EP2170249 - PERSONAL CARE ARTICLE FOR SEQUENTIALLY DISPENSING COMPOSITIONS WITH DISTINCT FRAGRANCE CHARACTERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.06.2017 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.06.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.07.2017 [2017/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Procter & Gamble Company One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2010/14] | For all designated states The Procter & Gamble Company One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati OH 45202 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CETTI, Jonathan, Robert 7801 Birchwood Court Mason, Ohio 45040 / US | 02 /
PUTMAN, Christopher, Dean 6747 San Mateo Drive West Chester, Ohio 45069 / US | 03 /
VELARDE, Andres, Ernesto 1636 Druid Oaks Drive Atlanta 30329 / US | 04 /
LEHNHOFF, Karen 546 Sugar Maple Court Cincinnati, Ohio 45255 / US | 05 /
SMITH, Edward, Dewey, III 6880 Man-O-War Lane Mason, Ohio 45040 / US | 06 /
PLOS, Julien, Claude Flat 47 Devonhurst Place 9 Heathfield Terrace London W4 4JB / GB | [2010/20] |
Former [2010/14] | 01 /
CETTI, Jonathan, Robert 7801 Birchwood Court Mason, Ohio 45040 / US | ||
02 /
PUTMAN, Christopher, Dean 6747 San Mateo Drive West Chester, Ohio 45069 / US | |||
03 /
VELARDE, Andres, Ernesto 7947 Ramble View 303 Cincinnati, Ohio 45231 / US | |||
04 /
LEHNHOFF, Karen 546 Sugar Maple Court Cincinnati, Ohio 45255 / US | |||
05 /
SMITH, Edward, Dewey, III 6880 Man-O-War Lane Mason, Ohio 45040 / US | |||
06 /
PLOS, Julien, Claude 2479 Madison Road Apt. 55 Cincinnati, Ohio 45208 / US | Representative(s) | Kremer, Véronique Marie Joséphine, et al Procter & Gamble Service GmbH IP Department Sulzbacher Straße 40-50 65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/24] | Boubel, Thomas Procter & Gamble Service GmbH IP Department Frankfurter Strasse 145 61476 Kronberg im Taunus / DE | ||
Former [2013/22] | Boubel, Thomas, et al Procter & Gamble Service GmbH Patent Department Berliner Allee 65 64274 Darmstadt / DE | ||
Former [2013/13] | Hirsch, Uwe Thomas M.H., et al Procter & Gamble Service GmbH Frankfurter Strasse 145 61476 Kronberg / DE | ||
Former [2010/14] | Wilding, Richard Alan, et al Procter & Gamble Technical Centre Ltd Rusham Park Whitehall Lane GB-Egham, Surrey TW20 9NW / GB | Application number, filing date | 08776574.9 | 25.07.2008 | [2010/14] | WO2008IB53008 | Priority number, date | US20070881535 | 27.07.2007 Original published format: US 881535 | [2010/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009016574 | Date: | 05.02.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2170249 | Date: | 07.04.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.02.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.02.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61K8/03, A61Q13/00 | [2010/14] | CPC: |
A61K8/03 (EP,US);
A61Q19/10 (EP,US);
B65D1/0223 (EP,US);
A61K2800/87 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/14] | Title | German: | KÖRPERPFLEGEARTIKEL FÜR AUFEINANDERFOLGENDE AUSGABE VON ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN MIT VERSCHIEDENEN DUFTEIGENSCHAFTEN | [2010/14] | English: | PERSONAL CARE ARTICLE FOR SEQUENTIALLY DISPENSING COMPOSITIONS WITH DISTINCT FRAGRANCE CHARACTERS | [2010/14] | French: | ARTICLE DE SOIN PERSONNEL POUR DISTRIBUER DE FAÇON SÉQUENTIELLE DES COMPOSITIONS AVEC DES CARACTÈRES DE PARFUM DISTINCTS | [2010/14] | Entry into regional phase | 06.01.2010 | National basic fee paid | 06.01.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.01.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.01.2010 | Examination requested [2010/14] | 01.02.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/27] | 01.03.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2017/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 09.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2016 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XAY]WO2007069220 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US], et al) [X] 1-5,7,10,11 * the whole document * [A] 8,9 [Y] 6; | [XY]US2007135319 (WEI KARL S [US], et al) [X] 1,2,10,11 * paragraphs [0011] - [0081] * [Y] 6; | [XY]DE19949418 (COTY BV [NL]) [X] 1,2,5,7 * column 1, line 1 - column 4, line 1 * [Y] 6; | [X]WO0170193 (UNILEVER PLC [GB], et al) [X] 1-4,10,11 * pages 10-11; table 2 * |