EP2183804 - A METHOD OF FABRICATING STRUCTURED PARTICLES COMPOSED OF SILICON OR A SILICON-BASED MATERIAL AND THEIR USE IN LITHIUM RECHARGEABLE BATTERIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.01.2013 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nexeon Limited 136 Milton Park Abingdon Oxfordshire OX14 4SB / GB | [2011/39] |
Former [2010/34] | For all designated states Nexeon Limited 136 Milton Park Abingdon Oxfordshire OX14 3SB / GB | ||
Former [2010/19] | For all designated states Nexeon Limited Building E1, Culham Science Centre Abingdon OXON ox14 3DB / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GREEN, Mino 55 Gerard Road London SW13 9QH / GB | 02 /
LIU, Feng-Ming 8 Owston Lower Earley Reading RG6 3DX / GB | [2012/10] |
Former [2011/28] | 01 /
GREEN, Mino 55 Gerard Road London SW13 9QH / GB | ||
02 /
LIU, Feng-Ming 8 Owston Lower Earley Reading RG6 3DX / GB | |||
Former [2010/19] | 01 /
GREEN, Mino 55 Gerard Road London SW13 9QH / GB | Representative(s) | Roberts, Gwilym Vaughan, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/19] | Roberts, Gwilym Vaughan, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 08775982.5 | 17.07.2008 | [2010/19] | WO2008GB02452 | Priority number, date | GB20070013898 | 17.07.2007 Original published format: GB 0713898 | [2010/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009010758 | Date: | 22.01.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/04] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2183804 | Date: | 12.05.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.01.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2183804 | Date: | 07.03.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.03.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H01M4/38, H01M4/66, H01M4/04, H01M10/0525, H01M4/485, C01B33/02 | [2011/40] | CPC: |
H01M4/134 (EP,CN,US);
H01M4/38 (KR);
H01M4/0492 (EP,CN,US);
C01B33/021 (KR);
H01M10/052 (CN);
H01M10/0525 (KR);
H01M10/52 (EP,CN,US);
H01M4/1391 (CN);
H01M4/1395 (EP,CN,US);
H01M4/386 (EP,CN,US);
H01M4/48 (CN);
H01M4/505 (CN);
H01M4/525 (CN);
H01M4/666 (CN);
H01M2004/027 (EP,CN,US);
Y02E60/10 (EP,US);
Y02P70/50 (EP,US);
Y10T117/102 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2010/19] | H01M4/38, H01M4/66, H01M4/04, H01M10/40, H01M4/48, C01B33/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/19] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM HERSTELLEN VON AUS SILIZIUM ODER EINEM AUF SILIZIUM BASIERENDEN MATERIAL ZUSAMMENGESETZTEN STRUKTURIERTEN PARTIKELN UND IHRE VERWENDUNG IN WIEDERAUFLADBAREN LITHIUMBATTERIEN | [2010/19] | English: | A METHOD OF FABRICATING STRUCTURED PARTICLES COMPOSED OF SILICON OR A SILICON-BASED MATERIAL AND THEIR USE IN LITHIUM RECHARGEABLE BATTERIES | [2010/19] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE PARTICULES STRUCTURÉES COMPOSÉES DE SILICIUM OU D'UN MATÉRIAU À BASE DE SILICIUM ET LEUR UTILISATION DANS DES BATTERIES AU LITHIUM RECHARGEABLES | [2010/19] | Entry into regional phase | 12.02.2010 | National basic fee paid | 12.02.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.02.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.02.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.02.2010 | Examination requested [2010/19] | 23.08.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.11.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.11.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.12.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.08.2011 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 07.09.2011 | 07.09.2011 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 10.10.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.01.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 19.01.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP10002163.3 / EP2194596 | EP10002797.8 / EP2204868 | EP12182852.9 / EP2533331 | EP12182853.7 / EP2533332 | EP15173948.9 / EP2955774 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.08.2010 | Opposition(s) | 10.12.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.07.2008 | AT | 07.03.2012 | BE | 07.03.2012 | CY | 07.03.2012 | CZ | 07.03.2012 | DK | 07.03.2012 | EE | 07.03.2012 | FI | 07.03.2012 | HR | 07.03.2012 | IT | 07.03.2012 | LT | 07.03.2012 | LV | 07.03.2012 | MT | 07.03.2012 | NL | 07.03.2012 | PL | 07.03.2012 | RO | 07.03.2012 | SE | 07.03.2012 | SI | 07.03.2012 | SK | 07.03.2012 | TR | 07.03.2012 | BG | 07.06.2012 | NO | 07.06.2012 | GR | 08.06.2012 | ES | 18.06.2012 | IS | 07.07.2012 | PT | 09.07.2012 | IE | 17.07.2012 | LU | 17.07.2012 | CH | 31.07.2012 | LI | 31.07.2012 | MC | 31.07.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 07.03.2012 | |
BE | 07.03.2012 | ||
CY | 07.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 07.03.2012 | ||
DK | 07.03.2012 | ||
EE | 07.03.2012 | ||
FI | 07.03.2012 | ||
HR | 07.03.2012 | ||
IT | 07.03.2012 | ||
LT | 07.03.2012 | ||
LV | 07.03.2012 | ||
MT | 07.03.2012 | ||
NL | 07.03.2012 | ||
PL | 07.03.2012 | ||
RO | 07.03.2012 | ||
SE | 07.03.2012 | ||
SI | 07.03.2012 | ||
SK | 07.03.2012 | ||
TR | 07.03.2012 | ||
BG | 07.06.2012 | ||
NO | 07.06.2012 | ||
GR | 08.06.2012 | ||
ES | 18.06.2012 | ||
IS | 07.07.2012 | ||
PT | 09.07.2012 | ||
IE | 17.07.2012 | ||
LU | 17.07.2012 | ||
CH | 31.07.2012 | ||
LI | 31.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 07.03.2012 | |
BE | 07.03.2012 | ||
CY | 07.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 07.03.2012 | ||
DK | 07.03.2012 | ||
EE | 07.03.2012 | ||
FI | 07.03.2012 | ||
HR | 07.03.2012 | ||
IT | 07.03.2012 | ||
LT | 07.03.2012 | ||
LV | 07.03.2012 | ||
MT | 07.03.2012 | ||
NL | 07.03.2012 | ||
PL | 07.03.2012 | ||
RO | 07.03.2012 | ||
SE | 07.03.2012 | ||
SI | 07.03.2012 | ||
SK | 07.03.2012 | ||
TR | 07.03.2012 | ||
BG | 07.06.2012 | ||
NO | 07.06.2012 | ||
GR | 08.06.2012 | ||
ES | 18.06.2012 | ||
IS | 07.07.2012 | ||
PT | 09.07.2012 | ||
IE | 17.07.2012 | ||
CH | 31.07.2012 | ||
LI | 31.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/35] | AT | 07.03.2012 | |
BE | 07.03.2012 | ||
CY | 07.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 07.03.2012 | ||
DK | 07.03.2012 | ||
EE | 07.03.2012 | ||
FI | 07.03.2012 | ||
HR | 07.03.2012 | ||
IT | 07.03.2012 | ||
LT | 07.03.2012 | ||
LV | 07.03.2012 | ||
MT | 07.03.2012 | ||
NL | 07.03.2012 | ||
PL | 07.03.2012 | ||
RO | 07.03.2012 | ||
SE | 07.03.2012 | ||
SI | 07.03.2012 | ||
SK | 07.03.2012 | ||
BG | 07.06.2012 | ||
NO | 07.06.2012 | ||
GR | 08.06.2012 | ||
ES | 18.06.2012 | ||
IS | 07.07.2012 | ||
PT | 09.07.2012 | ||
IE | 17.07.2012 | ||
CH | 31.07.2012 | ||
LI | 31.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 07.03.2012 | |
BE | 07.03.2012 | ||
CY | 07.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 07.03.2012 | ||
DK | 07.03.2012 | ||
EE | 07.03.2012 | ||
FI | 07.03.2012 | ||
HR | 07.03.2012 | ||
IT | 07.03.2012 | ||
LT | 07.03.2012 | ||
LV | 07.03.2012 | ||
NL | 07.03.2012 | ||
PL | 07.03.2012 | ||
RO | 07.03.2012 | ||
SE | 07.03.2012 | ||
SI | 07.03.2012 | ||
SK | 07.03.2012 | ||
BG | 07.06.2012 | ||
NO | 07.06.2012 | ||
GR | 08.06.2012 | ||
ES | 18.06.2012 | ||
IS | 07.07.2012 | ||
PT | 09.07.2012 | ||
IE | 17.07.2012 | ||
CH | 31.07.2012 | ||
LI | 31.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 07.03.2012 | |
BE | 07.03.2012 | ||
CY | 07.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 07.03.2012 | ||
DK | 07.03.2012 | ||
EE | 07.03.2012 | ||
FI | 07.03.2012 | ||
HR | 07.03.2012 | ||
IT | 07.03.2012 | ||
LT | 07.03.2012 | ||
LV | 07.03.2012 | ||
NL | 07.03.2012 | ||
PL | 07.03.2012 | ||
RO | 07.03.2012 | ||
SE | 07.03.2012 | ||
SI | 07.03.2012 | ||
SK | 07.03.2012 | ||
NO | 07.06.2012 | ||
GR | 08.06.2012 | ||
ES | 18.06.2012 | ||
IS | 07.07.2012 | ||
PT | 09.07.2012 | ||
CH | 31.07.2012 | ||
LI | 31.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/20] | AT | 07.03.2012 | |
BE | 07.03.2012 | ||
CY | 07.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 07.03.2012 | ||
DK | 07.03.2012 | ||
EE | 07.03.2012 | ||
FI | 07.03.2012 | ||
HR | 07.03.2012 | ||
IT | 07.03.2012 | ||
LT | 07.03.2012 | ||
LV | 07.03.2012 | ||
NL | 07.03.2012 | ||
PL | 07.03.2012 | ||
RO | 07.03.2012 | ||
SE | 07.03.2012 | ||
SI | 07.03.2012 | ||
SK | 07.03.2012 | ||
NO | 07.06.2012 | ||
GR | 08.06.2012 | ||
IS | 07.07.2012 | ||
PT | 09.07.2012 | ||
CH | 31.07.2012 | ||
LI | 31.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | AT | 07.03.2012 | |
BE | 07.03.2012 | ||
CY | 07.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 07.03.2012 | ||
DK | 07.03.2012 | ||
EE | 07.03.2012 | ||
FI | 07.03.2012 | ||
HR | 07.03.2012 | ||
IT | 07.03.2012 | ||
LT | 07.03.2012 | ||
LV | 07.03.2012 | ||
NL | 07.03.2012 | ||
PL | 07.03.2012 | ||
RO | 07.03.2012 | ||
SE | 07.03.2012 | ||
SI | 07.03.2012 | ||
SK | 07.03.2012 | ||
NO | 07.06.2012 | ||
GR | 08.06.2012 | ||
IS | 07.07.2012 | ||
PT | 09.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 07.03.2012 | |
BE | 07.03.2012 | ||
CY | 07.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 07.03.2012 | ||
DK | 07.03.2012 | ||
EE | 07.03.2012 | ||
FI | 07.03.2012 | ||
HR | 07.03.2012 | ||
LT | 07.03.2012 | ||
LV | 07.03.2012 | ||
NL | 07.03.2012 | ||
PL | 07.03.2012 | ||
RO | 07.03.2012 | ||
SE | 07.03.2012 | ||
SI | 07.03.2012 | ||
SK | 07.03.2012 | ||
NO | 07.06.2012 | ||
GR | 08.06.2012 | ||
IS | 07.07.2012 | ||
PT | 09.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 07.03.2012 | |
BE | 07.03.2012 | ||
CY | 07.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 07.03.2012 | ||
EE | 07.03.2012 | ||
FI | 07.03.2012 | ||
HR | 07.03.2012 | ||
LT | 07.03.2012 | ||
LV | 07.03.2012 | ||
NL | 07.03.2012 | ||
PL | 07.03.2012 | ||
RO | 07.03.2012 | ||
SE | 07.03.2012 | ||
SI | 07.03.2012 | ||
SK | 07.03.2012 | ||
NO | 07.06.2012 | ||
GR | 08.06.2012 | ||
IS | 07.07.2012 | ||
PT | 09.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/01] | BE | 07.03.2012 | |
CY | 07.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 07.03.2012 | ||
EE | 07.03.2012 | ||
FI | 07.03.2012 | ||
HR | 07.03.2012 | ||
LT | 07.03.2012 | ||
LV | 07.03.2012 | ||
NL | 07.03.2012 | ||
PL | 07.03.2012 | ||
RO | 07.03.2012 | ||
SE | 07.03.2012 | ||
SI | 07.03.2012 | ||
SK | 07.03.2012 | ||
NO | 07.06.2012 | ||
GR | 08.06.2012 | ||
IS | 07.07.2012 | ||
PT | 09.07.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | BE | 07.03.2012 | |
CY | 07.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 07.03.2012 | ||
EE | 07.03.2012 | ||
FI | 07.03.2012 | ||
HR | 07.03.2012 | ||
LT | 07.03.2012 | ||
LV | 07.03.2012 | ||
NL | 07.03.2012 | ||
PL | 07.03.2012 | ||
RO | 07.03.2012 | ||
SE | 07.03.2012 | ||
SI | 07.03.2012 | ||
SK | 07.03.2012 | ||
NO | 07.06.2012 | ||
GR | 08.06.2012 | ||
IS | 07.07.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | BE | 07.03.2012 | |
CY | 07.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 07.03.2012 | ||
EE | 07.03.2012 | ||
FI | 07.03.2012 | ||
HR | 07.03.2012 | ||
LT | 07.03.2012 | ||
LV | 07.03.2012 | ||
NL | 07.03.2012 | ||
PL | 07.03.2012 | ||
RO | 07.03.2012 | ||
SE | 07.03.2012 | ||
SI | 07.03.2012 | ||
NO | 07.06.2012 | ||
GR | 08.06.2012 | ||
IS | 07.07.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | BE | 07.03.2012 | |
CY | 07.03.2012 | ||
EE | 07.03.2012 | ||
FI | 07.03.2012 | ||
HR | 07.03.2012 | ||
LT | 07.03.2012 | ||
LV | 07.03.2012 | ||
NL | 07.03.2012 | ||
SE | 07.03.2012 | ||
NO | 07.06.2012 | ||
GR | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/46] | BE | 07.03.2012 | |
CY | 07.03.2012 | ||
FI | 07.03.2012 | ||
HR | 07.03.2012 | ||
LT | 07.03.2012 | ||
LV | 07.03.2012 | ||
NL | 07.03.2012 | ||
NO | 07.06.2012 | ||
GR | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/41] | CY | 07.03.2012 | |
FI | 07.03.2012 | ||
HR | 07.03.2012 | ||
LT | 07.03.2012 | ||
LV | 07.03.2012 | ||
NL | 07.03.2012 | ||
NO | 07.06.2012 | ||
GR | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/39] | FI | 07.03.2012 | |
HR | 07.03.2012 | ||
LT | 07.03.2012 | ||
LV | 07.03.2012 | ||
NL | 07.03.2012 | ||
NO | 07.06.2012 | ||
GR | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | FI | 07.03.2012 | |
HR | 07.03.2012 | ||
LT | 07.03.2012 | ||
NL | 07.03.2012 | ||
NO | 07.06.2012 | ||
GR | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | HR | 07.03.2012 | |
LT | 07.03.2012 | ||
NL | 07.03.2012 | ||
NO | 07.06.2012 | ||
GR | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | LT | 07.03.2012 | |
NL | 07.03.2012 | ||
NO | 07.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | LT | 07.03.2012 | |
NO | 07.06.2012 | Cited in | International search | [X]US4002541 (STREANDER GEORGE W) [X] 1-9,12-19 * column 1, lines 10-19 * * column 2, line 10 - column 3, line 20 * * column 4, line 45 - column 5, line 2 * * column 5, lines 25-27 - lines 55-61 * * column 6, lines 17-51 * * column 7, line 62 - column 8, line 39 * * figures 1,3 *; | [A]JP2003017040 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO) [A] 1-36 * paragraphs [0009] , [0013] - [0017] - [0029] - [0047] * * figures 1-3 *; | [A]US2005118503 (HONDA KAZUYOSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-35 * paragraphs [0027] - [0031] - [0043] , [0057] - [0064] - [0104] , [0151] , [0152] * * figures 6B,6C *; | [PX]WO2008044683 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP], et al) [PX] 1-5,7-10,12-14,16,20-35 * the whole document *; | [PX]WO2008072460 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP], et al) [PX] 1,2,7,9-12,14,20-35 * the whole document *; | [A] - PENG K ET AL, "UNIFORM, AXIAL-ORIENTATION ALIGNMENT OF ONE-DIMENSIONAL SINGLE-CRYSTAL SILICON NANOSTRUCTURE ARRAYS", ANGEWANDTE CHEMIE. INTERNATIONAL EDITION, WILEY VCH VERLAG, WEINHEIM, (20050429), vol. 44, no. 18, ISSN 1433-7851, pages 2737 - 2742, XP001238316 [A] 36 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/anie.200462995 | by applicant | WO2008072460 |