Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP2122288
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
03.01.2014 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 05.02.2014 [2014/06] |
27.09.2013 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
29.03.2013 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
25.01.2013 |
Change - representative |
published on 27.02.2013 [2013/09] |
13.07.2012 |
Change - extension states |
published on 15.08.2012 [2012/33] |
13.06.2012 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee |
|
13.06.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
26.04.2012 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
26.04.2012 |
Change: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
01.03.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
05.03.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
23.10.2009 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 25.11.2009 [2009/48] |
23.10.2009 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 25.11.2009 [2009/48] |
18.09.2009 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
10.08.2009 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
24.07.2009 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
12.12.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
11.11.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
01.11.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
25.10.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
27.08.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|