EP2180887 - PHARMACEUTICAL PREPARATIONS CONTAINING HIGHLY VOLATILE SILICONES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.11.2023 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 25.11.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.07.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.11.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.12.2023 [2023/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Egis Gyógyszergyár Zrt. Keresztúri út 30-38 1106 Budapest / HU | [2022/52] |
Former [2022/31] | For all designated states Egis Gyógyszergyár Nyilvánosan Müködö Részvénytársaság Keresztúri út 30-38 1106 Budapest / HU | ||
Former [2010/18] | For all designated states Egis Gyogyszergyar Nyilvánosan Múködó Részvénytársaság Keresztúri út 30-38 1106 Budapest / HU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MIKULÁSIK, Endre Kossuth Lajos U. 60 H-8924 Alsónemesapáti / HU | 02 /
FAZEKAS, Patrik Berki u. 74 H-9900 Körmend / HU | [2010/18] | Representative(s) | Stolmár & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB, et al Blumenstraße 17 80331 München / DE | [2022/52] |
Former [2013/12] | Stolmár & Partner, et al Blumenstraße 17 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [2012/35] | Motsch, Andreas, et al Motsch & Seitz Patentanwälte St.-Anna-Platz 4 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/18] | Beszédes, Stephan G. Patentanwalt Münchener Strasse 80a 85221 Dachau / DE | Application number, filing date | 08776249.8 | 10.07.2008 | [2010/18] | WO2008HU00083 | Priority number, date | HU20070000473 | 10.07.2007 Original published format: HU 0700473 | [2010/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009007764 | Date: | 15.01.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/03] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2180887 | Date: | 05.05.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.01.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2180887 | Date: | 28.12.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.08.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/06, A61K9/00, A61K47/02, A61K9/16, A61P31/04, A61P37/08, A61K31/5415, A61K31/4174, A61K31/4164, A61K31/495 | [2022/26] | CPC: |
A61K9/06 (EP,KR,US);
A61K47/34 (US);
A61K31/4164 (US);
A61K31/4174 (US);
A61K31/495 (US);
A61K31/5415 (US);
A61K31/59 (KR);
A61K47/02 (EP,KR,US);
A61K47/50 (KR);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P37/08 (EP);
A61K9/0014 (EP,US);
A61K9/1611 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2010/18] | A61K31/00, A61K9/06, A61K47/02, A61K47/48 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2022/52] |
Former [2010/18] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | 08.02.2010 | BA | 08.02.2010 | MK | 08.02.2010 | RS | 08.02.2010 | Title | German: | HOCH FLÜCHTIGE SILIKONE ENTHALTENDE PHARMAZEUTISCHE ZUBEREITUNGEN | [2010/18] | English: | PHARMACEUTICAL PREPARATIONS CONTAINING HIGHLY VOLATILE SILICONES | [2010/18] | French: | PRÉPARATIONS PHARMACEUTIQUES CONTENANT DES SILICONES HAUTEMENT VOLATILES | [2010/18] | Entry into regional phase | 08.02.2010 | National basic fee paid | 08.02.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.02.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.05.2009 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 08.02.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.02.2010 | Examination requested [2010/18] | 07.05.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.11.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.02.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.06.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.10.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 04.06.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.09.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.06.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.09.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.01.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.07.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.11.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 17.11.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.11.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.05.2015 | Opposition(s) | 29.09.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 15.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 24.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 23.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 19.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 17.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 08.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 14.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 15 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Stay/Interruption | 12.07.2012 | Interruption of proceedings. Reason: representative has died | [2012/41] | 01.02.2013 | Resumption of proceedings | [2012/51] | 12.07.2012 | Interruption of proceedings. Reason: representative has died | [2012/51] | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0639372 (CILAG LTD [FR]) [X] 1-5 * column 1, lines 1-3 * * column 2, lines 51-58 * * column 3, lines 1,2,29-39,53-58 * * column 4, lines 26-31,41-58 *; | [A]US2003180281 (BOTT RICHARD R [US], et al) [A] 1-5 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2004092283 (MERCK PATENT GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1-5* the whole document *; | [A]US2006159648 (DAVIS ADRIAN F [GB], et al) [A] 1-5 * the whole document *; | [X]WO2006138035 (DOW CORNING [US], et al) [X] 1-5 * page 2, paragraph 8 * * page 3, paragraph 11 * * page 4, paragraphs 17,22 * * page 5, paragraphs 23,24 * * page 10, paragraph 44 * * page 12, paragraphs 48-51 * * page 13, paragraph 53 *; | [X]US2007036731 (HIRSH JANE C [US], et al) [X] 1-5 * page 3, paragraphs 23,27,29 * * page 4, paragraphs 34-39,44,47,48 * * page 5, paragraphs 49-52 * | by applicant | EP0877624 |