EP2188574 - AIR CONTROL SYSTEM AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.05.2015 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, TR | published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Quintex Systems Limited 6 New Street Square London EC4A 3LX / GB | [2014/11] |
Former [2010/21] | For all designated states Food Industry Technical Ltd. 40 Ivanhoe Road Finchampstead Berkshire RG40 4QQ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STEVENS, Leonard 62 Knowles Ave Crowthorne, Berkshire RG45 6DU / GB | 02 /
STEVENS, Keith Bridge Lodge Hackwood Park Basingstoke, Hampshire RG25 2JZ / GB | 03 /
GLOVER, Nell 12 Warwick Road Reading, Berkshire RG2 7AX / GB | 04 /
WYATT, Ben 40 Balmore Drive Cavershamp Reading, Berkshire RG4 8NL / GB | [2014/30] |
Former [2010/21] | 01 /
STEVENS, Leonard 62 Knowles Ave Crowthorne, Berkshire RG45 6DU / GB | ||
02 /
STEVENS, Keith Bridge Lodge Hackwood Park Basingstoke, Hampshire RG25 2JZ / GB | |||
03 /
GLOVER, Nell 12 Warwick Road Reading, Berkshire RG2 7AX / GB | |||
04 /
WYATT, Ben 40 Balmore Drive Cavershamp Reading, Berkshire RG4 8NL / GB | Representative(s) | Jenkins, Peter David Page White & Farrer Limited Bedford House 21A John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/30] | Jenkins, Peter David Page White & Farrer Bedford House John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | ||
Former [2010/21] | Jenkins, Peter David Page White & Farrer Bedford House John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | Application number, filing date | 08775820.7 | 03.07.2008 | [2010/21] | WO2008GB02270 | Priority number, date | GB20070012978 | 04.07.2007 Original published format: GB 0712978 | [2010/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009004332 | Date: | 08.01.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/02] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2188574 | Date: | 26.05.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.01.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2188574 | Date: | 23.07.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.04.2009 | Classification | IPC: | F24F11/00, F24C15/20 | [2010/21] | CPC: |
F24C15/2021 (EP,GB);
F24F11/46 (EP,GB,US);
A62C3/14 (GB);
B08B15/02 (GB);
F24F11/30 (EP,GB);
F24F11/33 (EP,GB,US);
F24F11/38 (EP,GB,US);
F24F11/523 (EP,GB,US);
F24F11/526 (EP,GB,US);
F24F11/58 (EP,GB,US);
F24F11/63 (EP,GB,US);
F24F11/76 (GB);
F24F11/77 (EP,GB,US);
F24F2110/10 (EP,GB);
F24F2110/50 (GB);
Y02B30/70 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2014/26] |
Former [2010/21] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LUFTSTEUERSYSTEM UND -VERFAHREN | [2010/21] | English: | AIR CONTROL SYSTEM AND METHOD | [2010/21] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE RÉGULATION DE L'AIR | [2010/21] | Entry into regional phase | 29.01.2010 | National basic fee paid | 29.01.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.01.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.01.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.01.2010 | Examination requested [2010/21] | 18.02.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.06.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.09.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.03.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.02.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.06.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 13.06.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.06.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP13155503.9 / EP2594859 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.02.2011 | Opposition(s) | 24.04.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 03.07.2008 | AT | 23.07.2014 | BE | 23.07.2014 | CY | 23.07.2014 | CZ | 23.07.2014 | DK | 23.07.2014 | EE | 23.07.2014 | FI | 23.07.2014 | HR | 23.07.2014 | LT | 23.07.2014 | LV | 23.07.2014 | MC | 23.07.2014 | MT | 23.07.2014 | PL | 23.07.2014 | RO | 23.07.2014 | SE | 23.07.2014 | SI | 23.07.2014 | SK | 23.07.2014 | TR | 23.07.2014 | BG | 23.10.2014 | NO | 23.10.2014 | GR | 24.10.2014 | IS | 23.11.2014 | PT | 24.11.2014 | [2017/39] |
Former [2017/21] | AT | 23.07.2014 | |
BE | 23.07.2014 | ||
CY | 23.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 23.07.2014 | ||
DK | 23.07.2014 | ||
EE | 23.07.2014 | ||
FI | 23.07.2014 | ||
HR | 23.07.2014 | ||
LT | 23.07.2014 | ||
LV | 23.07.2014 | ||
MC | 23.07.2014 | ||
MT | 23.07.2014 | ||
PL | 23.07.2014 | ||
RO | 23.07.2014 | ||
SE | 23.07.2014 | ||
SI | 23.07.2014 | ||
SK | 23.07.2014 | ||
BG | 23.10.2014 | ||
NO | 23.10.2014 | ||
GR | 24.10.2014 | ||
IS | 23.11.2014 | ||
PT | 24.11.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | AT | 23.07.2014 | |
BE | 23.07.2014 | ||
CY | 23.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 23.07.2014 | ||
DK | 23.07.2014 | ||
EE | 23.07.2014 | ||
FI | 23.07.2014 | ||
HR | 23.07.2014 | ||
LT | 23.07.2014 | ||
LV | 23.07.2014 | ||
MC | 23.07.2014 | ||
PL | 23.07.2014 | ||
RO | 23.07.2014 | ||
SE | 23.07.2014 | ||
SI | 23.07.2014 | ||
SK | 23.07.2014 | ||
BG | 23.10.2014 | ||
NO | 23.10.2014 | ||
GR | 24.10.2014 | ||
IS | 23.11.2014 | ||
PT | 24.11.2014 | ||
Former [2016/13] | AT | 23.07.2014 | |
CY | 23.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 23.07.2014 | ||
DK | 23.07.2014 | ||
EE | 23.07.2014 | ||
FI | 23.07.2014 | ||
HR | 23.07.2014 | ||
LT | 23.07.2014 | ||
LV | 23.07.2014 | ||
MC | 23.07.2014 | ||
PL | 23.07.2014 | ||
RO | 23.07.2014 | ||
SE | 23.07.2014 | ||
SI | 23.07.2014 | ||
SK | 23.07.2014 | ||
BG | 23.10.2014 | ||
NO | 23.10.2014 | ||
GR | 24.10.2014 | ||
IS | 23.11.2014 | ||
PT | 24.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/50] | AT | 23.07.2014 | |
CY | 23.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 23.07.2014 | ||
DK | 23.07.2014 | ||
EE | 23.07.2014 | ||
FI | 23.07.2014 | ||
HR | 23.07.2014 | ||
LT | 23.07.2014 | ||
LV | 23.07.2014 | ||
PL | 23.07.2014 | ||
RO | 23.07.2014 | ||
SE | 23.07.2014 | ||
SI | 23.07.2014 | ||
SK | 23.07.2014 | ||
BG | 23.10.2014 | ||
NO | 23.10.2014 | ||
GR | 24.10.2014 | ||
IS | 23.11.2014 | ||
PT | 24.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/23] | AT | 23.07.2014 | |
CY | 23.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 23.07.2014 | ||
DK | 23.07.2014 | ||
EE | 23.07.2014 | ||
FI | 23.07.2014 | ||
HR | 23.07.2014 | ||
LT | 23.07.2014 | ||
LV | 23.07.2014 | ||
PL | 23.07.2014 | ||
RO | 23.07.2014 | ||
SE | 23.07.2014 | ||
SK | 23.07.2014 | ||
BG | 23.10.2014 | ||
NO | 23.10.2014 | ||
GR | 24.10.2014 | ||
IS | 23.11.2014 | ||
PT | 24.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | AT | 23.07.2014 | |
CY | 23.07.2014 | ||
DK | 23.07.2014 | ||
FI | 23.07.2014 | ||
HR | 23.07.2014 | ||
LT | 23.07.2014 | ||
LV | 23.07.2014 | ||
PL | 23.07.2014 | ||
RO | 23.07.2014 | ||
SE | 23.07.2014 | ||
BG | 23.10.2014 | ||
NO | 23.10.2014 | ||
GR | 24.10.2014 | ||
IS | 23.11.2014 | ||
PT | 24.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | AT | 23.07.2014 | |
CY | 23.07.2014 | ||
FI | 23.07.2014 | ||
HR | 23.07.2014 | ||
LT | 23.07.2014 | ||
LV | 23.07.2014 | ||
PL | 23.07.2014 | ||
SE | 23.07.2014 | ||
BG | 23.10.2014 | ||
NO | 23.10.2014 | ||
GR | 24.10.2014 | ||
IS | 23.11.2014 | ||
PT | 24.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CY | 23.07.2014 | |
FI | 23.07.2014 | ||
LT | 23.07.2014 | ||
PL | 23.07.2014 | ||
SE | 23.07.2014 | ||
BG | 23.10.2014 | ||
NO | 23.10.2014 | ||
GR | 24.10.2014 | ||
PT | 24.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | FI | 23.07.2014 | |
LT | 23.07.2014 | ||
SE | 23.07.2014 | ||
BG | 23.10.2014 | ||
NO | 23.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | FI | 23.07.2014 | |
LT | 23.07.2014 | ||
SE | 23.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | LT | 23.07.2014 | Cited in | International search | [DXY]US6170480 (MELINK STEPHEN K [US], et al); | [XY]DE20014690U (HOELLDOBLER JOHANN [DE]); | [XY]EP1333232 (FRANCE AIR [FR]); | [XY]US2005156053 (MELINK STEPHEN K [US]); | [Y]US7147168 (BAGWELL RICK [US], et al) | by applicant | US6170480 | US2005156053 |