EP2147332 - A METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR LOCATING AND MEASURING THE DISTANCE TO A TARGET [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.02.2015 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.02.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.04.2015 [2015/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Robert Bosch Company Limited 21st Floor King's Road 625 VRC Hong Kong / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2010/04] | For all designated states Robert Bosch Company Limited 21st Floor King's Road 625 VRC Hong Kong / HK | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YUNG, Wai, Lam Rm 2504 Wing Pak House Hong Pak Court Lam Tin Hong Kong / CN | 02 /
BITTNER, Wilfried, Alois, Anton 9A, Block 6, Villa Esplanada 8 Nga Ying Chau Street Tsing Hong Kong / CN | 03 /
LAM, Yat, Wah Flat E, 13/f., Tower 2 No. 8 Waterloo Road Yaumatei, Kowloon Hong Kong / CN | 04 /
CHAN, Sai, Chak Rm 2020, Hin Tak House Hin Keng Estate Shatin, N.t. Hong Kong / CN | 05 /
CHAN, Wah, Pong Flat 1604, Block M Allways gardens Tsuen Wan, N.T. Hong Kong / CN | 06 /
NG, Kwong, Lam Flat 217, Ping Shing House Ping Tin Estate Lam Tin, Kowloon Hong Kong / CN | 07 /
ZIMMERMANN, Thomas, Paul, Richard Johann von Werth Str. 1 80639 Munich / DE | [2010/04] | Representative(s) | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Postfach 44 01 51 80750 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/18] | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 44 01 51 80750 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/04] | Barth, Stephan Manuel Reinhard, Skuhra, Weise & Partner GbR Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08776399.1 | 16.04.2008 | [2010/04] | WO2008IB02066 | Priority number, date | US20070796621 | 27.04.2007 Original published format: US 796621 | [2010/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008155657 | Date: | 24.12.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/52] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2147332 | Date: | 27.01.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.12.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.06.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G01S17/02, G01S17/08, G01S7/48 | [2010/04] | CPC: |
G01S7/4813 (EP,US);
G01S17/08 (EP,US);
G01S17/86 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/04] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR BESTIMMUNG UND MESSUNG DES ABSTANDS ZU EINEM ZIEL | [2010/04] | English: | A METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR LOCATING AND MEASURING THE DISTANCE TO A TARGET | [2010/04] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL POUR LOCALISER ET MESURER LA DISTANCE À UNE CIBLE | [2010/04] | Entry into regional phase | 27.11.2009 | National basic fee paid | 11.12.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.12.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.10.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.12.2009 | Examination requested [2010/04] | 10.03.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.07.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.11.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/14] | 25.11.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/14] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.03.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2014 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US5221956 (PATTERSON SCOTT W [US], et al) [Y] 2-5,20,22 * abstract ** column 3, line 56 - column 9, line 25 *; | [Y]WO9931516 (LASER ATLANTA [US]) [Y] 2-5,20,22 * abstract * * page 3, lines 4-28 * * page 9, line 10 - page 13, line 19 *; | [XY]US2006125924 (ING-SONG LIN [TW], et al) [X] 1,21 * abstract * * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0029] * [Y] 2-5,20,22 | by applicant | US2006125925 |