EP2130031 - AUTOMATED VISUAL CHECKING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.03.2013 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Proditec 3 rue Eugène Chevreul 33600 Pessac / FR | [2009/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAURIN, Denis 43, chemin du Tutou F-33114 Le Barp / FR | [2009/50] | Representative(s) | Cenatiempo, Julie Adeline Anne Société Aquinov Allée de la Forestière 33750 Beychac et Caillau / FR | [2012/20] |
Former [2009/50] | Cenatiempo, Julie Adeline Anne Société Aquinov Allée de la Forestière F-33750 Beychac et Caillau / FR | Application number, filing date | 08775733.2 | 21.03.2008 | [2009/50] | WO2008FR50493 | Priority number, date | FR20070054027 | 26.03.2007 Original published format: FR 0754027 | [2009/50] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008132389 | Date: | 06.11.2008 | Language: | FR | [2008/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2130031 | Date: | 09.12.2009 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.11.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2130031 | Date: | 16.05.2012 | Language: | FR | [2012/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.11.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/952, G01N21/95 | [2011/50] | CPC: |
G01N21/952 (EP,US);
G01N21/9508 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2009/50] | G01N21/952 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/50] | Title | German: | AUTOMATISIERTE SICHTPRÜFUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2009/50] | English: | AUTOMATED VISUAL CHECKING DEVICE | [2009/50] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE CONTROLE VISUEL AUTOMATISE | [2009/50] | Entry into regional phase | 23.09.2009 | National basic fee paid | 23.09.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.09.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.09.2009 | Examination requested [2009/50] | 15.01.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.05.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.12.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.03.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 30.03.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.01.2010 | Opposition(s) | 19.02.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.03.2008 | AT | 16.05.2012 | CY | 16.05.2012 | CZ | 16.05.2012 | DK | 16.05.2012 | EE | 16.05.2012 | FI | 16.05.2012 | HR | 16.05.2012 | IT | 16.05.2012 | LT | 16.05.2012 | LV | 16.05.2012 | MT | 16.05.2012 | NL | 16.05.2012 | PL | 16.05.2012 | RO | 16.05.2012 | SE | 16.05.2012 | SI | 16.05.2012 | SK | 16.05.2012 | TR | 16.05.2012 | BG | 16.08.2012 | NO | 16.08.2012 | GR | 17.08.2012 | ES | 27.08.2012 | IS | 16.09.2012 | PT | 17.09.2012 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 16.05.2012 | |
CY | 16.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 16.05.2012 | ||
DK | 16.05.2012 | ||
EE | 16.05.2012 | ||
FI | 16.05.2012 | ||
HR | 16.05.2012 | ||
IT | 16.05.2012 | ||
LT | 16.05.2012 | ||
LV | 16.05.2012 | ||
MT | 16.05.2012 | ||
NL | 16.05.2012 | ||
PL | 16.05.2012 | ||
RO | 16.05.2012 | ||
SE | 16.05.2012 | ||
SI | 16.05.2012 | ||
SK | 16.05.2012 | ||
TR | 16.05.2012 | ||
BG | 16.08.2012 | ||
NO | 16.08.2012 | ||
GR | 17.08.2012 | ||
ES | 27.08.2012 | ||
IS | 16.09.2012 | ||
PT | 17.09.2012 | ||
Former [2014/32] | AT | 16.05.2012 | |
CY | 16.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 16.05.2012 | ||
DK | 16.05.2012 | ||
EE | 16.05.2012 | ||
FI | 16.05.2012 | ||
HR | 16.05.2012 | ||
IT | 16.05.2012 | ||
LT | 16.05.2012 | ||
LV | 16.05.2012 | ||
MT | 16.05.2012 | ||
NL | 16.05.2012 | ||
PL | 16.05.2012 | ||
RO | 16.05.2012 | ||
SE | 16.05.2012 | ||
SI | 16.05.2012 | ||
SK | 16.05.2012 | ||
BG | 16.08.2012 | ||
NO | 16.08.2012 | ||
GR | 17.08.2012 | ||
ES | 27.08.2012 | ||
IS | 16.09.2012 | ||
PT | 17.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 16.05.2012 | |
CY | 16.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 16.05.2012 | ||
DK | 16.05.2012 | ||
EE | 16.05.2012 | ||
FI | 16.05.2012 | ||
HR | 16.05.2012 | ||
IT | 16.05.2012 | ||
LT | 16.05.2012 | ||
LV | 16.05.2012 | ||
NL | 16.05.2012 | ||
PL | 16.05.2012 | ||
RO | 16.05.2012 | ||
SE | 16.05.2012 | ||
SI | 16.05.2012 | ||
SK | 16.05.2012 | ||
BG | 16.08.2012 | ||
NO | 16.08.2012 | ||
GR | 17.08.2012 | ||
ES | 27.08.2012 | ||
IS | 16.09.2012 | ||
PT | 17.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 16.05.2012 | |
CY | 16.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 16.05.2012 | ||
DK | 16.05.2012 | ||
EE | 16.05.2012 | ||
FI | 16.05.2012 | ||
HR | 16.05.2012 | ||
IT | 16.05.2012 | ||
LT | 16.05.2012 | ||
LV | 16.05.2012 | ||
NL | 16.05.2012 | ||
PL | 16.05.2012 | ||
RO | 16.05.2012 | ||
SE | 16.05.2012 | ||
SI | 16.05.2012 | ||
SK | 16.05.2012 | ||
NO | 16.08.2012 | ||
GR | 17.08.2012 | ||
ES | 27.08.2012 | ||
IS | 16.09.2012 | ||
PT | 17.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | AT | 16.05.2012 | |
CY | 16.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 16.05.2012 | ||
DK | 16.05.2012 | ||
EE | 16.05.2012 | ||
FI | 16.05.2012 | ||
HR | 16.05.2012 | ||
IT | 16.05.2012 | ||
LT | 16.05.2012 | ||
LV | 16.05.2012 | ||
NL | 16.05.2012 | ||
PL | 16.05.2012 | ||
RO | 16.05.2012 | ||
SE | 16.05.2012 | ||
SI | 16.05.2012 | ||
SK | 16.05.2012 | ||
NO | 16.08.2012 | ||
GR | 17.08.2012 | ||
IS | 16.09.2012 | ||
PT | 17.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | AT | 16.05.2012 | |
CY | 16.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 16.05.2012 | ||
DK | 16.05.2012 | ||
EE | 16.05.2012 | ||
FI | 16.05.2012 | ||
HR | 16.05.2012 | ||
LT | 16.05.2012 | ||
LV | 16.05.2012 | ||
NL | 16.05.2012 | ||
PL | 16.05.2012 | ||
RO | 16.05.2012 | ||
SE | 16.05.2012 | ||
SI | 16.05.2012 | ||
SK | 16.05.2012 | ||
NO | 16.08.2012 | ||
GR | 17.08.2012 | ||
IS | 16.09.2012 | ||
PT | 17.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | AT | 16.05.2012 | |
CY | 16.05.2012 | ||
DK | 16.05.2012 | ||
EE | 16.05.2012 | ||
FI | 16.05.2012 | ||
HR | 16.05.2012 | ||
LT | 16.05.2012 | ||
LV | 16.05.2012 | ||
NL | 16.05.2012 | ||
PL | 16.05.2012 | ||
SE | 16.05.2012 | ||
SI | 16.05.2012 | ||
NO | 16.08.2012 | ||
GR | 17.08.2012 | ||
IS | 16.09.2012 | ||
PT | 17.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 16.05.2012 | |
CY | 16.05.2012 | ||
DK | 16.05.2012 | ||
FI | 16.05.2012 | ||
HR | 16.05.2012 | ||
LT | 16.05.2012 | ||
LV | 16.05.2012 | ||
NL | 16.05.2012 | ||
PL | 16.05.2012 | ||
SE | 16.05.2012 | ||
SI | 16.05.2012 | ||
NO | 16.08.2012 | ||
GR | 17.08.2012 | ||
IS | 16.09.2012 | ||
PT | 17.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 16.05.2012 | |
CY | 16.05.2012 | ||
FI | 16.05.2012 | ||
HR | 16.05.2012 | ||
LT | 16.05.2012 | ||
LV | 16.05.2012 | ||
PL | 16.05.2012 | ||
SE | 16.05.2012 | ||
SI | 16.05.2012 | ||
NO | 16.08.2012 | ||
GR | 17.08.2012 | ||
IS | 16.09.2012 | ||
PT | 17.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/01] | CY | 16.05.2012 | |
FI | 16.05.2012 | ||
HR | 16.05.2012 | ||
LT | 16.05.2012 | ||
LV | 16.05.2012 | ||
PL | 16.05.2012 | ||
SE | 16.05.2012 | ||
SI | 16.05.2012 | ||
NO | 16.08.2012 | ||
GR | 17.08.2012 | ||
IS | 16.09.2012 | ||
PT | 17.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/51] | CY | 16.05.2012 | |
FI | 16.05.2012 | ||
HR | 16.05.2012 | ||
LT | 16.05.2012 | ||
LV | 16.05.2012 | ||
PL | 16.05.2012 | ||
SE | 16.05.2012 | ||
SI | 16.05.2012 | ||
NO | 16.08.2012 | ||
GR | 17.08.2012 | ||
IS | 16.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | CY | 16.05.2012 | |
FI | 16.05.2012 | ||
HR | 16.05.2012 | ||
LT | 16.05.2012 | ||
LV | 16.05.2012 | ||
PL | 16.05.2012 | ||
SE | 16.05.2012 | ||
NO | 16.08.2012 | ||
GR | 17.08.2012 | ||
IS | 16.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 16.05.2012 | |
FI | 16.05.2012 | ||
LT | 16.05.2012 | ||
PL | 16.05.2012 | ||
SE | 16.05.2012 | ||
NO | 16.08.2012 | ||
IS | 16.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | FI | 16.05.2012 | |
LT | 16.05.2012 | ||
SE | 16.05.2012 | ||
NO | 16.08.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | LT | 16.05.2012 | |
NO | 16.08.2012 | Cited in | International search | [Y]JPH0292168 (MAKI MFG CO LTD) [Y] 1-10 * figures 1,6,7 *; | [Y]JP2001208520 (ROHM CO LTD) [Y] 1-10 * figures 1,4,5 *; | [Y]US2002109094 (GOETZ ALEXANDER [US], et al) [Y] 1-10 * paragraph [0032]; figure 1 *; | [Y]US5286980 (RICHERT GERALD R [US]) [Y] 1-10 * column 7, line 1 - line 21; figure 1 *; | [Y]WO9904245 (VISTECH CORP [US]) [Y] 1-10 * page 2, line 26 - page 3, line 10 *; | [A]GB2297628 (ROSS DAVID WILLIAM [GB], et al) [A] 1-10 * figure 1 *; | [A]GB977059 (EMI LTD) [A] 1-10 * figure 1 *; | [A]US4410278 (MAKIHIRA HIROSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-10 * figures 4,5 * |