EP2122288 - METHOD OF MAKING A HEAT EXCHANGER AND HEAT EXCHANGER OBTAINED ACCORDING TO THIS METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.01.2014 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.01.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.02.2014 [2014/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vironneau, Pierre 17 Ter Rue Saint Christophe 31120 Portet sur Garonne / FR | For all designated states Seosse, Bernard Lleudit Petit Cazenave Route de Tyrosse 40300 Saint Lon Les Mines / FR | For all designated states Aphecetche, Pierre 72 Route du Guirlet 40990 Saint Vincent de Paul / FR | For all designated states Caramanos, Frédéric Villa Gure Etchea Rue Souhara 64210 Bidart / FR | For all designated states Avril, Alain 16, rue Bertholet 75005 Paris / FR | For all designated states Cazères, Pascal 39, Avenue de Sabaou 64300 Biarritz / FR | [2009/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2009/48] | Representative(s) | Hartmann, Jean-Luc, et al Cabinet Morelle & Bardou SC Parc Technologique du Canal 9, Avenue de l'Europe B.P. 72253 31522 Ramonville Saint-Agne Cedex / FR | [2013/09] |
Former [2009/48] | Morelle, Guy Georges Alain Cabinet Morelle & Bardou, SC Parc Technologique du Canal 9, Avenue de l'Europe B.P. 72253 31522 Ramonville Saint Agne / FR | Application number, filing date | 08775591.4 | 22.02.2008 | [2009/48] | WO2008FR00237 | Priority number, date | FR20070001295 | 23.02.2007 Original published format: FR 0701295 | [2009/48] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008125755 | Date: | 23.10.2008 | Language: | FR | [2008/43] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2122288 | Date: | 25.11.2009 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.10.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.12.2008 | Classification | IPC: | F28D9/00, F28F3/12, F28F3/08 | [2009/48] | CPC: |
B21D53/04 (EP,US);
F28D9/0062 (EP,US);
F28F3/08 (EP,US);
F28F3/12 (EP,US);
F28F2250/104 (EP,US);
F28F2255/10 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/48] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES WÄRMETAUSCHERS UND MITHILFE DIESES VERFAHRENS ERZEUGTER WÄRMETAUSCHER | [2009/48] | English: | METHOD OF MAKING A HEAT EXCHANGER AND HEAT EXCHANGER OBTAINED ACCORDING TO THIS METHOD | [2009/48] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR RÉALISER UN ÉCHANGEUR THERMIQUE ET ÉCHANGEUR THERMIQUE OBTENU SELON CE PROCÉDÉ | [2009/48] | Entry into regional phase | 10.09.2009 | National basic fee paid | 10.09.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.09.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.09.2009 | Examination requested [2009/48] | 03.09.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/06] | 27.09.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2014/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.2012 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   04.06.2012 | 28.02.2013 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DA]US5287918 (BANKS SIMON A [GB], et al) [DA] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [A]US3924793 (SUMMERS LEO EWART ARTHUR, et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]FR2502042 (ROCKWELL INTERNATIONAL CORP [US]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]WO03053608 (KIEFFER JOSEPH [FR]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]US4393987 (ANDERSON CHARLES N, et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US2006070728 (SHIN SOO-YEON [KR], et al) [A] 1,14 * the whole document *; | [DA]EP0108707 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD [JP]) [DA] 1 * figures 3-5 * |