstract * | International search | [Y]US5460653 (OTANI HIROSHI [JP], et al) [Y] 4 * , column 1 lines 8-25 and lines 38-41, column 2 lines 50-56, column 6 line 59 - column 7 line 5, column 7 lines 20-23, claim 1 *; | [XY]US5995304 (NOMURA YOSHIMITSU [JP], et al) [X] 1-3, 5-9 * column 1 line 63 - column 2 line 3, column 3 lines 43-65, column 5 lines 52-61 as above * [Y] 4; | [XY]JP2001046947 (SEIKO EPSON CORP) [X] 1-3, 5-9 * abstract [online][retrieved on 2008-10-16]. Retrieved from: EPOQUE EPODOC Database as above * [Y] 4; | [XY]US2003103271 (OHTA TATSUO [JP]) [X] 1-3, 5-9 * paragraphs [0065],[0070],[0071],[0083],[0113] and [0114] as above * [Y] 4; | [A]US2004036989 (DUON JEAN-CLAUDE [FR], et al)[A] 0; | [A]EP1547696 (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP]) [A] 0 |