EP2161126 - MOLDING SHEET FOR FORMING HARD COAT LAYER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.02.2019 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.05.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.03.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.11.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.02.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.03.2019 [2019/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nippon Soda Co., Ltd. 2-1 Ohtemachi 2-chome,Chiyoda-ku Tokyo, 100-8165 / JP | [2010/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIMURA, Nobuo c/o R&D Laboratory for High-Performance Materials Nippon Soda Co., Ltd. 12-54 Goiminamikaigan Ichihara-shi Chiba 290-0045 / JP | 02 /
SHIBATA, Hiromoto c/o R&D Laboratory for High-Performance Materials Nippon Soda Co., Ltd. 12-54 Goiminamikaigan Ichihara-shi Chiba 290-0045 / JP | 03 /
HASEGAWA, Kazuki c/o R&D Laboratory for High-Performance Materials Nippon Soda Co., Ltd. 12-54 Goiminamikaigan Ichihara-shi Chiba 290-0045 / JP | [2018/18] |
Former [2010/10] | 01 /
KIMURA, Nobuo c/o R&D Laboratory for High-Performance Materials Nippon Soda Co. Ltd. 12-54 Goiminamikaigan Ichihara-shi Chiba 290-0045 / JP | ||
02 /
SHIBATA, Hiromoto c/o R&D Laboratory for High-Performance Materials Nippon Soda Co. Ltd. 12-54 Goiminamikaigan Ichihara-shi Chiba 290-0045 / JP | |||
03 /
HASEGAWA, Kazuki c/o R&D Laboratory for High-Performance Materials Nippon Soda Co. Ltd. 12-54 Goiminamikaigan Ichihara-shi Chiba 290-0045 / JP | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP, et al 104 Rue de Richelieu CS92104 75080 Paris Cedex 02 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2010/10] | Cabinet Plasseraud, et al 52, rue de la Victoire 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 08776788.5 | 03.07.2008 | [2010/10] | WO2008JP01776 | Priority number, date | JP20070175036 | 03.07.2007 Original published format: JP 2007175036 | JP20070228353 | 03.09.2007 Original published format: JP 2007228353 | JP20070285225 | 01.11.2007 Original published format: JP 2007285225 | [2010/10] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009004821 | Date: | 08.01.2009 | Language: | JA | [2009/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2161126 | Date: | 10.03.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 08.01.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.09.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B32B27/26, B05D1/28, C09D4/00, C09D5/00, G02B1/10, C08J7/04, G02B1/14, B29C45/14 | [2018/21] | CPC: |
B29C45/14827 (EP,KR,US);
C08J7/046 (EP,KR,US);
C08J7/0427 (EP,US);
C08J7/043 (EP,US);
C08L83/02 (KR);
C09D183/02 (KR);
G02B1/14 (EP,KR,US);
C08J2483/00 (EP,KR,US);
G02B1/10 (US);
G02B1/105 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2017/40] | B32B27/26, B05D1/28, C09D4/00, C09D5/00, C09D7/12, C09J7/02, G02B1/10, C08J7/04, G02B1/14, B29C45/14 | ||
Former IPC [2010/10] | B32B27/26, B05D1/28, C09D4/00, C09D5/00, C09D7/12, C09J7/02, G02B1/10, C08J7/04 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/10] | Title | German: | FORMPLATTE ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER HARTBESCHICHTUNG | [2010/10] | English: | MOLDING SHEET FOR FORMING HARD COAT LAYER | [2010/10] | French: | FEUILLE DE MOULAGE POUR FORMER UNE COUCHE DE REVÊTEMENT DURE | [2010/10] | Entry into regional phase | 15.12.2009 | Translation filed | 15.12.2009 | National basic fee paid | 15.12.2009 | Search fee paid | 15.12.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.12.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.12.2009 | Examination requested [2010/10] | 18.03.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.10.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.02.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.04.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.08.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.11.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.03.2018 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 14.05.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.09.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/11] | 29.10.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2019/11] | Divisional application(s) | EP13196388.6 / EP2730405 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.10.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 22.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 24.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2018 | 11   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0379343 (SHINETSU CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [A] 1-17* examples 1-3; claims 1-11; table 1 *; | [Y]WO2006088079 (NIPPON SODA CO [JP], et al) [Y] 1-17 * abstract *; | [Y]US2006221451 (OHISHI KAZUYA [JP], et al) [Y] 1-17 * paragraph [0076] - paragraph [0080] *; | [YP]EP1849835 (NIPPON SODA CO [JP]) [YP] 1-17 * abstract * * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0026] * * paragraph [0063] - paragraph [0096] *; | [E]EP2090600 (NIPPON SODA CO [JP]) [E] 1-17 * examples 1-28; claims 1-25; tables 2-4 * * paragraphs [0010] , [0152] * * paragraph [0154] - paragraph [0158] * | International search | [A]JP2001214092 (TOPPAN PRINTING CO LTD) [A] 1-17 * , Claims; examples (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2005272702 (JSR CORP, et al) [A] 1-17 * , Claims; examples & US 2007/0178298 A1 & EP 1727859 A1 & WO 2005/092967 A1 *; | [A]JP2007182511 (TORAY INDUSTRIES) [A] 1-17 * , Claims; examples (Family: none) *; | [PA]JP2008019358 (CATALYSTS & CHEM IND CO) [PA] 1-17 * , Claims; Par. No. [0049]; examples (Family: none) *; | [PA]WO2008069217 (NIPPON SODA CO [JP], et al) [PA] 1-17 * , Claims; examples (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2008165041 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD) [A] 1-17* , Claims; examples (Family: none) * |