EP2305395 - PRESS WORKING EQUIPMENT AND PRESS WORKING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.01.2014 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.01.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.02.2014 [2014/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toyotomi Kiko Co., Ltd. 7 Higashimukaiyama Imahonmachi Anjo-shi Aichi 446-8558 / JP | [2011/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YAMADA, Kouji c/o Toyotomi Kiko Co., Ltd. 7 Higashimukaiyama Imahonmachi Anjo-shi Aichi 446-8558 / JP | [2013/11] |
Former [2011/14] | 01 /
YAMADA, Kouji c/o Toyotomi Kiko Co., Ltd. 7 Higashimukaiyama Imahonmachi Anjo-shi Aichi 446-8558 / JP | Representative(s) | Kramer Barske Schmidtchen Patentanwälte PartG mbB European Patent Attorneys Landsberger Strasse 300 80687 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/11] | Kramer - Barske - Schmidtchen Landsberger Strasse 300 80687 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/14] | Kramer - Barske - Schmidtchen European Patent Attorneys Landsberger Strasse 300 80687 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08777060.8 | 30.05.2008 | [2011/14] | WO2008JP60049 | Priority number, date | JP20080088282 | 28.03.2008 Original published format: JP 2008088282 | [2011/14] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009118918 | Date: | 01.10.2009 | Language: | JA | [2009/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2305395 | Date: | 06.04.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2305395 | Date: | 13.03.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 01.10.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.08.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B21D35/00, B21D5/01, B21D22/26 | [2011/14] | CPC: |
B21D22/26 (EP,US);
B21D43/003 (EP,US);
B21D5/01 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR [2011/26] |
Former [2011/14] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | PRESSARBEITSEINRICHTUNG UND PRESSARBEITSVERFAHREN | [2011/14] | English: | PRESS WORKING EQUIPMENT AND PRESS WORKING METHOD | [2011/14] | French: | MATÉRIEL DE TRAVAIL À LA PRESSE ET PROCÉDÉ DE TRAVAIL À LA PRESSE | [2011/14] | Entry into regional phase | 31.03.2009 | Translation filed | 31.03.2009 | National basic fee paid | 31.03.2009 | Search fee paid | 31.03.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.03.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.03.2009 | Examination requested [2011/14] | 29.10.2010 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 08.02.2011 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 27.01.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.02.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.06.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 20.06.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.02.2012 | Opposition(s) | 16.12.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [A]JPH06304671 (KAMAKURA SANGYO KK); | [A]JP2532898B (NISSHIN STEEL CO., LTD.); | [A]JPH0957381 (HITACHI LTD, et al); | [A]JPH10328762 (TOYOTA AUTO BODY CO LTD) |