EP2155636 - PROCESS FOR CONVERTING ETHANE INTO LIQUID ALKANE MIXTURES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.12.2012 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.01.2013 [2013/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BP Oil International Limited Chertsey Road Sunbury on Thames Middlesex TW16 7BP / GB | [2010/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BASSET, Jean-Marie 18 Chemin J.Baptiste Gilliard F-69300 Caluire / FR | 02 /
CHAKKA, Sudhakar 4636 Chokeberry Drive Naperville, IL 60563 / US | 03 /
TAOUFIK, Mostafa 2, Rue General Dayan F-69100 Villeurbanne / FR | 04 /
THIVOLLE-CAZAT, Jean 5, rue Gambetta F-69200 Fontaines sur Saone / FR | [2010/08] | Representative(s) | Hill, Simon Stephen, et al BP International Limited Global Patents & Technology Law Chertsey Road Sunbury-on-Thames, Middx TW16 7LN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/22] | Hill, Simon Stephen, et al BP International Limited Global Patents & Technology Law Chertsey Road Sunbury-on-Thames, Middx TW16 7LN / GB | ||
Former [2010/08] | Hill, Simon Stephen, et al BP International Limited B200 1st Floor Chertsey Road GB-Sunbury-on-Thames, Middx TW16 7LN / GB | Application number, filing date | 08775750.6 | 10.06.2008 | [2010/08] | WO2008GB01974 | Priority number, date | EP20070252370 | 12.06.2007 Original published format: EP 07252370 | [2010/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008152371 | Date: | 18.12.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2155636 | Date: | 24.02.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.12.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.12.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C07C6/10, C07C9/10, C07C9/14, C10G50/00, C07C2/76, C07C9/06 | [2010/08] | CPC: |
C10L3/10 (EP,US);
B01J31/121 (EP,US);
C07C2/76 (EP,US);
C07C6/10 (EP,US);
C07C9/00 (EP,US);
C10G50/00 (EP,US);
B01J21/04 (EP,US);
B01J21/08 (EP,US);
B01J2531/58 (EP,US);
B01J2531/66 (EP,US);
C07C2521/04 (EP,US);
C07C2531/12 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C07C2/76, C07C9/06 (EP,US);
C07C6/10, C07C9/00 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/08] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR UMWANDLUNG VON ETHAN IN FLÜSSIGE ALKANGEMISCHE | [2010/08] | English: | PROCESS FOR CONVERTING ETHANE INTO LIQUID ALKANE MIXTURES | [2010/08] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE CONVERSION D'ÉTHANE EN MÉLANGES D'ALCANES LIQUIDES | [2010/08] | Entry into regional phase | 27.11.2009 | National basic fee paid | 27.11.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.11.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.04.2009 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 27.11.2009 | Examination requested [2010/08] | 08.03.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.07.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/02] | 22.08.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/02] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.03.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2012 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DX]WO9802244 (CENTRE NAT RECH SCIENT [FR], et al) [DX] 1-27 * example 3; claim - *; | [X]WO03104172 (BP CHEM INT LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1-27 * figure 4 * * page 3, line 32 - page 4, line 2 * * page 5, line 21 * * page 5, line 30 * * page 5, line 33 - page 6, line 19 * * page 28, line 14 - page 32, line 19 *; | [DX]WO03104171 (BP CHEM INT LTD [GB], et al) [DX] 1-27 * example -; claim - * |