EP2163063 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR SIMULATING A HACKING ATTACK ON A NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.01.2014 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.01.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.02.2014 [2014/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Iviz Techno Solutions Pvt. Ltd Erevmax Floor, DLF IT Park Tower-1, 12th Floor 08-Major Arterial Road New Town Rajarhat Kolkata 700 156 / IN | [2010/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BARAI, Bikash 73 Balagarh Road PO Sahaganj Dist Hooghly Pin 712 104 / IN | 02 /
DE, Nilanjan 32A, Mahanirban Road Kolkata 700 029 West Bengal / IN | [2010/11] | Representative(s) | Heinze, Ekkehard, et al Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstrasse 47 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/11] | Heinze, Ekkehard, et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Widenmayerstrasse 48 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08776674.7 | 22.05.2008 | [2010/11] | WO2008IN00333 | Priority number, date | INKA07972007 | 24.05.2007 Original published format: IN KA07972007 | [2010/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008142710 | Date: | 27.11.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/48] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2163063 | Date: | 17.03.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.11.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.03.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/06, G06F21/00 | [2010/11] | CPC: |
H04L63/1433 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/11] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR SIMULIERUNG EINER HACKERANGRIFFS AUF EIN NETZWERK | [2010/11] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR SIMULATING A HACKING ATTACK ON A NETWORK | [2010/11] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME POUR SIMULER UNE ATTAQUE DE PIRATE SUR UN RÉSEAU | [2010/11] | Entry into regional phase | 23.11.2009 | National basic fee paid | 23.11.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.11.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.11.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.11.2009 | Examination requested [2010/11] | 13.09.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.01.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.02.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.08.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/06] | 24.09.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/06] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.09.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2006021048 (COOK CHAD L [US], et al) [X] 1-20 * paragraphs [0028] , [0031] - [0035] * * paragraphs [0037] - [0039] * * paragraphs [0045] , [0046] * * paragraphs [0048] - [0056] * * paragraphs [0064] , [0065] * * figures 1,3,7,8,10-12,16 *; | [XA]WO2004031953 (SKYBOX SECURITY LTD [US]) [X] 18-20 * abstract * * page 4, paragraph L - page 5, line L * * page 10, paragraph L - page 12, line L * * page 14, paragraph L - page 21, line 2 * * figures 1-3 * [A] 1-17; | [XA] - KYLE INGOLS ET AL, "Practical Attack Graph Generation for Network Defense", COMPUTER SECURITY APPLICATIONS CONFERENCE, 2006. ACSAC '06. 22ND ANNUAL, IEEE, PI, (20061201), ISBN 978-0-7695-2716-1, pages 121 - 130, XP031033554 [X] 18-20 * sections 5, 7 * * figures 3,6 * [A] 1-17 | [XA] - CHINCHANI R ET AL, "Towards a Theory of Insider Threat Assessment", DEPENDABLE SYSTEMS AND NETWORKS, 2005. DSN 2005. PROCEEDINGS. INTERNAT IONAL CONFERENCE ON YOKOHAMA, JAPAN 28-01 JUNE 2005, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20050628), ISBN 978-0-7695-2282-1, pages 108 - 117, XP010817787 [X] 17 * sections 1.1, 3.1, 3.2 * [A] 1-16,18-20 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/DSN.2005.94 | Examination | WO03007192 | - STEWART A J, "Distributed Metastasis : A Computer Network Penetration Methodology", INTERNET CITATION, (19990812), URL: http://www.csee.umbc.edu/cadip/docs/NetworkIntrusion/distributed_metastasis.pdf, (20050419), XP002325346 |