EP2175017 - B-cell epitopes derived from Pseudomonas aeruginosa outer membrane protein PA4710, antibodies and use in diagnosis and therapy [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2010/15] | PSEUDOMONAS AERUGINOSA OUTER MEMBRANE PROTEIN PA4710 | ||
[2013/36] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.07.2014 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.08.2014 [2014/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Meiji Seika Kaisha, Ltd. 4-16, Kyobashi 2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8002 / JP | [2010/27] |
Former [2010/15] | For all designated states Meiji Seika Kaisha Ltd. 4-16, Kyobashi 2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8002 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TANAKA, Jiro c/o Meiji Seika Kaisha Ltd. 760 Morooka-cho Kouhoku-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 222-8567 / JP | 02 /
NAGASO, Hiroshi c/o Meiji Seika Kaisha Ltd. 760 Morooka-cho Kouhoku-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 222-8567 / JP | 03 /
KUMAGAI, Masashi c/o Meiji Seika Kaisha Ltd. 760 Morooka-cho Kouhoku-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 222-8567 / JP | 04 /
OTSUKA, Keiko c/o Meiji Seika Kaisha Ltd. 760 Morooka-cho Kouhoku-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 222-8567 / JP | 05 /
AKABANE, Hirotomo c/o Meiji Seika Kaisha Ltd. 760 Morooka-cho Kouhoku-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 222-8567 / JP | 06 /
SUZUKI, Takahisa c/o Meiji Seika Kaisha Ltd. 760 Morooka-cho Kouhoku-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 222-8567 / JP | [2010/15] | Representative(s) | Cohausz & Florack Patent- & Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Bleichstrasse 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/15] | Cohausz & Florack Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bleichstrasse 14 D-40211 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 08777718.1 | 30.06.2008 | [2010/15] | WO2008JP61867 | Priority number, date | JP20070171680 | 29.06.2007 Original published format: JP 2007171680 | [2010/15] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009005040 | Date: | 08.01.2009 | Language: | JA | [2009/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2175017 | Date: | 14.04.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 08.01.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.09.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/09, A61K39/104, A61K39/395, A61P31/04, C07K14/21, C07K16/12, C12N5/10, G01N33/569, C12P21/08 | [2010/15] | CPC: |
C07K16/1214 (EP,US);
C07K14/21 (EP,KR,US);
A61K39/104 (EP,KR,US);
A61P31/04 (EP);
C07K16/12 (KR);
C12Q1/04 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/15] | Extension states | AL | 26.01.2010 | BA | 26.01.2010 | MK | 26.01.2010 | RS | 26.01.2010 | Title | German: | B-Zell Epitope des Pseudomonas aeruginosa Aussenmembranproteins PA4710, Antikörper und Verwendung in Diagnose und Therapie | [2013/36] | English: | B-cell epitopes derived from Pseudomonas aeruginosa outer membrane protein PA4710, antibodies and use in diagnosis and therapy | [2013/36] | French: | Épitopes de cellules B de la protéine de membrane externe PA4710 de Pseudomonas aeruginosa, anticorps et utilisation en diagnose et traitement | [2013/36] |
Former [2010/15] | PROTEIN PA4710 DER ÄUSSEREN MEMBRAN VON PSEUDOMONAS AERUGINOSA | ||
Former [2010/15] | PSEUDOMONAS AERUGINOSA OUTER MEMBRANE PROTEIN PA4710 | ||
Former [2010/15] | PROTÉINE PA0427 DE MEMBRANE EXTERNE DE PSEUDOMONAS AERUGINOSA | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Entry into regional phase | 26.01.2010 | Translation filed | 26.01.2010 | National basic fee paid | 26.01.2010 | Search fee paid | 26.01.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.01.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.01.2010 | Examination requested [2010/15] | 11.04.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.06.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.10.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.10.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.02.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/35] | 08.04.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2014/35] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.06.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0450573 (ONCOGEN [US]) [A] 6-12,16,17 * page 17, line 22 - line 25 * * page 11, line 27 - line 31 * * table 7 * | [XYI] - OCHSNER U A ET AL, "Genetics and regulation of two distinct haem-uptake systems, phu and has, in Pseudomonas aeruginosa.", MICROBIOLOGY (READING, ENGLAND) JAN 2000 LNKD- PUBMED:10658665, (200001), vol. 146 ( Pt 1), ISSN 1350-0872, pages 185 - 198, XP002599842 [X] 1 * figures 1,2; table 2 * [Y] 2-17 [I] 6,7,9,14,17 | [Y] - KNAPP B ET AL, "A recombinant hybrid outer membrane protein for vaccination against Pseudomonas aeruginosa.", VACCINE 26 MAR 1999 LNKD- PUBMED:10194820, (19990326), vol. 17, no. 13-14, ISSN 0264-410X, pages 1663 - 1666, XP004158302 [Y] 2-17 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0264-410X(98)00420-4 | [A] - CACHIA P J ET AL, "Synthetic peptide vaccine and antibody therapeutic development: Prevention and treatment of Pseudomonas aeruginosa", BIOPOLYMERS, NEW YORK, NY, US LNKD- DOI:10.1002/BIP.10395, (20030101), vol. 71, no. 2, ISSN 0006-3525, pages 141 - 168, XP002298639 [A] 1-17 * page 261, column 1, paragraph 4 - page 264, column 2, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/bip.10395 | International search | [Y]WO02083843 (SQUARED BIOTECHNOLOGIES INC D [US], et al); | [Y]WO03006672 (SQUARED BIOTECHNOLOGIES INC D [US], et al); | [X]US6551795 (RUBENFIELD MARC J [US], et al); | [X] - STOVER C.K. ET AL., "Haem/Haemoglobin uptake outer membrane, receptor PhuR", GENBANK, Database accession no. (Q9HV88), XP008139029 | [X] - STOVER C.K. ET AL., "Complete genome sequence of Pseudomonas aeruginosa PA01, an opportunistic pathogen", NATURE, (2000), vol. 406, no. 6799, pages 959 - 964, XP000996980 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/35023079 | [A] - OCHSNER U.A. ET AL., "Genetics and regulation of two distinct haem-uptake systems, phu and has, in Pseudomonas aeruginosa", MICROBIOLOGY, (2000), vol. 146, pages 185 - 198, XP002599842 |