EP2183454 - COUPLING MECHANISM FOR SLIDING DOORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.08.2016 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.08.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.09.2016 [2016/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hardoor Mechanisms Production Ltd. 22 Plotizki Street 75361 Rishon Le Zion / IL | [2010/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HALFON, Amos 6 Barshevski Street 75363 Rishon Le Zion / IL | 02 /
HARARI, Mordechai 53 Pinsker Street 75910 Rishon Le Zion / IL | [2010/19] | Representative(s) | Sarpi, Maurizio Studio Ferrario S.r.l. Via Collina, 36 00187 Roma / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2010/19] | Sarpi, Maurizio Studio Ferrario S.r.l. Via Collina, 36 00187 Roma / IT | Application number, filing date | 08776648.1 | 24.07.2008 | [2010/19] | WO2008IL01020 | Priority number, date | IL20070184860 | 26.07.2007 Original published format: IL 18486007 | [2010/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009013747 | Date: | 29.01.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/05] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2183454 | Date: | 12.05.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.01.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 04.03.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.02.2014 | Classification | IPC: | E05C7/06, E05F17/00, E05F15/14 | [2014/11] | CPC: |
E05F15/641 (EP,US);
E05F15/635 (EP,US);
E05F17/00 (EP,US);
E05F15/638 (EP,US);
E05Y2201/674 (EP,US);
E05Y2600/46 (EP,US);
E05Y2900/20 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2010/19] | E05C7/06, E05F17/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/19] | Title | German: | KOPPLUNGSMECHANISMUS FÜR SCHIEBETÜREN | [2010/19] | English: | COUPLING MECHANISM FOR SLIDING DOORS | [2010/19] | French: | MÉCANISME D'ACCOUPLEMENT POUR PORTES COULISSANTES | [2010/19] | Entry into regional phase | 16.02.2010 | National basic fee paid | 16.02.2010 | Search fee paid | 27.08.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.08.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.08.2010 | Examination requested [2010/40] | 28.08.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.09.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.03.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/36] | 18.04.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/36] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.09.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE820400 (DOWALDWERKE) [X] 1,10,16 * page 2, line 57 - line 81 * * figures 1-2 *; | [X]DE964030 (VER BAUBESCHLAG GRETSCH CO) [X] 1,4,6,7,10,16 * page 2, line 42 - line 63 * * figure 4 *; | [A]DE3619775 (HANEWINKEL HEINZ [DE]) [A] 12 * claim 1 ** figures 1-4 *; | [X]GB2362251 (MCALLISTER JAMES FRANCIS [GB]) [X] 1,10,16 * page 2 * * figures 1-5 *; | [X]US2004049984 (PFAFF ERIC DANT [US]) [X] 1,8-11,16 * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0038] * * figures 1-5 *; | [Y]US2006144529 (HEMPHILL DALLAS [US]) [Y] 2,3 * paragraph [0024] * * figure 1 *; | [XAYI]US2007108927 (VALENCIA MICHAEL A [US], et al) [X] 1,8-10,16,17 * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0033] * * figures 1-3 * [A] 12-15 [Y] 2,3 [I] 5 | International search | [Y]US4930256 (KAWANISHI ISAMU [JP], et al); | [Y]US2003188487 (RASMUSSEN DOUG [US]); | [Y]US2005000164 (JACOBS KENNETH [GB]); | [Y]US2006144529 (HEMPHILL DALLAS [US]); | [Y]US2006237427 (LOGAN JAMES D [US]) |